WEST VAL PHARMACY et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Plaintiff: WEST VAL PHARMACY, RUSSELL'S MR. DISCOUNT DRUGS, INC., CHET JOHNSON DRUG, INC., DEAL DRUG PHARMACY, FALCONER PHARMACY, INC., HALLIDAY'S & KOIVISTO'S PHARMACY, CHET JOHNSON DRUG, FALCONER PHARMACY and RUSSELL'S MR. DISCOUNT DRUGS
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL., INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC., RAJIV MALIK, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, APOTEX CORP., CITRON PHARMA LLC, MYLAN INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., MAYNE PHARMA INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. and MYLAN PHAMACEUTICALS, INC.
In Re: GENERIC PHARMACEUTICALS PRICING ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv02533
Filed: June 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 14, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by COURTNEY B AVERBACH on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(AVERBACH, COURTNEY)
May 14, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J SHERIDAN on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHERIDAN, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER M DRISCOLL on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRISCOLL, JENNIFER)
May 14, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW C BERNASCONI on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(BERNASCONI, ANDREW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHWARTZ, EDWARD)
May 14, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL)
May 8, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET)
May 8, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA C CROUSHORE on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(CROUSHORE, AMANDA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN on behalf of DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHMIDTLEIN, JOHN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH F. TEICH on behalf of DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(TEICH, SARAH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (IRPs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Brief) filed by WEST VAL PHARMACY. (GIL-MONTLLOR, PETER)
May 2, 2019 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by WEST VAL PHARMACY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CUNEO, JONATHAN)
May 2, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. filed by WEST VAL PHARMACY. (CUNEO, JONATHAN)
May 2, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by WEST VAL PHARMACY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CUNEO, JONATHAN)
May 2, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Dismiss THE OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS FILED BY END-PAYER PLAINTIFFS, INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS, KROGER PLAINTIFFS, AND HUMANA, INC. filed by WEST VAL PHARMACY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CUNEO, JONATHAN)
May 2, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by WEST VAL PHARMACY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CUNEO, JONATHAN)
May 2, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED-COUNTS ONE THROUGH FOUR OF THE INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by WEST VAL PHARMACY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CUNEO, JONATHAN)
May 2, 2019 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by WEST VAL PHARMACY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(CUNEO, JONATHAN)
April 30, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
April 29, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KULIK, SARAH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BENJAMIN P. ARGYLE on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(ARGYLE, BENJAMIN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by THOMAS J. WELLING on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(WELLING, THOMAS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LISA JOSE FALES on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(FALES, LISA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DANIELLE R. FOLEY on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(FOLEY, DANIELLE)
April 10, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN LEMMO on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(LEMMO, ANN)
April 9, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY S. FOUSE on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(FOUSE, LINDSAY)
April 8, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI)
April 5, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JAMES DOUGLAS BALDRIDGE on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(BALDRIDGE, JAMES)
April 1, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(WILSON, CHIRSTOPHER)
April 1, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by S TURNER on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(TURNER, S)
April 1, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK THOMAS KOONS on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(KOONS, ERIK)
April 1, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MARTIN TALADAY on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(TALADAY, JOHN)
March 6, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. MUNKITTRICK on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(MUNKITTRICK, DAVID)
March 6, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. CANTER on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(CANTER, EDWARD)
March 1, 2019 Filing 59 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHAMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC..Certificate of Service.(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 28, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID)
February 28, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON)
February 28, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KASOWITZ, MARC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by J. GORDON COONEY, JR on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(COONEY, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. PEASE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(PEASE, JOHN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA B. ROBINSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROBINSON, AMANDA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T MCENROE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCENROE, WILLIAM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAELA DRAGALIN on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRAGALIN, MICHAELA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON TANCHYK on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TANCHYK, ALISON)
February 26, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MCCLAM on behalf of CITRON PHARMA LLC with Certificate of Service(MCCLAM, JOHN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL on behalf of CITRON PHARMA LLC with Certificate of Service(ENGSELL, TIFFANY)
February 26, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN E. BIZAR on behalf of CITRON PHARMA LLC with Certificate of Service(BIZAR, STEVEN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by MELINA R. DIMATTIO on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(DIMATTIO, MELINA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S WELLIN on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(WELLIN, ANDREW)
February 21, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(EVERETT, J.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON R. PARISH on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC. with Certificate of Service(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC. with Certificate of Service(KITLOWSKI, BRADLEY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHAMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAPMAN, JULIA) (Main Document 37 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss THE OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS FILED BY END-PAYER PLAINTIFFS, INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS, KROGER PLAINTIFFS, AND HUMANA, INC. filed by WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. Memorandum of Law in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(LEVINE, JAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by APOTEX CORP..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 21, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED-COUNTS ONE THROUGH FOUR OF THE INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARTH, GERALD)
