1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC. et al
Plaintiff: 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATON OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRATICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, UNITE HERE HEALTH, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY D/B/A BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF LOUISIAN AND HOME LOUISIANA, INC., AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND and SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC ., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, APOTEX CORP., CITRON PHARMA LLC, MYLAN INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMAECUTICALS CORP., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., MAYNE PHARMA INC. and WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02401
Filed: June 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER THAT SUMMONSES ARE NOT REQUIRED TO BE SERVED UPON ANY DEFENDANTS WHO ALREADY HAVE BEEN SERVED OR AGREED TO WAIVE SERVICE AND PLAINTIFFS HAVE NO SERVICE OBLIGATIONS UNDER FRCP 4 AS TO SUCH SUMMONSES. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS WHO HAVE NOT FILED A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE IN ANY CASE SHALL DO SO FORTHWITH.... SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 5/28/2019. 5/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1007 IN 16-MD-2724) (kp, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 14, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by COURTNEY B AVERBACH on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(AVERBACH, COURTNEY)
May 14, 2019 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J SHERIDAN on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHERIDAN, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER M DRISCOLL on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRISCOLL, JENNIFER)
May 14, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW C BERNASCONI on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(BERNASCONI, ANDREW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHWARTZ, EDWARD)
May 14, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL)
May 8, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET)
May 8, 2019 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA C CROUSHORE on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(CROUSHORE, AMANDA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN on behalf of DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHMIDTLEIN, JOHN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH F. TEICH on behalf of DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(TEICH, SARAH)
May 3, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ANNA M HORNING NYGREN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HORNING NYGREN, ANNA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 176 RESPONSE in Opposition re #116 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Joint Defendants, Opposition of End-Payer Plaintiffs filed by 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition re #116 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Joint Defendants filed by 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 174 RESPONSE in Opposition re #119 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) of Zydus filed by 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #114 MOTION to Dismiss THE OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS FILED BY END-PAYER PLAINTIFFS, INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS, KROGER PLAINTIFFS, AND HUMANA, INC. of West-Ward filed by 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 171 RESPONSE in Opposition re #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 170 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED-COUNTS 1 THROUGH 4 OF EPP COMPLAINT of Lannett filed by 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 169 RESPONSE in Opposition re #115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 168 RESPONSE in Opposition re #113 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims of Apotex filed by 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH C. SILBER on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SILBER, SETH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY C. BANK on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(BANK, JEFFREY)
May 2, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by CHUL PAK on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(PAK, CHUL)
April 30, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
April 29, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KULIK, SARAH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 162 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BENJAMIN P. ARGYLE on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(ARGYLE, BENJAMIN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by THOMAS J. WELLING on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(WELLING, THOMAS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LISA JOSE FALES on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(FALES, LISA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DANIELLE R. FOLEY on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(FOLEY, DANIELLE)
April 9, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE by SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA of Withdrawal of Counsel Nicomedes S. Herrera (SAVERI, JOSEPH)
April 9, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY S. FOUSE on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(FOUSE, LINDSAY)
April 8, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI)
April 5, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JAMES DOUGLAS BALDRIDGE on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(BALDRIDGE, JAMES)
April 1, 2019 12 Summons Issued as to AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC.. Forwarded To: R. LIEBENBERG on 4/26/2019 (kp, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 154 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED END-PAYER CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., filed by 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #1 EXHIBIT 1) (kp, ).
April 1, 2019 Filing 153 END-PAYER AMENDED CLASS-ACTION COMPLAINT, filed by 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 EX 1)(kp, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(WILSON, CHIRSTOPHER)
April 1, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by S TURNER on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TURNER, S)
April 1, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK THOMAS KOONS on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KOONS, ERIK)
April 1, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MARTIN TALADAY on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TALADAY, JOHN)
March 6, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. MUNKITTRICK on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(MUNKITTRICK, DAVID)
March 6, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. CANTER on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(CANTER, EDWARD)
March 1, 2019 Filing 146 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..Certificate of Service.(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 28, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID)
February 28, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON)
February 28, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KASOWITZ, MARC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by J. GORDON COONEY, JR on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(COONEY, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. PEASE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(PEASE, JOHN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA B. ROBINSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROBINSON, AMANDA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T MCENROE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCENROE, WILLIAM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAELA DRAGALIN on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRAGALIN, MICHAELA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON TANCHYK on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TANCHYK, ALISON)
February 26, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MCCLAM on behalf of CITRON PHARMA LLC with Certificate of Service(MCCLAM, JOHN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL on behalf of CITRON PHARMA LLC with Certificate of Service(ENGSELL, TIFFANY)
February 26, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN E. BIZAR on behalf of CITRON PHARMA LLC with Certificate of Service(BIZAR, STEVEN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by COLLEEN L. CLEARY on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(CLEARY, COLLEEN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by TODD A. SEAVER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(SEAVER, TODD)
February 26, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER T. HEFFELFINGER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(HEFFELFINGER, CHRISTOPHER)
February 26, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. TABACCO, JR on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(TABACCO, JOSEPH)
February 25, 2019 Filing 126 FILED IN ERROR (NOTICE of Appearance by COLLEEN L. CLEARY on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(CLEARY, COLLEEN) Modified on 2/26/2019 (kp, ).
