AHOLD USA, INC. et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Plaintiff: AHOLD USA, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC. and KINNEY DRUGS
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., SANDOZ, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC., RAJIV MALIK, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., CITRON PHARMA LLC, MYLAN INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. and AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02641
Filed: June 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by KARL E. HERRMANN on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(HERRMANN, KARL)
September 23, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by DIETRICH L. SNELL on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(SNELL, DIETRICH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MATTHEW C LAMB on behalf of OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC(LAMB, MATTHEW)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/15/2019. 7/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1071 IN 16-MD-2724)
August 15, 2019 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/15/2019. 8/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1070 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by APOTEX CORP.. (MATTHEWS, JAMES)
June 13, 2019 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.. (EVERETT, J.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 113 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (REED, STEVEN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 112 REPLY to Response to Motion re #64 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. (CHAPMAN, JULIA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [CORRECTED] Impax Laboratories Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs', Kroger Plaintiffs', and Humana's Amended Complaints filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.. (JACOBSEN, RAYMOND)
June 13, 2019 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser and Kroger Plaintiffs' Complaints filed by G&W LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SULLIVAN, MARGUERITE)
June 13, 2019 Filing 109 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. (PARISH, JASON)
June 13, 2019 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC.. (ARTH, GERALD)
June 13, 2019 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss (Direct Purchasers' First Amended Complaint and Kroger Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint) filed by OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC. (LAMB, MATTHEW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by COURTNEY B AVERBACH on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(AVERBACH, COURTNEY)
May 14, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J SHERIDAN on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHERIDAN, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER M DRISCOLL on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRISCOLL, JENNIFER)
May 14, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW C BERNASCONI on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(BERNASCONI, ANDREW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHWARTZ, EDWARD)
May 8, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL)
May 8, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET)
May 8, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA C CROUSHORE on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(CROUSHORE, AMANDA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHMIDTLEIN, JOHN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH F. TEICH on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(TEICH, SARAH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 93 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO VALEANT AND OCEANSIDE'S MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASER AND KROGER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS. (RELATES TO CIVIL ACTION NOS. 18-2641 AND 18-284) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 92 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO IMPAX LABORATORIES INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASER, KROGER, AND HUMANA COMPLAINTS filed by PLAINTIFFS. (RELATES TO 18-2641, 18-284, 18-3299) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 91 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT G & W LABORATORIES INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASER AND KROGER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS filed by PLAINTIFFS. (RELATES TO CIVIL ACTION NOS. 18-2641, 18-284) (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS filed by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [CORRECTED] Impax Laboratories Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs', Kroger Plaintiffs', and Humana's Amended Complaints filed by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser and Kroger Plaintiffs' Complaints filed by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (NAST, DIANNE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
April 29, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KULIK, SARAH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BENJAMIN P. ARGYLE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(ARGYLE, BENJAMIN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by THOMAS J. WELLING on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(WELLING, THOMAS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LISA JOSE FALES on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(FALES, LISA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DANIELLE R. FOLEY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(FOLEY, DANIELLE)
April 10, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN LEMMO on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(LEMMO, ANN)
April 9, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY S. FOUSE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(FOUSE, LINDSAY)
April 8, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI)
April 5, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JAMES DOUGLAS BALDRIDGE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(BALDRIDGE, JAMES)
April 1, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(WILSON, CHIRSTOPHER)
April 1, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by S TURNER on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(TURNER, S)
April 1, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK THOMAS KOONS on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(KOONS, ERIK)
April 1, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MARTIN TALADAY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(TALADAY, JOHN)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION AS TO THE DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS AGAINST IMPAX LABORATORIES REGARDING GLYBURIDE-METFORMIN AS SHOWN ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT, IS APPROVED. DPP'S ALLEGATIONS AND CLAIMS AGAINST IMPAX REGARDING GLYBURIDE-METFORMIN ARE WITHDRAWN. IMPAX IS ALSO WITHDRAWN AS A NAMED GENERIC MANUFACTURER DEFENDANT FOR GLYBURIDE-METFORMIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/11/2019. 3/12/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO.910 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. MUNKITTRICK on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(MUNKITTRICK, DAVID)
March 6, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. CANTER on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(CANTER, EDWARD)
March 1, 2019 Filing 64 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC..Certificate of Service.(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 28, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID)
February 28, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON)
February 28, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. with Certificate of Service(KASOWITZ, MARC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by J. GORDON COONEY, JR on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(COONEY, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. PEASE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(PEASE, JOHN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA B. ROBINSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROBINSON, AMANDA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T MCENROE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCENROE, WILLIAM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAELA DRAGALIN on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRAGALIN, MICHAELA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON TANCHYK on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TANCHYK, ALISON)
February 26, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MCCLAM on behalf of CITRON PHARMA LLC with Certificate fo Service(MCCLAM, JOHN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL on behalf of CITRON PHARMA LLC with Certificate of Service(ENGSELL, TIFFANY)
February 26, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN E. BIZAR on behalf of CITRON PHARMA LLC with Certificate of Service(BIZAR, STEVEN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by MELINA R. DIMATTIO on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(DIMATTIO, MELINA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S WELLIN on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(WELLIN, ANDREW)
