PALLANTE v. THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON
Plaintiff: ROSSA PALLANTE
Defendant: THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON
Case Number: 2:2017cv01142
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: LEGROME D. DAVIS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER THE MOTION OF ROSSA PALLANTE TO VACATE THE ORDER DISMISSING HER COMPLAINT AND THE JUDGMENT THIS COURT ENTERED IN FAVOR OF COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON PURSUANT TO RULE 60(B) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PR OCEDURE IS DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; AND THE MOTION OF ROSSA PALLANTE TO THE EXTENT IT RELIES ON RULE 55(B) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/8/19. 5/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED. (va, )
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON (LLOYDS) TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST ROSSA PALLANTE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE MOTION TO COMPEL IS DENIED AS TO INTERROGATORIES NOS. 6, 7, 14, 16(F), 16(G), 16(H), 20, AND 22. THE MOTION TO COMPEL IS DENIED AS TO INTERROGATORY NO. 9(F) AND 9(G) TO THE EXTENT THESE SUB-PARTS ASK ROSSA PALLANTE TO PROVIDE THE SOURCE OF THE FUNDS AND THE IDENTITY OF DOCUMENTS AND DENIED AS TO INTERROGATORY NO. 21 TO THE EXT ENT IT SEEKS INFORMATION ABOUT ANYTHING OTHER THAN SALES OF REAL ESTATE. THE MOTION TO COMPEL AS TO THE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IS DENIED AS TO DOCUMENTS CREATED OR PREPARED BY ROSSA PALLANTE AND UNKNOWN TO LLOYDS. THE MOTION TO COMPEL I S OTHERWISE GRANTED. ROSSA PALLANTE SHALL PROVIDE THE ORDERED DISCOVERY ON OR BEFORE MAY 7, 2019. THE MOTION INSOFAR AS IT SEEKS SANCTIONS AGAINST ROSSA PALLANTE IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 4/18/19. 4/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED. (va, )
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (DOC. # 63 ) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; AND THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON IS AWARDED $56,890.19 IN ATTORNEYS FEES, AND $10,991.19 IN INVESTIGATION EXPENSES, FOR A TOTAL AWARD OF $67,881.38.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/25/18. 9/25/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF AND E-MAILED. (va, )
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 56 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (DOC. # 55 ) AGAINST PLAINTIFF ROSSA PALLANTE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/21/18. 8/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED. (va, )
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. # 45 ) AND THE SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION OF CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. # 52 ) ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/16/18. 5/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED. (va, )
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 4/30/18. 4/30/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PALLANTE v. THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSSA PALLANTE
Represented By: JONATHAN WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?