February 25, 2019 Filing 125 FILED IN ERROR (NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER T. HEFFELFINGER on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(HEFFELFINGER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 2/26/2019 (kp, ).
February 25, 2019 Filing 124 FILED IN ERROR (NOTICE of Appearance by TODD A. SEAVER on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(SEAVER, TODD) Modified on 2/26/2019 (kp, ).
February 25, 2019 Filing 123 FILED IN ERROR (NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. TABACCO, JR on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(TABACCO, JOSEPH) Modified on 2/26/2019 (kp,)
February 22, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by MELINA R. DIMATTIO on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(DIMATTIO, MELINA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S WELLIN on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(WELLIN, ANDREW)
February 21, 2019 Filing 120 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(EVERETT, J.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 119 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON R. PARISH on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(KITLOWSKI, BRADLEY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 116 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAPMAN, JULIA) (Main Document 116 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss THE OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS FILED BY END-PAYER PLAINTIFFS, INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS, KROGER PLAINTIFFS, AND HUMANA, INC. filed by WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. Memorandum of Law in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(LEVINE, JAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 113 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by APOTEX CORP..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 21, 2019 Filing 112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED-COUNTS 1 THROUGH 4 OF EPP COMPLAINT filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARTH, GERALD)
February 21, 2019 Filing 111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by MAYNE PHARMA INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. CLEARY on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(CLEARY, ROBERT)
February 21, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIE BENJIMAN ZASTROW on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(ZASTROW, DENNIE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by CONNIE LEE on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(LEE, CONNIE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
February 21, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(HARTMAN, MICHAEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY A. CARR on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(CARR, JEFFREY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN P. SUMNER on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(SUMNER, ROBIN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by JAN P. LEVINE on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(LEVINE, JAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by R. BRENDAN FEE on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(FEE, R.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. REED on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA CHAPMAN on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK DESIMONE on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(DESIMONE, FRANK)
February 20, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by HARVEY BARTLE, IV on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(BARTLE, HARVEY)
February 20, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by TRACEY F MILICH on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(MILICH, TRACEY)
February 20, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. STEMPEL on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEMPEL, SCOTT)
February 20, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(EVERETT, J.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
February 20, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN M KOWAL on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(KOWAL, STEVEN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(DONAHUE, LAUREN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by KENN BROTMAN on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(BROTMAN, KENN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J SMITH on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(SMITH, BRIAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN F. NAGLE on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(NAGLE, JOHN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(HAAS, ELIZABETH)
February 20, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES T. MCKEOWN on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MCKEOWN, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES W. MATTHEWS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
January 23, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE by 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH Notice of Change in Firm Affiliation for Jessica Servais (SERVAIS, JESSICA)
January 23, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON S. HARTLEY on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(HARTLEY, JASON)
September 13, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KRISTEN G MARTTILA on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MARTTILA, KRISTEN)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE STIPULATING DEFENDANTS TO MOVE AGAINST, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO END-PAYER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS ADJOURNED PURSUANT TO THE PROCEDURE SET FORTH IN PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 51. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/4/2018. 9/4/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 693 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
August 29, 2018 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Process Plus Legal Service LLC re: served Summons and Complaint upon Pliva, Inc. on 8/27/2018 (LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
August 29, 2018 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Process Plus Legal Service LLC re: served Summons and Complaint upon Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC on 8/27/2018 (LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
July 26, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by MINDEE J. REUBEN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(REUBEN, MINDEE)
July 26, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. GREENFOGEL on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(GREENFOGEL, STEVEN)
July 6, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA B. HEIMAN on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(HEIMAN, LAURA)
July 6, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE LAMY on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(LAMY, MICHELLE)
July 6, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE W. LEPPLA on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(LEPPLA, BRUCE)
July 6, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID TAYLOR RUDOLPH on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(RUDOLPH, DAVID)
July 6, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH JOAN CABRASER on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(CABRASER, ELIZABETH)
July 6, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by DEAN M. HARVEY on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(HARVEY, DEAN)
June 28, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A. KRAMER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(KRAMER, ELIZABETH)
June 28, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT M. GRZENCZYK on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(GRZENCZYK, SCOTT)
June 28, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN ELIAS on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(ELIAS, JORDAN)
June 28, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA SHARP on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(SHARP, CHRISTINA)
June 28, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by ARIELLE S. WAGNER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(WAGNER, ARIELLE)
June 28, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTEN G MARTTILA on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(MARTTILA, KRISTEN)
June 28, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNA M HORNING NYGREN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(HORNING NYGREN, ANNA)
June 28, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN HANSON RIEBEL on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(RIEBEL, KAREN)
June 28, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by HEIDI M SILTON on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(SILTON, HEIDI)
June 28, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by W. JOSEPH BRUCKNER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(BRUCKNER, W.)
