KRAUSS et al V. IRIS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DONALD J. KRAUSS, CINDY G. BRILLMAN, FIGHT BACK, JC REHAB, INC. and CGB REHAB, INC.
Defendant: IRIS USA, INC., KV LOAD, INC. and C.H. ROBINSON WORLDWIDE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00778
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: GENE E.K. PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: THAT THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. NO. 90) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/31/2018. 7/31/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sme, )
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: THAT 1. DEFENDANT C.H. ROBINSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 58) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS REFLECTED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. 2. DEFENDANT IRIS USA'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NOS. 74 & 76) ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS REFLECTED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. 3. DEFENDANT C.H. ROBINSON'S MOTION TO JOIN IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 82) IS DEEMED MOOT. 4. COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WITH THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON JUNE 26, 2018, AT 3:30 PM, IN CHAMBERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/3/2018. 5/3/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, )
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION, ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOCKET NO. 41). ORDER MOOTING DEFENDANT KV LOAD'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAILNT (DOCKET NO. 37). ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT KV LOAD'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCKET NO. 31).. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/20/17. 11/22/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRAUSS et al V. IRIS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD J. KRAUSS
Represented By: DAVID G. CONCANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY G. BRILLMAN
Represented By: DAVID G. CONCANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIGHT BACK
Represented By: DAVID G. CONCANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JC REHAB, INC.
Represented By: DAVID G. CONCANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CGB REHAB, INC.
Represented By: DAVID G. CONCANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRIS USA, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS P. BRACAGLIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KV LOAD, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.H. ROBINSON WORLDWIDE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?