HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. v. SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Defendant: HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, DEBBIE CROOM, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, SAMANTHA FULLER, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, ANGELA GIL, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BRANTON WALKER, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, DIANE BATES, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHRISTIAN DOLE, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PATTI URBANEK, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, DARYL TROUT, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, MOUSSA BARO, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, DEIRDRE JELKS, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, SHARECA TYSON, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JASMINE WENGLER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHER JURACEK, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, AUDREY CARLSON, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ALEX CRUZ, DAYLENE BAKER, ANGELICA ORELLANA, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC and VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02703
Filed: June 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Bucks
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 7/18/2019 AT 02:30 PM IN JUDGES CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/6/2019 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/28/2019. DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 5/23/2019. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 7/5/2019. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 5/23/2019. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/20/2019. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/20/2019. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 7/25/2019 AT 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 13A BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/29/2018. 8/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER THAT THE #62 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF SHANNON D. AZZARO IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/10/2018.8/14/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APP FORWARDED.(kp, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Shannon D. Azzaro, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12978946.) filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 7/26/2018 IS RESCHEDULED TO 8/28/2018, AT 4:00 PM, IN ROOM 13614, BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/19/2018. 7/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 19, 2018 Filing 60 Letter to Judge Slomsky dated July 19, 2018 by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. re #59 Notice (Other) (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) Modified on 7/23/2018 (tjd).
July 18, 2018 Filing 59 Letter by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF (O'CONNOR, KEVIN) Modified on 7/19/2018 (fb).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ADMIT JOSEPH M. VENTO, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. MR. VENTO IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/17/18.7/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joseph M. Vento ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12923466.) filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
July 12, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN J. O'CONNOR on behalf of ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF (O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 7/26/18 AT 4:00 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/2/18. 7/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 20, 2018 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY Motion Hearing held on 06/20/2018 (nd, )
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT THE PETITION OF WILLIAM M. WHITMAN, ESQ. FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR ENTITY DEFENDANTS AND SCHWARTZ DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO PARCP 1012(d) #41 IS GRANTED, AND WILLIAM M. WHITMAN, ESQ. IS RELIEVED OF HIS REPRESENTATION OF ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 6/20/18. 6/21/18 ENTERED & E-MAILED. COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS.(fdc)
June 20, 2018 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT re #51 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Proof of Service of Petition to Withdraw as Counsel and Order dated June 8, 2018 upon Defendants Joseph Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, and Louis Schwartz by JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ. (WHITMAN, WILLIAM)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDERED THAT THE HEARING ON THE PETITION OF WILLIAM M. WHITMAN, ESQUIRE, FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR ENTITY DEFENDANTS AND SCHWARTZ DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO PA.R.CIV.P.1012(D) CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 8, 2018 IS RESCHEDULED FOR JUNE 20, 2018 AT 3:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 12 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 6/8/18. 6/8/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 6/8/2018 (jaa, ).
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT THE CROSS-CLAIM AGAINST SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(A)(1)(A)(I), (C). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 6/6/18. 6/6/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) Modified on 6/7/2018 (tjd).
June 5, 2018 Filing 49 Notice to Dismiss Crossclaim against SKYLINE by NANCY COOVER. (SKOVRON, STEPHEN) Modified on 6/6/2018 (tjd).
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT THE ACTION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS - MOUSSA BARO, MOUSSA BARO, AUDREY CARLSON, AUDREY CARLSON, NANCY COOVER, NANCY COOVER, NANCY COOVER, DEBBIE CROOM, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, ALEX CRUZ, CHRISTIAN DOLE, CHRISTIAN DOLE, SAMANTHA FULLER, SAMANTHA FULLER, ANGELA GIL, ANGELA GIL, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, CHER JURACEK, CHER JURACEK, YOLANDA OCHOA, YOLANDA OCHOA, ANGELICA ORELLANA, ANGELICA ORELLANA, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, DARYL TROUT, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, PATTI URBANEK, BRANTON WALKER, BRANTON WALKER, JASMINE WENGLER, JASMINE WENGLER, DAYLENE BAKER and DAYLENE BAKER TERMINATED AND ALL OTHER DEFENDANTS REMAIN IN THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 6/5/18. 6/5/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 6/5/2018 (jaa, ).
June 5, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. As To NANCY COOVER, CHRISTIAN DOLE, SAMANTHA FULLER, BRANTON WALKER, SHARECA TYSON, PRECIOUS JEFFREY, MOUSSA BARO, ALEX CRUZ, ANGELA GIL, ANGELICA ORELLANA, AUDREY CARLSON, CHER JURACEK, DAYLENE BAKER, DEBBIE CROOM, JASMINE WENGLER, NOLBERTO GABRIEL, PATRICIA URBANEK, DARYL TROUT, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, AND YOLANDA OCHOA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WARE, ELIZABETH)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER THAT THE PETITION OF WILLIAM WHITMAN FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR ENTITY DEFENDANTS AND SCHWARTZ DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO PA.R.CIV.P. 101 (2). A HEARING WILL BE HELD ON 6/8/18 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 13A; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 5/22/18. 5/31/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY Motion Hearing held on 5/21/18(jaa, ) COURT REPORTER/ESR.