June 25, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. SNYDER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(SNYDER, JOSHUA)
June 25, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. SINDONI on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(SINDONI, JOHN)
June 25, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BONI on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(BONI, MICHAEL)
June 25, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(BENNETT, NATALIE)
June 25, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
June 22, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE Y CHO on behalf of 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND with Certificate of Service(CHO, STEPHANIE)
June 22, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by LIBERATO P. VERDERAME on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(VERDERAME, LIBERATO)
June 22, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by IRVING SCHER on behalf of 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND (SCHER, IRVING)
June 22, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by JEANNINE M. KENNEY on behalf of 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND (KENNEY, JEANNINE)
June 22, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT ALLAN MARTIN on behalf of 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND (MARTIN, SCOTT)
June 22, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. LEHMANN on behalf of 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND (LEHMANN, MICHAEL)
June 22, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by SATHYA S. GOSSELIN on behalf of 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND (GOSSELIN, SATHYA)
June 22, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by BONNY SWEENEY on behalf of 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND (SWEENEY, BONNY)
June 20, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK L. SHAWN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(SHAWN, ERIK)
June 20, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. BELSKY on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(BELSKY, ADAM)
June 20, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by TERRY GROSS on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(GROSS, TERRY)
June 19, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER E. BARNETT on behalf of UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(BARNETT, ALEXANDER)
June 19, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH T. TRAN on behalf of UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(TRAN, ELIZABETH)
June 19, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM J. ZAPALA on behalf of UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(ZAPALA, ADAM)
June 19, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by CHAD B. HOLTZMAN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(HOLTZMAN, CHAD)
June 19, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT G. EISLER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(EISLER, ROBERT)
June 15, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by V. CHAI OLIVER PRENTICE on behalf of SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA with Certificate of Service(PRENTICE, V.)
June 15, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN J MCEWAN on behalf of SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA with Certificate of Service(MCEWAN, RYAN)
June 15, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by DEMETRIUS X. LAMBRINOS on behalf of SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA with Certificate of Service(LAMBRINOS, DEMETRIUS)
June 15, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOMEDES S HERRERA on behalf of SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA with Certificate of Service(HERRERA, NICOMEDES)
June 15, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN N. WILLIAMS on behalf of SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA with Certificate of Service(WILLIAMS, STEVEN)
June 15, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH R. SAVERI on behalf of SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA with Certificate of Service(SAVERI, JOSEPH)
June 15, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by CHAD ALLEN CARDER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(CARDER, CHAD)
June 15, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY A. BARRACK on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(BARRACK, JEFFREY)
June 15, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(GITTLEMAN, JEFFREY)
June 14, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW J. PEREZ on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(PEREZ, MATTHEW)
June 14, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN ANN VANDERMEULEN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(VANDERMEULEN, ROBIN)
June 14, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by KARIN E. GARVEY on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(GARVEY, KARIN)
June 14, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. MCDONALD on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(MCDONALD, CHRISTOPHER)
June 14, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY L. HIMES on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(HIMES, JAY)
June 14, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY S. ASCIOLLA on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(ASCIOLLA, GREGORY)
June 14, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. VERRIER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH(VERRIER, KEITH) Modified on 6/15/2018 (rf, ).
June 14, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD J. SEDRAN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH(SEDRAN, HOWARD) Modified on 6/15/2018 (rf, ). Modified on 6/15/2018 (rf, ).
June 14, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by AUSTIN BLAIR COHEN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH (COHEN, AUSTIN) Modified on 6/15/2018 (rf, ).
