MCCRACKEN v. R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: TED A. MCCRACKEN
Defendant: R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, DEBRA CREW, ITG BRANDS LLC., DAVID H. TAYLOR, REPUBLIC TOBACCO INC. and DONALD LEVIN
Case Number: 2:2017cv04495
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MARK A. KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2018 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT REPUBLIC TOBACCO, INC.'S MOTION (ECF DOC NO. 61) IS GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART, ETC. REPUBLIC TOBACCO, INC. SHALL ANSWER THE ALLEGATIONS RELATING TO THESE THEORIES NO LATER THAN 7/5/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/26/18. 6/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
May 21, 2018 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFTS CREW, LEVIN, & TAYLOR'S MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF DOC. NO. 36) IS GRANTED, ETC. DEFTS ITG BRANDS AND R.J. REYNOLDS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (ECF DOC. NO. 37) IS GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART, ETC. DEFT ITG BRANDS AND R.J. REYNOLDS SHALL ANSWER REMAINING ALLEGATIONS NO LATER THAN 6/5/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/21/18. 5/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, )
February 2, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (ECF DOC. NOS. 18, 20, 27) ARE GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR THE PRO SE PLFF TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 2/16/2018 OR HIS CLAIMS WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; & UNDER THIS ORDER, PLFF'S CROSS-MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF DOC. NO. 28) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/2/18. 2/2/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCRACKEN v. R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TED A. MCCRACKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA CREW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITG BRANDS LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID H. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLIC TOBACCO INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD LEVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?