May 14, 2018 Filing 44 Request for R 55 Entry of Default against Crossclaim Dfd SKYLINE by NANCY COOVER. (SKOVRON, STEPHEN) Modified on 5/15/2018 (tjd).
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON THE PETITION OF WILLIAM M. WHITMAN, ESQUIRE FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR ENTITY DEFENDANTS AND SCHWARTZ DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO PA.R.CIV.P. 1012(d) WILL BE HELD ON 5/21/18 AT 4:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 5/10/18. 5/11/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, )
May 10, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WARE, ELIZABETH)
May 10, 2018 Filing 41 Petition to Withdraw as Attorney filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.PETITION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Petition to Withdraw as Counsel for Entity Defendants and Schwartz Defendants)(WHITMAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 5/11/2018 (tjd). Modified on 5/31/2018 (nd, ). Modified on 5/31/2018 (nd, ).
April 23, 2018 Filing 40 Joint Report of Rule 26(F) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.(WARE, ELIZABETH) Modified on 4/24/2018 (tjd).
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 4/25/18 AT 4:00 P.M. IN ROOM 13614; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 4/11/18. 4/12/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO PRO SE.(jl, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 38 ANSWER to PLAINTIFF'S #1 Complaint by LYNELL SCHOMAKER.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (kp, )
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS ARE DENIED. DEFENDANT SCHOMAKER IS ORDERED TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITHIN 21 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 1/30/2018. 1/31/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(kp, )
January 30, 2018 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 1/30/2018. 1/31/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(kp, )
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC MAY ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO COOVER'S CROSS CLAIM ON OR BEFORE 12/14/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 11/27/2017. 11/27/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kp, ) Modified on 11/28/2017 (tjd).
November 24, 2017 Filing 34 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer re #27 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #31 Answer to Crossclaim,,, EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO DEFENDANT / CROSSCLAIM PLAINTIFF NANCY COOVER'S CROSSCLAIM filed by NANCY COOVER, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC. Certificate of Service.**(FILED IN ERROR, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)**(WHITMAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 11/27/2017 (tjd).
November 24, 2017 Filing 33 PRAECIPE TO WITHDRAW DEFENDANT SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLCS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO DEFENDANT / CROSSCLAIM PLAINTIFF NANCY COOVER'S CROSSCLAIM by SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC. (WHITMAN, WILLIAM)
November 24, 2017 Filing 32 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #27 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #31 Answer to Crossclaim,,, filed by SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC. Certificate of Service.**(WITHDRAWN PER PRAECIPE FILED ON 11/24/2017)** (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Motion to Extend time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Crossclaim)(WHITMAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 11/27/2017 (tjd).
November 3, 2017 Filing 31 Coover ANSWER to #1 Complaint, First CROSSCLAIM against SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC by NANCY COOVER.**(FILED IN ERROR, INCOMPLETE PDF, SEE DOCUMENTS #27 , #28 , #29 FOR CORRECT FILING)** (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Coover Ans Exh B 1 (1 of 2))(SKOVRON, STEPHEN) Modified on 11/7/2017 (tjd). Modified on 11/16/2017 (tjd).
November 3, 2017 Filing 30 Entity Defendants' and Schwartz Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(WHITMAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 11/7/2017 (tjd).
November 3, 2017 Filing 29 Coover Exhibit B to #27 Answer to Crossclaim against HCSG, First CROSSCLAIM Coover v Skyline against NANCY COOVER by NANCY COOVER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Coover Ans Exh B 2 (2 of 2))(SKOVRON, STEPHEN) Modified on 11/7/2017 (tjd).
November 3, 2017 Filing 28 EXHIBIT A to ANSWER to #27 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim against HCSG, First CROSSCLAIM Coover v Skyline against NANCY COOVER by NANCY COOVER.(SKOVRON, STEPHEN)
November 3, 2017 Filing 27 Coover ANSWER to #1 Complaint against HCSG, First CROSSCLAIM against SKYLINE against NANCY COOVER by NANCY COOVER.(SKOVRON, STEPHEN) Modified on 11/7/2017 (tjd, ).
October 31, 2017 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF re #20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Unrelated Individual Defendants MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint, #23 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, (WHITMAN, WILLIAM)
October 25, 2017 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF re #23 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, (WHITMAN, WILLIAM)
October 25, 2017 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF re #20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Unrelated Individual Defendants MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint (WHITMAN, WILLIAM)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT THE PETITION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR UNRELATED DEFENDANTS IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED WILLIAM M. WHITMAN, ESQ. SHALL MAIL A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12 TO EACH DEFENDANT NAMED BELOW.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 10/17/2017.10/17/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
October 5, 2017 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service as to Petition for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel upon 13 individual defendants filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, DAYLENE BAKER, MOUSSA BARO, DIANE BATES, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, AUDREY CARLSON, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, CHRISTIAN DOLE, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SAMANTHA FULLER, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELA GIL, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, DEIRDRE JELKS, CHER JURACEK, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELICA ORELLANA, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BRANTON WALKER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, JASMINE WENGLER, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.(WHITMAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 10/6/2017 (md).