June 14, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC H. EDELSON on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(EDELSON, MARC)
June 14, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by BONNIE ADELE KENDRICK on behalf of LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY (KENDRICK, BONNIE)
June 14, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS R. PLYMALE on behalf of LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY (PLYMALE, DOUGLAS)
June 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID S. SCALIA on behalf of LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY (SCALIA, DAVID)
June 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES R. DUGAN, II on behalf of LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY (DUGAN, JAMES)
June 14, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(ZAVAREEI, HASSAN)
June 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LAWLER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(LAWLER, DAVID)
June 14, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA N. SERVAIS on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(SERVAIS, JESSICA)
June 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by RENAE D. STEINER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(STEINER, RENAE)
June 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE C. ZOLNOSKI on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(ZOLNOSKI, MICHELLE)
June 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN DURBA on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(DURBA, ERIN)
June 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL M. BUCHMAN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(BUCHMAN, MICHAEL)
June 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAN DRACHLER on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(DRACHLER, DAN)
June 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH GENTILE on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(GENTILE, JOSEPH)
June 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RONEN SARRAF on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(SARRAF, RONEN)
June 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM PESSIN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH, with Certificate of Service.(PESSIN, ADAM) Modified on 6/12/2018 (md).
June 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL COSTA on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH, with Certificate of Service.(COSTA, PAUL) Modified on 6/12/2018 (md).
June 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. ISTVAN on behalf of 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH, with Certificate of Service.(ISTVAN, JEFFREY) Modified on 6/12/2018 (md).
June 7, 2018 Filing 2 END-PAYER CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED UNDER SEAL. JURY DEMAND. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(tjd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2018: #1 sealed document, #2 sealed document) (tjd, ).
June 7, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH. (rf, ) Modified on 6/12/2018 (md).
June 7, 2018 28 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMAECUTICALS CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. forwarded to Plaintiffs Counsel on 6/7/18. (rf, )
June 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE179667.), filed by 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND, UNITE HERE HEALTH, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS., JURY TRIAL DEMAND, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(rf, ) Modified on 6/12/2018 (md).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: ANDREW C BERNASCONI
Represented By: COURTNEY B AVERBACH
Represented By: EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM J SHERIDAN
Represented By: JENNIFER M DRISCOLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIVA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Represented By: JASON R. PARISH
Represented By: BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: JOHN J. PEASE
Represented By: J. GORDON COONEY, JR.
Represented By: MICHAELA DRAGALIN
Represented By: WILLIAM T MCENROE
Represented By: AMANDA B. ROBINSON
Represented By: ALISON TANCHYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC .
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJIV MALIK
Represented By: ROBERT J. CLEARY
Represented By: EDWARD J. CANTER
Represented By: DAVID A. MUNKITTRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN T. FEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MELINA R. DIMATTIO
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Represented By: ANDREW S WELLIN
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.
Represented By: TRACEY F MILICH
Represented By: J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR.
Represented By: FRANK DESIMONE
Represented By: HARVEY BARTLE, IV
Represented By: SCOTT A. STEMPEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC.
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: JAMES T. MCKEOWN
Represented By: JOHN F. NAGLE
Represented By: JAMES W. MATTHEWS
Represented By: ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA LLC
Represented By: JOHN MCCLAM
Represented By: STEVEN E. BIZAR
Represented By: TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD PHARMAECUTICALS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ
Represented By: LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE
Represented By: KENN BROTMAN
Represented By: STEVEN M KOWAL
Represented By: BRIAN J SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Represented By: JEFFREY A. CARR
Represented By: JAN P. LEVINE
Represented By: ROBIN P. SUMNER
Represented By: MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN
Represented By: CONNIE LEE
Represented By: DENNIE BENJIMAN ZASTROW
Represented By: MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MCDONALD
Represented By: JOSEPH J. TABACCO, JR.
