LOMBARDI v. MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST et al

Plaintiff: ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI
Defendant: D. TYSEN NUTT, JR., MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT and MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST
Case Number: 2:2017cv05373
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Labor Litigations
Cause of Action: 18:1514A
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2018 34 Featured Case ORDER THAT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 10/23/2018.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/17/2018. 9/17/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 30, 2018 33 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR 9/25/2018 AT 01:30 PM IN JUDGES CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 8/30/2018. 8/31/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 28, 2018 32 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 8/28/2018. 8/28/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
July 30, 2018 31 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH HEY FOR SETTLEMENT. FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 9/17/2018. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 10/30/2018. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 12/11/2018. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 1/4/2019. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTIONS IN LIMINE WILL BE HELD ON 1/10/2019 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 5614). TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 1/22/2019 AT 9:30 AM IN A COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/30/18. 7/30/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
July 24, 2018 30 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, JULY 11, 2018 AT 9:30 A.M. WILL NOW BE HELD ON MONDAY, AUGUST 20, 2018 AT 9:30 A.M., BEFORE THE UNDERSIGNED IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 3038, 3RD FLOOR, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 7/23/18. 7/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) Modified on 7/27/2018 (tjd).
July 10, 2018 29 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL S. ORLOW on behalf of ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI with Certificate of Service(ORLOW, DANIEL)
May 31, 2018 28 Featured Case ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY AUGUST 16, 2018. ALL OTHER DEADLINES IN THE APRIL 18 SCHEDULING ORDER (ECF NO. #25 ) REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 5/31/18. 5/31/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
May 21, 2018 27 Featured Case ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/11/2018, AT 9:30 AM, IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 3038), BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 5/18/2018. 5/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
May 18, 2018 26 Minute Entry/Report of Settlement Conference for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY on 5/17/18. (kw, )
April 18, 2018 25 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER THAT CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH HEY FOR SETTLEMENT. FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/17/2018. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/23/2018. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 8/30/18. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 10/11/2018. PLFF & DEFT SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 10/22/2018. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/25/2018 AT 10:00 A.M. IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 5614). TRIAL DATE SET FOR 11/1/2018 AT 9:30 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/18/18. 4/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 18, 2018 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Pretrial Conference held on 4/18/18. (jl, )
April 17, 2018 23 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA CARLIN MATTIACCI on behalf of ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI with Certificate of Service(MATTIACCI, LAURA)
April 16, 2018 22 Joint Status Report to Rule 26(f) by ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI.(OELTJEN, KATHERINE) Modified on 4/18/2018 (tjd).
April 9, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/18/2018 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/9/2018. 4/9/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 28, 2018 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
March 8, 2018 19 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL 3/28/2018 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. DEFENDANT MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED SHALL HAVE UNTIL 4/11/2018 TO REPLY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/8/2018. 3/8/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
March 7, 2018 18 STIPULATION re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Time to Oppose Motion to Dismiss by ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI.**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)** (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) Modified on 3/8/2018 (tjd).
February 23, 2018 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LUTSKY, JEFFREY) Modified on 3/29/2018 (nd, ).
February 21, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE #15 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF JILL L. ROSENBERG AND LISA B. LUPION IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 2/21/2018.2/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED. (kp, )
February 21, 2018 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by D. TYSEN NUTT, JR., MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST.Affidavit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lisa B. Lupion, Esq., #2 Affidavit of Jill L. Rosenberg, Esq., #3 Order, #4 Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1, #5 Certificate of Service)(LUTSKY, JEFFREY)
February 16, 2018 14 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED SHALL HAVE UNTIL 2/23/2018 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 2/16/2018. 2/16/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
February 16, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE ANDREW JACOBSEN on behalf of D. TYSEN NUTT, JR., MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST with Certificate of Service(JACOBSEN, KYLE)
February 12, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ARE DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 2/12/2018. 2/12/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
February 12, 2018 11 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jill L. Rosenberg by D. TYSEN NUTT, JR., MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12621073.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LUTSKY, JEFFREY)
February 12, 2018 10 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa B. Lupion by D. TYSEN NUTT, JR., MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12620945.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LUTSKY, JEFFREY)
February 7, 2018 9 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED SHALL ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 2/20/2018.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 2/7/2018. 2/7/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
February 6, 2018 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LUTSKY, JEFFREY)
February 6, 2018 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LUTSKY, JEFFREY)
February 6, 2018 6 ANSWER to Complaint by D. TYSEN NUTT, JR., MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LUTSKY, JEFFREY) Modified on 2/9/2018 (tjd).
January 12, 2018 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI. D. TYSEN NUTT, JR. waiver sent on 12/8/2017, answer due 2/6/2018. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
January 12, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI. MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST waiver sent on 12/8/2017, answer due 2/6/2018. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
January 12, 2018 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI. MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED waiver sent on 12/8/2017, answer due 2/6/2018. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
December 4, 2017 2 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN G. CONSOLE on behalf of ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI (CONSOLE, STEPHEN)
November 30, 2017 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI. (rt)
November 30, 2017 Summons Issued as to D. TYSEN NUTT, JR., MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST. Four Forwarded To: Counsel on November 30, 2017 (rt)
November 30, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against D. TYSEN NUTT, JR., MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-12488156.), filed by ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI.(OELTJEN, KATHERINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOMBARDI v. MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY A. LOMBARDI
Represented By: KATHERINE OELTJEN
Represented By: DANIEL S. ORLOW
Represented By: STEPHEN G. CONSOLE
Represented By: LAURA CARLIN MATTIACCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. TYSEN NUTT, JR.
Represented By: KYLE ANDREW JACOBSEN
Represented By: JILL L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: JEFFREY A. LUTSKY
Represented By: LISA B. LUPION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACQUARIE GROUP LIMITED
Represented By: KYLE ANDREW JACOBSEN
Represented By: JILL L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: JEFFREY A. LUTSKY
Represented By: LISA B. LUPION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT
Represented By: KYLE ANDREW JACOBSEN
Represented By: JILL L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: JEFFREY A. LUTSKY
Represented By: LISA B. LUPION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACQUARIE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT BUSINESS TRUST
Represented By: KYLE ANDREW JACOBSEN
Represented By: JILL L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: JEFFREY A. LUTSKY
Represented By: LISA B. LUPION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?