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THAT DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT TO 11/3/2017 IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 9/28/2017. 9/29/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 25, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Unrelated Individual Defendants, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, DAYLENE BAKER, MOUSSA BARO, DIANE BATES, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, AUDREY CARLSON, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, CHRISTIAN DOLE, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SAMANTHA FULLER, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELA GIL, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, DEIRDRE JELKS, CHER JURACEK, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELICA ORELLANA, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BRANTON WALKER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, JASMINE WENGLER, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Petition for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Unrelated Individual Defendants and Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(WHITMAN, WILLIAM)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 9/13/2017 AT 2:00PM IS CANCELLED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/24/2017. 8/24/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UNTIL 9/29/2017.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/24/2017. 8/24/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 23, 2017 Filing 17 JOINT STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, DAYLENE BAKER, MOUSSA BARO, DIANE BATES, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, AUDREY CARLSON, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, CHRISTIAN DOLE, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SAMANTHA FULLER, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELA GIL, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, DEIRDRE JELKS, CHER JURACEK, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELICA ORELLANA, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BRANTON WALKER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, JASMINE WENGLER, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Second Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(WHITMAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 8/25/2017 (md).
August 11, 2017 Filing 16 PRAECIPE TO WITHDRAW DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, DAYLENE BAKER, MOUSSA BARO, DIANE BATES, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, AUDREY CARLSON, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, CHRISTIAN DOLE, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SAMANTHA FULLER, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELA GIL, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, DEIRDRE JELKS, CHER JURACEK, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELICA ORELLANA, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BRANTON WALKER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, JASMINE WENGLER, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF. (WHITMAN, WILLIAM)
August 11, 2017 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, DAYLENE BAKER, MOUSSA BARO, DIANE BATES, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, AUDREY CARLSON, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, CHRISTIAN DOLE, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SAMANTHA FULLER, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELA GIL, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, DEIRDRE JELKS, CHER JURACEK, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELICA ORELLANA, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BRANTON WALKER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, JASMINE WENGLER, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)(WHITMAN, WILLIAM)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT MOTION HEARING SET FOR 9/13/2017 02:00 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/9/17. 8/10/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 7, 2017 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
August 4, 2017 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Angelica Orellana by certified mail on 07/27/2017 (WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 8/11/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/1/2017. 8/1/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
July 26, 2017 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, DAYLENE BAKER, MOUSSA BARO, DIANE BATES, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, AUDREY CARLSON, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, CHRISTIAN DOLE, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SAMANTHA FULLER, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELA GIL, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, DEIRDRE JELKS, CHER JURACEK, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELICA ORELLANA, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BRANTON WALKER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, JASMINE WENGLER, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint with Certificate of Service.(WHITMAN, WILLIAM)
July 25, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A. WARE on behalf of HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(WARE, ELIZABETH)
July 24, 2017 Filing 8 DEFENDANT LYNELL SCHOMAKER'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by LYNELL SCHOMAKER.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement)(kp, )
July 24, 2017 Filing 7 Memorandum by NANCY COOVER. (kp, )
July 21, 2017 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Daryl Trout by certified mail on July 17, 2017 (WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
July 14, 2017 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon 10 defendants by certified mail on July 3 and July 5, 2017 (WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
July 10, 2017 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons with Complaint upon 60 by certified mail on 6/29/17, 6/30/17, 7/1/17 (WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/19/2017. 6/20/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 15, 2017 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC..(rt)
June 15, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, DAYLENE BAKER, MOUSSA BARO, DIANE BATES, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, AUDREY CARLSON, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, CHRISTIAN DOLE, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SAMANTHA FULLER, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELA GIL, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, DEIRDRE JELKS, CHER JURACEK, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELICA ORELLANA, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BRANTON WALKER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, JASMINE WENGLER, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 161183.), filed by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(rt)
June 15, 2017 Summons Issued as to ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, DAYLENE BAKER, MOUSSA BARO, DIANE BATES, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, AUDREY CARLSON, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, CHRISTIAN DOLE, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SAMANTHA FULLER, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELA GIL, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, DEIRDRE JELKS, CHER JURACEK, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELICA ORELLANA, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BRANTON WALKER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, JASMINE WENGLER, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF. Ninety-Nine Forwarded To: Counsel on June 16, 2017 (rt)
June 15, 2017 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (rt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. v. SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBBIE CROOM
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMANTHA FULLER
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY COOVER
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOLBERTO DABRIEL
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI CAHILL
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA GIL
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANTON WALKER
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNELL SCHOMAKER
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOLANDA OCHOA
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SCHWARTZ
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE BATES
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN DOLE
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTI URBANEK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARYL TROUT
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUSSA BARO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESCIOUS JEFFREY
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEIRDRE JELKS
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH SCHWARTZ
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARECA TYSON
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASMINE WENGLER
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS SCHWARTZ
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHER JURACEK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUDREY CARLSON
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX CRUZ
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAYLENE BAKER
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELICA ORELLANA
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VENTO
Represented By: WILLIAM M. WHITMAN
Represented By: SHANNON D. AZZARO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WARE
Represented By: JOSEPH E. WOLFSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?