Represented By: HOWARD J. SEDRAN
Represented By: JEFFREY S. ISTVAN
Represented By: ROBIN ANN VANDERMEULEN
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. KRAMER
Represented By: JORDAN ELIAS
Represented By: ADAM PESSIN
Represented By: JEFFREY A. BARRACK
Represented By: ROBERT G. EISLER
Represented By: STEVEN J. GREENFOGEL
Represented By: KAREN HANSON RIEBEL
Represented By: ERIN DURBA
Represented By: STEPHANIE Y CHO
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: ANNA M HORNING NYGREN
Represented By: JOHN E. SINDONI
Represented By: GREGORY S. ASCIOLLA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BONI
Represented By: JEANNINE M. KENNEY
Represented By: ARIELLE S. WAGNER
Represented By: CHRISTINA SHARP
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: CHAD B. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: CHAD ALLEN CARDER
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: JAY L. HIMES
Represented By: ADAM C. BELSKY
Represented By: MICHAEL P. LEHMANN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. HEFFELFINGER
Represented By: KEITH J. VERRIER
Represented By: MARC H. EDELSON
Represented By: MATTHEW J. PEREZ
Represented By: JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN
Represented By: SATHYA S. GOSSELIN
Represented By: TODD A. SEAVER
Represented By: SCOTT ALLAN MARTIN
Represented By: PAUL COSTA
Represented By: JASON S. HARTLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH GENTILE
Represented By: SCOTT M. GRZENCZYK
Represented By: BONNY SWEENEY
Represented By: MICHAEL M. BUCHMAN
Represented By: COLLEEN L. CLEARY
Represented By: RONEN SARRAF
Represented By: RENAE D. STEINER
Represented By: KARIN E. GARVEY
Represented By: DAVID LAWLER
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: W. JOSEPH BRUCKNER
Represented By: HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI
Represented By: HEIDI M SILTON
Represented By: TERRY GROSS
Represented By: IRVING SCHER
Represented By: ERIK L. SHAWN
Represented By: KRISTEN G MARTTILA
Represented By: LIBERATO P. VERDERAME
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SNYDER
Represented By: JESSICA N. SERVAIS
Represented By: AUSTIN BLAIR COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATON OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MCDONALD
Represented By: JOSEPH J. TABACCO, JR.
Represented By: JEFFREY S. ISTVAN
Represented By: ROBIN ANN VANDERMEULEN
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. KRAMER
Represented By: JORDAN ELIAS
Represented By: ADAM PESSIN
Represented By: JEFFREY A. BARRACK
Represented By: ROBERT G. EISLER
Represented By: STEVEN J. GREENFOGEL
Represented By: KAREN HANSON RIEBEL
Represented By: ERIN DURBA
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: ANNA M HORNING NYGREN
Represented By: JOHN E. SINDONI
Represented By: HOWARD J. SEDRAN
Represented By: JOSEPH R. SAVERI
Represented By: GREGORY S. ASCIOLLA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BONI
Represented By: ARIELLE S. WAGNER
Represented By: CHRISTINA SHARP
Represented By: DEMETRIUS X. LAMBRINOS
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: CHAD B. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: CHAD ALLEN CARDER
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: JAY L. HIMES
Represented By: ADAM C. BELSKY
Represented By: RYAN J MCEWAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. HEFFELFINGER
Represented By: KEITH J. VERRIER
Represented By: MARC H. EDELSON
Represented By: MATTHEW J. PEREZ
Represented By: NICOMEDES S HERRERA
Represented By: JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN
Represented By: TODD A. SEAVER
Represented By: PAUL COSTA
Represented By: JASON S. HARTLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH GENTILE
Represented By: SCOTT M. GRZENCZYK
Represented By: MICHAEL M. BUCHMAN
Represented By: COLLEEN L. CLEARY
Represented By: RONEN SARRAF
Represented By: RENAE D. STEINER
Represented By: KARIN E. GARVEY
Represented By: DAVID LAWLER
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: W. JOSEPH BRUCKNER
Represented By: HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI
Represented By: STEVEN N. WILLIAMS
Represented By: HEIDI M SILTON
Represented By: TERRY GROSS
Represented By: ERIK L. SHAWN
Represented By: KRISTEN G MARTTILA
Represented By: LIBERATO P. VERDERAME
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SNYDER
Represented By: JESSICA N. SERVAIS
Represented By: AUSTIN BLAIR COHEN
Represented By: V. CHAI OLIVER PRENTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1199SEIU LICENSED PRATICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1199SEIU GREATER NEW YORK BENEFIT FUND
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MCDONALD
Represented By: JOSEPH J. TABACCO, JR.
