GENTRY v. SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: ANGELA K. GENTRY
Defendant: SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORPORATION, SIKORSKY GLOBAL HELICOPTERS, INC., KEYSTONE HELICOPTER CORPORATION and KEYSTONE HELICOPTER HOLDINGS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01326
Filed: March 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: LAWRENCE F. STENGEL
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION DENYING THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REMAND AND GRANTING THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/22/2019. 4/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND TO STRIKE 34 IS GRANTED, SUCH THAT THE FETBROYT DECLARATION, ALL REFERENCES THERETO, AND ANY RELIANCE THEREON, IS STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND 4 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/18/2019. 4/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AFFIDAVT AND EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT AND SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS SHALL BE STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION TO STRIKE IS DEEMED MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/3/18. 12/4/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENTRY v. SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA K. GENTRY
Represented By: MICHAEL S. MISKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORPORATION
Represented By: SUSAN M. DEAN
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Represented By: MICHAEL S. MISKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIKORSKY GLOBAL HELICOPTERS, INC.
Represented By: SUSAN M. DEAN
Represented By: MICHAEL S. MISKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEYSTONE HELICOPTER CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL S. MISKA
Represented By: SUSAN M. DEAN
Represented By: MICHAEL S. MISKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEYSTONE HELICOPTER HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: SUSAN M. DEAN
Represented By: MICHAEL S. MISKA
Represented By: SUSAN M. DEAN
Represented By: MICHAEL S. MISKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?