MIDDLEBROOKS v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al

Plaintiff: STEPHEN MIDDLEBROOKS
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. and TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2017cv00412
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Chester
Presiding Judge: LAWRENCE F. STENGEL
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 02/26/2019. 02/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (ECF DOC. NOS. 144 ) IS DENIED; DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL IS GRANTED IN PART ONLY TO CAP PUNITIVE DAMAGES AT $300,000 BUT OTHERWISE DENIED; AND, WE WILL ENTER JUDGMENT UPON RESOLVING PLAINTIFFS PENDING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (ECF DOC. NO. 153 ). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/4/19. 2/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING 42 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/31/18. 8/31/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 24 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 2/1/18. 2/5/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIDDLEBROOKS v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN MIDDLEBROOKS
Represented By: CAREN N. GURMANKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?