Represented By: JEFFREY S. ISTVAN
Represented By: ROBIN ANN VANDERMEULEN
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. KRAMER
Represented By: JORDAN ELIAS
Represented By: ADAM PESSIN
Represented By: JEFFREY A. BARRACK
Represented By: ROBERT G. EISLER
Represented By: STEVEN J. GREENFOGEL
Represented By: KAREN HANSON RIEBEL
Represented By: ERIN DURBA
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: ANNA M HORNING NYGREN
Represented By: JOHN E. SINDONI
Represented By: HOWARD J. SEDRAN
Represented By: GREGORY S. ASCIOLLA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BONI
Represented By: ARIELLE S. WAGNER
Represented By: CHRISTINA SHARP
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: CHAD B. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: CHAD ALLEN CARDER
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: JAY L. HIMES
Represented By: ADAM C. BELSKY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. HEFFELFINGER
Represented By: KEITH J. VERRIER
Represented By: MARC H. EDELSON
Represented By: MATTHEW J. PEREZ
Represented By: JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN
Represented By: TODD A. SEAVER
Represented By: PAUL COSTA
Represented By: JASON S. HARTLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH GENTILE
Represented By: SCOTT M. GRZENCZYK
Represented By: MICHAEL M. BUCHMAN
Represented By: COLLEEN L. CLEARY
Represented By: RONEN SARRAF
Represented By: RENAE D. STEINER
Represented By: KARIN E. GARVEY
Represented By: DAVID LAWLER
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: W. JOSEPH BRUCKNER
Represented By: HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI
Represented By: HEIDI M SILTON
Represented By: TERRY GROSS
Represented By: ERIK L. SHAWN
Represented By: KRISTEN G MARTTILA
Represented By: LIBERATO P. VERDERAME
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SNYDER
Represented By: JESSICA N. SERVAIS
Represented By: AUSTIN BLAIR COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1199SEIU NATIONAL BENEFIT FUND FOR HOME CARE WORKERS
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MCDONALD
Represented By: JOSEPH J. TABACCO, JR.
Represented By: JEFFREY S. ISTVAN
Represented By: ROBIN ANN VANDERMEULEN
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. KRAMER
Represented By: JORDAN ELIAS
Represented By: ADAM PESSIN
Represented By: JEFFREY A. BARRACK
Represented By: ROBERT G. EISLER
Represented By: STEVEN J. GREENFOGEL
Represented By: KAREN HANSON RIEBEL
Represented By: ERIN DURBA
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: ANNA M HORNING NYGREN
Represented By: JOHN E. SINDONI
Represented By: HOWARD J. SEDRAN
Represented By: GREGORY S. ASCIOLLA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BONI
Represented By: ARIELLE S. WAGNER
Represented By: CHRISTINA SHARP
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: CHAD B. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: CHAD ALLEN CARDER
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: JAY L. HIMES
Represented By: ADAM C. BELSKY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. HEFFELFINGER
Represented By: KEITH J. VERRIER
Represented By: MARC H. EDELSON
Represented By: MATTHEW J. PEREZ
Represented By: JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN
Represented By: TODD A. SEAVER
Represented By: PAUL COSTA
Represented By: JASON S. HARTLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH GENTILE
Represented By: SCOTT M. GRZENCZYK
Represented By: MICHAEL M. BUCHMAN
Represented By: COLLEEN L. CLEARY
Represented By: RONEN SARRAF
Represented By: RENAE D. STEINER
Represented By: KARIN E. GARVEY
Represented By: DAVID LAWLER
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: W. JOSEPH BRUCKNER
Represented By: HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI
Represented By: HEIDI M SILTON
Represented By: TERRY GROSS
Represented By: ERIK L. SHAWN
Represented By: KRISTEN G MARTTILA
Represented By: LIBERATO P. VERDERAME
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SNYDER
Represented By: JESSICA N. SERVAIS
Represented By: AUSTIN BLAIR COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITE HERE HEALTH
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Represented By: ADAM J. ZAPALA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MCDONALD
Represented By: JOSEPH J. TABACCO, JR.
Represented By: JEFFREY S. ISTVAN
Represented By: ROBIN ANN VANDERMEULEN
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. KRAMER
Represented By: JORDAN ELIAS
Represented By: ADAM PESSIN
Represented By: JEFFREY A. BARRACK
Represented By: ROBERT G. EISLER
Represented By: STEVEN J. GREENFOGEL
Represented By: KAREN HANSON RIEBEL
Represented By: ALEXANDER E. BARNETT
Represented By: ERIN DURBA
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: ANNA M HORNING NYGREN
Represented By: JOHN E. SINDONI
Represented By: HOWARD J. SEDRAN
Represented By: GREGORY S. ASCIOLLA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BONI
Represented By: ARIELLE S. WAGNER
Represented By: CHRISTINA SHARP
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: CHAD B. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: ELIZABETH T. TRAN
Represented By: CHAD ALLEN CARDER
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: JAY L. HIMES
Represented By: ADAM C. BELSKY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. HEFFELFINGER
Represented By: KEITH J. VERRIER
Represented By: MARC H. EDELSON
Represented By: MATTHEW J. PEREZ
Represented By: JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN
Represented By: TODD A. SEAVER
Represented By: PAUL COSTA
Represented By: JASON S. HARTLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH GENTILE
Represented By: SCOTT M. GRZENCZYK
Represented By: MICHAEL M. BUCHMAN
Represented By: COLLEEN L. CLEARY
Represented By: RONEN SARRAF
Represented By: RENAE D. STEINER
Represented By: KARIN E. GARVEY
Represented By: DAVID LAWLER
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: W. JOSEPH BRUCKNER
Represented By: HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI
Represented By: HEIDI M SILTON
Represented By: TERRY GROSS
Represented By: ERIK L. SHAWN
Represented By: KRISTEN G MARTTILA
Represented By: LIBERATO P. VERDERAME
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SNYDER
Represented By: JESSICA N. SERVAIS
Represented By: AUSTIN BLAIR COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY D/B/A BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF LOUISIAN AND HOME LOUISIANA, INC.