February 21, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by MAYNE PHARMA INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. CLEARY on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(CLEARY, ROBERT)
February 21, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIE BENJIMAN ZASTROW on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(ZASTROW, DENNIE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by CONNIE LEE on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(LEE, CONNIE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
February 21, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(HARTMAN, MICHAEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY A. CARR on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(CARR, JEFFREY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN P. SUMNER on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(SUMNER, ROBIN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by JAN P. LEVINE on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(LEVINE, JAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by R. BRENDAN FEE on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(FEE, R.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. REED on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA CHAPMAN on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK DESIMONE on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(DESIMONE, FRANK)
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by HARVEY BARTLE, IV on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(BARTLE, HARVEY)
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by TRACEY F MILICH on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(MILICH, TRACEY)
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. STEMPEL on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEMPEL, SCOTT)
February 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(EVERETT, J.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
February 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN M KOWAL on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(KOWAL, STEVEN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(DONAHUE, LAUREN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KENN BROTMAN on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(BROTMAN, KENN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J SMITH on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(SMITH, BRIAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN F. NAGLE on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(NAGLE, JOHN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(HAAS, ELIZABETH)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES T. MCKEOWN on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MCKEOWN, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES W. MATTHEWS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS AMENDED OVERARCHING COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHAMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC., filed by WEST VAL PHARMACY, CHET JOHNSON DRUG, FALCONER PHARMACY, HALLIDAY'S & KOIVISTO'S PHARMACY.(ems)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE STIPULATING DEFENDANTS TO MOVE AGAINST, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO INDIRECT RESELLER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS ADJOURNED PURSUANT TO THE PROCEDURE SET FORTH IN PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 51. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/4/2018. 9/4/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 694 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CHET JOHNSON DRUG, DEAL DRUG PHARMACY, WEST VAL PHARMACY, FALCONER PHARMACY, HALLIDAY'S & KOIVISTO'S PHARMACY, RUSSELL'S MR. DISCOUNT DRUGS.(jl, ) Modified on 6/25/2018 (ems).
June 18, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHET JOHNSON DRUG, DEAL DRUG PHARMACY, FALCONER PHARMACY, HALLIDAY'S & KOIVISTO'S PHARMACY, RUSSELL'S MR. DISCOUNT DRUGS, WEST VAL PHARMACY. (jl, )
June 18, 2018 28 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WEST VAL PHARMACY, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. Forwarded To: PETER GIL-MONTLLOR on 6/18/18 (jl, ) Modified on 6/25/2018 (ems).
June 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REEDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE180059.), filed by WEST VAL PHARMACY, DEAL DRUG PHARMACY, RUSSELL'S MR. DISCOUNT DRUGS, CHET JOHNSON DRUG, FALCONER PHARMACY, HALLIDAY'S & KOIVISTO'S PHARMACY, JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 CASE MANAGEMENT FORMS)(jl, ) Modified on 6/25/2018 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEST VAL PHARMACY et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J SHERIDAN
Represented By: ANDREW C BERNASCONI
Represented By: COURTNEY B AVERBACH
Represented By: JENNIFER M DRISCOLL
Represented By: EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIVA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: ALISON TANCHYK
Represented By: MICHAELA DRAGALIN
Represented By: WILLIAM T MCENROE
Represented By: JOHN J. PEASE
Represented By: J. GORDON COONEY, JR.
Represented By: AMANDA B. ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.
Represented By: HARVEY BARTLE, IV
Represented By: TRACEY F MILICH
Represented By: J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR.
Represented By: SCOTT A. STEMPEL
Represented By: FRANK DESIMONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN T. FEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Represented By: MELINA R. DIMATTIO
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Represented By: ANDREW S WELLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND., INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.
Represented By: JASON R. PARISH
Represented By: BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJIV MALIK
Represented By: EDWARD J. CANTER
Represented By: ROBERT J. CLEARY
Represented By: DAVID A. MUNKITTRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: JOHN F. NAGLE
Represented By: JAMES T. MCKEOWN
Represented By: JAMES W. MATTHEWS
Represented By: ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA LLC
Represented By: TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL
Represented By: STEVEN E. BIZAR
Represented By: JOHN MCCLAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Represented By: JAN P. LEVINE
Represented By: JEFFREY A. CARR
Represented By: DENNIE BENJIMAN ZASTROW
Represented By: MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN
Represented By: CONNIE LEE
Represented By: MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL
Represented By: ROBIN P. SUMNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC.
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA INC.
Represented By: STEVEN M KOWAL
Represented By: BRIAN J SMITH
Represented By: KENN BROTMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ
Represented By: LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHAMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: GENERIC PHARMACEUTICALS PRICING ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST VAL PHARMACY
Represented By: PETER GIL-MONTLLOR
Represented By: JONATHAN W. CUNEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL'S MR. DISCOUNT DRUGS, INC.
Represented By: PETER GIL-MONTLLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHET JOHNSON DRUG, INC.
Represented By: PETER GIL-MONTLLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEAL DRUG PHARMACY
Represented By: PETER GIL-MONTLLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FALCONER PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By: PETER GIL-MONTLLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HALLIDAY'S & KOIVISTO'S PHARMACY
Represented By: PETER GIL-MONTLLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHET JOHNSON DRUG
Represented By: PETER GIL-MONTLLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FALCONER PHARMACY
Represented By: PETER GIL-MONTLLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL'S MR. DISCOUNT DRUGS
Represented By: PETER GIL-MONTLLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?