FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C. et al v. ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, CSAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN and CESAR CASTILLO, INC.
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., UDL LABORATORIES INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PLIVA, INC., MYLAN, INC., ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC and UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, INC.
Consolidated Defendant: QUALITEST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Intervenor: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2017cv01666
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 77 THAT THE CASES LISTED IN APPENDIX A SHALL BE PLACED IN CIVIL SUSPENSE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/21/2019. 2/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO 874 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF OMITTED PLAINTIFFS IN THE INDIVIDUAL CASES LISTED IN APPENDIX A ARE VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); ALL CLAIMS AGAINST THE OMITTED DEFENDANTS WITH RESPECT TO THE PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCT(S) AT ISSUE IN THE CASES LISTED IN APPENDIX B ARE VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); THIS ORDER SHALL HAVE NO EFFECT ON ANY TOLLING AGREEMENTS EXECUTED PRIOR TO THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/22/2018; 2/22/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 569 IN 16-MD-2724). (tjd)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION TO SET DEADLINES FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/21/2017. 4/21/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 240 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
April 12, 2017 Filing 1 Original record together with certified copy of docket entries received from District of Southern New York. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS, #4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, #5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED, #6 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE, #7 STATUS REPORT, #8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT, #9 FILING ERROR, #10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #14 MOTION, #15 MOTION, #16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE, #17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #18 INITIAL REPORT, #19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE, #20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #23 FILING ERROR, #24 FILING ERROR, #25 FILING ERROR, #26 STATUS REPORT, #27 ORDER FOR ADMISSION, #28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION, #29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE, #32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE, #33 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE, #34 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #35 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #36 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #37 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #39 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #40 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #41 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS, #42 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS, #43 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE, #44 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN, #45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #47 ORDER, #48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #52 FILING ERROR, #53 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT, #54 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT., #55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #58 MOTION, #59 MOTION, #60 MOTION, #61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #62 FILING ERROR, #63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #64 MOTION, #65 MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #66 JOINT MOTION, #67 MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #68 DECLARATION, #69 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, #70 CONSENT MOTION, #71 MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #72 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #73 JOINT STIPULATION, #74 ORDER FOR ADMISSION, #75 MOTION for, #76 ORDER FOR ADMISSION, #77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #78 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, #79 ORDER FOR ADMISSION, #80 ORDER)(jwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2017: #81 ORDER) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2017: #82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #84 MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #85 DECLARATION, #86 MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #87 MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #88 MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #89 MOTION, #90 MOTION, #91 ORDER, #92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #94 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #95 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #96 ORDER FOR ADMISSION, #97 ORDER FOR ADMISSION, #98 ORDER, #99 ORDER) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2017: #100 MOTION, #101 MOTION, #102 MOTION) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2017: #103 NOTICE, #104 FILING ERROR, #105 FILING ERROR, #106 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION, #107 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION, #108 ORDER, #109 ORDER) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2017: #110 AMENDED COMPLAINT, #111 AMENDED COMPLAINT, #112 AMENDED COMPLAINT, #113 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #114 NOTICE OF FILING, #115 NOTICE OF FILING, #116 ORDER, #117 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2017: #118 RESPONSE, #119 RESPONSE, #120 REPLY NON-PARTY, #121 MOTION, #122 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY, #123 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #124 DECLARATION, #125 ORDER FOR ADMISSION, #126 JOINT STIPULATION, #127 MOTION, #128 NOTICE, #129 NOTICE) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2017: #130 MOTION, #131 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #132 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT, #133 OPINION AND ORDER, #134 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #135 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #136 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #137 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY) (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C. et al v. ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION HEALTH & WELFARE FUND
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. KRAMER
Represented By: CHRISTINA SHARP
Represented By: DANIEL C. GIRARD
Represented By: PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN
Represented By: SCOTT M. GRZENCZYK
Represented By: ADAM E. POLK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSAR CASTILLO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C.
Represented By: GREGORY K. ARENSON
Represented By: HAE SUNG NAM
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VANEK
Represented By: JERROD C. PATTERSON
Represented By: JEFFREY PHILIP CAMPISI
Represented By: DAVID S. NALVEN
Represented By: THOMAS M. SOBOL
Represented By: LAUREN GUTH BARNES
Represented By: JEFFREY R. MORAN
Represented By: JOSHUA SALTZMAN
Represented By: ROBERT N KAPLAN
Represented By: DAVID P. GERMAINE
Represented By: BARBARA A. MAHONEY
Represented By: RICHARD J. KILSHEIMER
Represented By: ELANA KATCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN
Represented By: MICHELLE LAMY
Represented By: DAVID TAYLOR RUDOLPH
Represented By: DEAN M. HARVEY
Represented By: BRENDAN PATRICK GLACKIN
Represented By: ERIC B. FASTIFF
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: ELIZABETH JOAN CABRASER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CESAR CASTILLO, INC.
Represented By: BRADLEY J. DEMUTH
Represented By: ROBERT N KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: KENNETH I. SCHACTER
Represented By: JAMES PATRICK STERNER
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL DERENZI
Represented By: STACEY ANNE MAHONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDL LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: MICHAEL S. SOMMER
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: INDRANEEL SUR
Represented By: MELANIE L. KATSUR
Represented By: JASON R. MELTZER
Represented By: DANIEL W. NELSON
Represented By: D. JARRETT ARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: MICHAEL S. SOMMER
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: OMID GABRIEL BANUELOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIVA, INC.
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN, INC.
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: MICHAEL S. SOMMER
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: DEVORA W. ALLON
Represented By: JAY P. LEFKOWITZ
Represented By: NATHAN EDMUND TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: QUALITEST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ELLEN R. CLARKE
Represented By: JOSEPH C. FOLIO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?