COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA v. TRUMP et al
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP, DONALD J. WRIGHT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, RENE ALEXANDER ACOSTA and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Case Number: 2:2017cv04540
Filed: October 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 01/14/2019. 01/14/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO LIFE STAY OF DISTRICT COURT PROCEEDINGS IS GRANTED AND THE CLERK SHALL TRANFER THIS CASE TO THE COURT'S ACTIVE DOCKET. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SUPPLEMENT OR AMEND ITS COMPLAINT AND FILE A MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION NO LATER THAN 12/17/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/14/18. 12/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 9 IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS ERIC D. HARGAN, AS ACTING SECRETARY OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVIC ES (SUBSTITUTED PURSUANT TO RULE 25(D) OF THE FRCP); THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES; STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, AS SECRETARY OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY; THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, RENE ALEXANDER ACOSTA, AS SECRETARY OF THE U.S . DEPARTMENT OF LABOR; AND THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR; AND THEIR OFFICERS, AGENTS, SERVANTS, EMPLOYEES, ATTORNEYS, DESIGNEES, AND SUBORDINATES, AS WELL AS ANY PERSON ACTING IN CONCERT OR PARTICIPATION WITH THEM, ARE HEREBY ENJOINED FROM ENFORCING T HE FOLLOWING INTERIM FINAL RULES PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT: 1. RELIGIOUS EXEMPTIONS AND ACCOMODATIONS FOR COVERAGE OF CERTAIN PREVENTIVE SERVICES UNDER THE AFFORDABLE CARE ACT DESCRIBED AT 82 FED. REG. 47792; AND 2. MORAL EXEMPTIONS AND ACC OMODATIONS FOR COVERAGE OF CERTAIN PREVENTIVE SERVICES UNDER THE AFFORDABLE CARE ACT DESCRIBED AT 82 FED. REG. 47838. THE COURT HAS CONSIDERED THE ISSUE OF SECURITY PURSUANT TO RULE 65(C) OF THE FRCP AND DETERMINES THAT DEFENDANTS WILL NOT SUFFER ANY FINANCIAL LOSS THAT WARRANTS THE NEED FOR THE PLAINTIFF TO POST SECURITY. AFTER CONSIDERING THE FACTS AND CIRCUMSTANCES OF THIS CASE, THE COURT FINDS THAT SECURITY IS UNNECESSARY AND EXERCISES ITS DISCRETION NOT TO REQUIRE THE POSTING OF SECURITY IN THIS SITUATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/15/17. 12/15/17 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE LITTLE SISTERS' MOTION TO INTERVENE IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/8/17. 12/8/17 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: NICOLE J. BOLAND
Represented By: MICHAEL J. FISCHER
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. KADE
Represented By: SCOTT WEBSTER REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. WRIGHT
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. KADE
Represented By: SCOTT WEBSTER REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. KADE
Represented By: SCOTT WEBSTER REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN T. MNUCHIN
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. KADE
Represented By: SCOTT WEBSTER REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. KADE
Represented By: SCOTT WEBSTER REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENE ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. KADE
Represented By: SCOTT WEBSTER REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. KADE
Represented By: SCOTT WEBSTER REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?