CESAR CASTILLO, INC. v. ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CESAR CASTILLO, INC.
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL. INC., PLIVA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN, INC. and UDL LABORATORIES, INC.
Intervenor: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2017cv01671
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 77 THAT THE CASES LISTED IN APPENDIX A SHALL BE PLACED IN CIVIL SUSPENSE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/21/2019. 2/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO 874 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF OMITTED PLAINTIFFS IN THE INDIVIDUAL CASES LISTED IN APPENDIX A ARE VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); ALL CLAIMS AGAINST THE OMITTED DEFENDANTS WITH RESPECT TO THE PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCT(S) AT ISSUE IN THE CASES LISTED IN APPENDIX B ARE VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); THIS ORDER SHALL HAVE NO EFFECT ON ANY TOLLING AGREEMENTS EXECUTED PRIOR TO THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/22/2018; 2/22/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 569 IN 16-MD-2724). (tjd)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION TO SET DEADLINES FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/21/2017. 4/21/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 240 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
April 12, 2017 Filing 1 Original record together with certified copy of docket entries received from District of Southern New York, 17-cv-78. (rt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2017: #1 Complaint) (rt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CESAR CASTILLO, INC. v. ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIVA, INC.
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: KENNETH I. SCHACTER
Represented By: STACEY ANNE MAHONEY
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: MICHAEL S. SOMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN, INC.
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: MICHAEL S. SOMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDL LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: MICHAEL S. SOMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CESAR CASTILLO, INC.
Represented By: BRADLEY J. DEMUTH
Represented By: LINDA P. NUSSBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ELLEN R. CLARKE
Represented By: JOSEPH C. FOLIO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?