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MCDONALD
Represented By: JOSEPH J. TABACCO, JR.
Represented By: DAVID TAYLOR RUDOLPH
Represented By: JEFFREY S. ISTVAN
Represented By: ELIZABETH JOAN CABRASER
Represented By: ROBIN ANN VANDERMEULEN
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. KRAMER
Represented By: JORDAN ELIAS
Represented By: ADAM PESSIN
Represented By: JEFFREY A. BARRACK
Represented By: ROBERT G. EISLER
Represented By: STEVEN J. GREENFOGEL
Represented By: KAREN HANSON RIEBEL
Represented By: ERIN DURBA
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: DEAN M. HARVEY
Represented By: ANNA M HORNING NYGREN
Represented By: JOHN E. SINDONI
Represented By: HOWARD J. SEDRAN
Represented By: GREGORY S. ASCIOLLA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BONI
Represented By: ARIELLE S. WAGNER
Represented By: CHRISTINA SHARP
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: CHAD B. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: CHAD ALLEN CARDER
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: JAY L. HIMES
Represented By: ADAM C. BELSKY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. HEFFELFINGER
Represented By: KEITH J. VERRIER
Represented By: MARC H. EDELSON
Represented By: MATTHEW J. PEREZ
Represented By: JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN
Represented By: TODD A. SEAVER
Represented By: PAUL COSTA
Represented By: JASON S. HARTLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH GENTILE
Represented By: SCOTT M. GRZENCZYK
Represented By: BRUCE W. LEPPLA
Represented By: MICHAEL M. BUCHMAN
Represented By: COLLEEN L. CLEARY
Represented By: MICHELLE LAMY
Represented By: RONEN SARRAF
Represented By: RENAE D. STEINER
Represented By: KARIN E. GARVEY
Represented By: DAVID LAWLER
Represented By: LAURA B. HEIMAN
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: W. JOSEPH BRUCKNER
Represented By: HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI
Represented By: HEIDI M SILTON
Represented By: TERRY GROSS
Represented By: ERIK L. SHAWN
Represented By: KRISTEN G MARTTILA
Represented By: LIBERATO P. VERDERAME
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SNYDER
Represented By: JESSICA N. SERVAIS
Represented By: AUSTIN BLAIR COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MCDONALD
Represented By: JOSEPH J. TABACCO, JR.
Represented By: JEFFREY S. ISTVAN
Represented By: ROBIN ANN VANDERMEULEN
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. KRAMER
Represented By: JORDAN ELIAS
Represented By: ADAM PESSIN
Represented By: JEFFREY A. BARRACK
Represented By: ROBERT G. EISLER
Represented By: STEVEN J. GREENFOGEL
Represented By: KAREN HANSON RIEBEL
Represented By: ERIN DURBA
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: ANNA M HORNING NYGREN
Represented By: JOHN E. SINDONI
Represented By: HOWARD J. SEDRAN
Represented By: GREGORY S. ASCIOLLA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BONI
Represented By: ARIELLE S. WAGNER
Represented By: CHRISTINA SHARP
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: CHAD B. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: CHAD ALLEN CARDER
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: JAY L. HIMES
Represented By: ADAM C. BELSKY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. HEFFELFINGER
Represented By: BONNIE ADELE KENDRICK
Represented By: KEITH J. VERRIER
Represented By: MATTHEW J. PEREZ
Represented By: JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN
Represented By: DAVID S. SCALIA
Represented By: TODD A. SEAVER
Represented By: PAUL COSTA
Represented By: JASON S. HARTLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH GENTILE
Represented By: SCOTT M. GRZENCZYK
Represented By: MICHAEL M. BUCHMAN
Represented By: DOUGLAS R. PLYMALE
Represented By: COLLEEN L. CLEARY
Represented By: RONEN SARRAF
Represented By: RENAE D. STEINER
Represented By: KARIN E. GARVEY
Represented By: DAVID LAWLER
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: W. JOSEPH BRUCKNER
Represented By: HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI
Represented By: HEIDI M SILTON
Represented By: TERRY GROSS
Represented By: ERIK L. SHAWN
Represented By: KRISTEN G MARTTILA
Represented By: LIBERATO P. VERDERAME
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SNYDER
Represented By: JAMES R. DUGAN, II
Represented By: JESSICA N. SERVAIS
Represented By: AUSTIN BLAIR COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1199SEIU LICENSED PRACTICAL NURSES WELFARE FUND
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MCDONALD
Represented By: JOSEPH J. TABACCO, JR.
