NATIONAL MEDICAL IMAGING, LLC et al v. U.S. BANK, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL MEDICAL IMAGING, LLC and NATIONAL MEDICAL IMAGING HOLDING COMPANY, LLC
Defendant: U.S. BANK, N.A., LYON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., DVI RECEIVABLES XIV, LLC, DVI RECEIVABLES XVI, LLC, DVI RECEIVABLES XVII, LLC, DVI RECEIVABLES XVIII, LLC, DVI RECEIVABLES XIX, LLC, DVI FUNDING, LLC, ASHLAND FUNDING, LLC and JANE FOX
Case Number: 2:2016cv05044
Filed: September 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M. RUFE
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NOS. 74 , 78 , 79 , 80 ) ARE GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. U.S. BANK'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 76 ) IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/28/2019. 8/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF DEFENDANTS' LIABILITY FOR BAD FAITH UNDER 11 U.S.C. 303(i)(2) BASED ON COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL 22 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/30/18. 5/1/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE MOTION 6 IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT ASHLAND FUNDING, LLC SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 8/2/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/12/17. 7/12/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL MEDICAL IMAGING, LLC et al v. U.S. BANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL MEDICAL IMAGING, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN M. COREN
Represented By: DAVID M. DEVITO
Represented By: ARIS J. KARALIS
Represented By: FRANK S. MARINAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL MEDICAL IMAGING HOLDING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN M. COREN
Represented By: DAVID M. DEVITO
Represented By: ARIS J. KARALIS
Represented By: FRANK S. MARINAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK, N.A.
Represented By: STEVEN J. ADAMS
Represented By: PETER H. LEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN J. ADAMS
Represented By: PETER H. LEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI RECEIVABLES XIV, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN J. ADAMS
Represented By: PETER H. LEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI RECEIVABLES XVI, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN J. ADAMS
Represented By: PETER H. LEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI RECEIVABLES XVII, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN J. ADAMS
Represented By: PETER H. LEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI RECEIVABLES XVIII, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN J. ADAMS
Represented By: PETER H. LEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI RECEIVABLES XIX, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN J. ADAMS
Represented By: PETER H. LEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI FUNDING, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN J. ADAMS
Represented By: PETER H. LEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLAND FUNDING, LLC
Represented By: AMY E. VULPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE FOX
Represented By: STEVEN J. ADAMS
Represented By: PETER H. LEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?