FROMPOVICZ v. NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: STANLEY F. FROMPOVICZ
Defendant: NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, ICE RIVER SPRINGS WATER CO. INC., CROSSROADS BEVERAGE GROUP and JAMES J. LAND, JR.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00054
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Schuylkill
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER THAT MOTIONS ARE GRANTED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: JAMES J. LAND SHALL REIMBURSE NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC FOR $98,194.84 IN ATTORNEYS' FEES AND $27.45 IN COSTS, & SHALL REIMBURSE FROMPOVICZ $12,200 IN ATTORNEYS' FEES AND $190.29 IN COSTS INCURRED IN LITIGATING THE MOTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/16/21. 2/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER THAT MOTIONS TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ARE HEREBY GRANTED. PLFF'S REQUESTS FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES INCURRED IN LITIGATING THIS MOTION ARE HEREBY GRANTED. PLFF & NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC SHALL FILE BRIEFS SPECIFYING THE AMOUNT REQUESTED NO LATER THAN 10/21/2020. DEFT LAND SHALL FILE ANY REPLY NO LATER THAN 11/4/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/16/20. 10/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DOC. 77 ) IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE (DOC. 96 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/9/2019.10/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ICE RIVER, CROSSROADS, AND LAND'S MOTION TO DISMISS 33 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANT NIAGRA'S MOTION TO DISMISS 34 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED AS PART, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/18/18. 9/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ICE RIVER, CROSSROADS, AND LAND'S MOTION TO DISMISS 4 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANT NIAGRA'S MOTION TO DISMISS 11 IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/24/18. 5/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FROMPOVICZ v. NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANLEY F. FROMPOVICZ
Represented By: DAVID J. STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW A. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE RIVER SPRINGS WATER CO. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROSSROADS BEVERAGE GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES J. LAND, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?