Represented By: JEFFREY S. ISTVAN
Represented By: ROBIN ANN VANDERMEULEN
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. KRAMER
Represented By: JORDAN ELIAS
Represented By: ADAM PESSIN
Represented By: JEFFREY A. BARRACK
Represented By: ROBERT G. EISLER
Represented By: STEVEN J. GREENFOGEL
Represented By: KAREN HANSON RIEBEL
Represented By: ERIN DURBA
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: ANNA M HORNING NYGREN
Represented By: JOHN E. SINDONI
Represented By: HOWARD J. SEDRAN
Represented By: GREGORY S. ASCIOLLA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BONI
Represented By: ARIELLE S. WAGNER
Represented By: CHRISTINA SHARP
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: CHAD B. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: CHAD ALLEN CARDER
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: JAY L. HIMES
Represented By: ADAM C. BELSKY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. HEFFELFINGER
Represented By: KEITH J. VERRIER
Represented By: MARC H. EDELSON
Represented By: MATTHEW J. PEREZ
Represented By: JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN
Represented By: TODD A. SEAVER
Represented By: PAUL COSTA
Represented By: JASON S. HARTLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH GENTILE
Represented By: SCOTT M. GRZENCZYK
Represented By: MICHAEL M. BUCHMAN
Represented By: COLLEEN L. CLEARY
Represented By: RONEN SARRAF
Represented By: RENAE D. STEINER
Represented By: KARIN E. GARVEY
Represented By: DAVID LAWLER
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: W. JOSEPH BRUCKNER
Represented By: HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI
Represented By: HEIDI M SILTON
Represented By: TERRY GROSS
Represented By: ERIK L. SHAWN
Represented By: KRISTEN G MARTTILA
Represented By: LIBERATO P. VERDERAME
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SNYDER
Represented By: JESSICA N. SERVAIS
Represented By: AUSTIN BLAIR COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MCDONALD
Represented By: JOSEPH J. TABACCO, JR.
Represented By: JEFFREY S. ISTVAN
Represented By: ROBIN ANN VANDERMEULEN
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. KRAMER
Represented By: JORDAN ELIAS
Represented By: ADAM PESSIN
Represented By: JEFFREY A. BARRACK
Represented By: ROBERT G. EISLER
Represented By: STEVEN J. GREENFOGEL
Represented By: KAREN HANSON RIEBEL
Represented By: ERIN DURBA
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: ANNA M HORNING NYGREN
Represented By: JOHN E. SINDONI
Represented By: HOWARD J. SEDRAN
Represented By: GREGORY S. ASCIOLLA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BONI
Represented By: ARIELLE S. WAGNER
Represented By: CHRISTINA SHARP
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: CHAD B. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: CHAD ALLEN CARDER
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: JAY L. HIMES
Represented By: ADAM C. BELSKY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. HEFFELFINGER
Represented By: KEITH J. VERRIER
Represented By: MARC H. EDELSON
Represented By: MATTHEW J. PEREZ
Represented By: JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN
Represented By: TODD A. SEAVER
Represented By: PAUL COSTA
Represented By: JASON S. HARTLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH GENTILE
Represented By: SCOTT M. GRZENCZYK
Represented By: MICHAEL M. BUCHMAN
Represented By: COLLEEN L. CLEARY
Represented By: RONEN SARRAF
Represented By: RENAE D. STEINER
Represented By: KARIN E. GARVEY
Represented By: DAVID LAWLER
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: W. JOSEPH BRUCKNER
Represented By: HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI
Represented By: HEIDI M SILTON
Represented By: TERRY GROSS
Represented By: ERIK L. SHAWN
Represented By: KRISTEN G MARTTILA
Represented By: LIBERATO P. VERDERAME
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SNYDER
Represented By: JESSICA N. SERVAIS
Represented By: AUSTIN BLAIR COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?