February 22, 2019 Filing 46 VALEANT AND OCEANSIDES MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASERS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND KROGER PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC.MEMORANDUM OF LAW, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(SEE DOC NO. 876 IN 16-MD-2724)(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (kp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2019: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit EX 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (kp, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [CORRECTED] Impax Laboratories Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs', Kroger Plaintiffs', and Humana's Amended Complaints filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(JACOBSEN, RAYMOND)
February 21, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(EVERETT, J.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 43 FILED IN ERROR, ATTORNEY FILED CORRECTED MOTION AT #45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs', Kroger Plaintiffs', and Humana's Amended Complaints) filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum (Redacted), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(JACOBSEN, RAYMOND) Modified on 2/22/2019 (kp, ). Modified on 2/22/2019 (kp, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON R. PARISH on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC. with Certificate of Service(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC. with Certificate of Service(KITLOWSKI, BRADLEY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAPMAN, JULIA) (Main Document 39 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser and Kroger Plaintiffs' Complaints filed by G&W LABORATORIES, INC..Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant G&W Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser and Kroger Plaintiffs' Complaints, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SULLIVAN, MARGUERITE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by APOTEX CORP..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 21, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARTH, GERALD)
February 21, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. CLEARY on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(CLEARY, ROBERT)
February 21, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss (Direct Purchasers' First Amended Complaint and Kroger Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint) filed by OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC.Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Valeant and Oceanside's Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchasers' First Amended Complaint and Kroger Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, Declaration of Jay D. Smith in Support of Valeant and Oceanside's Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchasers' First Amended Complaint and Kroger Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jay D. Smith, #2 Exhibit 1 to Jay D. Smith Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LAMB, MATTHEW)
February 21, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by R. BRENDAN FEE on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(FEE, R.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. REED on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA CHAPMAN on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK DESIMONE on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(DESIMONE, FRANK)
February 20, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by HARVEY BARTLE, IV on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(BARTLE, HARVEY)
February 20, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by TRACEY F MILICH on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(MILICH, TRACEY)
February 20, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. STEMPEL on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEMPEL, SCOTT)
February 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(EVERETT, J.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN F. NAGLE on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(NAGLE, JOHN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(HAAS, ELIZABETH)
February 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES T. MCKEOWN on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MCKEOWN, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES W. MATTHEWS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
January 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNA M. RATHBUN on behalf of G&W LABORATORIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(RATHBUN, ANNA)
January 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGUERITE M. SULLIVAN on behalf of G&W LABORATORIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(SULLIVAN, MARGUERITE)
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW C LAMB on behalf of OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC with Certificate of Service(LAMB, MATTHEW)
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD STEIN on behalf of OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC with Certificate of Service(STEIN, GERALD)
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A. ROBERTSON on behalf of OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC with Certificate of Service(ROBERTSON, MARK)
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN on behalf of OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC with Certificate of Service(ADELSTEIN, ROBIN)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 DIRECT PURCHASERS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2018: #1 Sealed Document) (ems).
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 DIRECT PURCHASERS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC., filed by KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (ems)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel on Global Issues filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.. (HANSELMAN, DAVID)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery with Certificate of Service filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(HANSELMAN, DAVID)
October 1, 2018 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.(SEE PAPER #8 FOR PDF)(md)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.. (JACOBSEN, RAYMOND) Modified on 10/2/2018 (kp, ).
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery filed by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED SECOND STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING ON IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION TO LIMIT DISCOVERY IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/24/2018. 9/24/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 713 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING ON IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION TO LIMIT DISCOVERY IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/10/2018. 9/10/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 707 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE STIPULATING DEFENDANTS TO MOVE AGAINST, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS ADJOURNED PURSUANT TO THE PROCEDURE SET FORTH IN PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 51. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/4/2018. 9/4/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 695 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Limit Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20)(HANSELMAN, DAVID)
June 22, 2018 Filing 2 DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2018: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document, #4 Sealed Document, #5 Sealed Document) (ems).
June 22, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (jwl, )
June 22, 2018 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. 24 Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/25/18 (jwl, )
June 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 180323.), filed by KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., AHOLD USA, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Form, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(jwl, ) Modified on 6/25/2018 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AHOLD USA, INC. et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J SHERIDAN
Represented By: ANDREW C BERNASCONI
Represented By: COURTNEY B AVERBACH
Represented By: JENNIFER M DRISCOLL
Represented By: EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ
Represented By: KARL E. HERRMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: JOHN F. NAGLE
Represented By: JAMES T. MCKEOWN
Represented By: JAMES W. MATTHEWS
Represented By: ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: MATTHEW C LAMB
Represented By: MARK A. ROBERTSON
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: GERALD STEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW C LAMB
Represented By: MARK A. ROBERTSON
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: GERALD STEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICUALS USA, INC.
Represented By: ALISON TANCHYK
Represented By: MICHAELA DRAGALIN
Represented By: WILLIAM T MCENROE
Represented By: JOHN J. PEASE
Represented By: J. GORDON COONEY, JR.
Represented By: AMANDA B. ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW C LAMB
Represented By: MARK A. ROBERTSON
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: GERALD STEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&W LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: ANNA M. RATHBUN
Represented By: MARGUERITE M. SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Represented By: MELINA R. DIMATTIO
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Represented By: ANDREW S WELLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.
Represented By: JASON R. PARISH
Represented By: BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJIV MALIK
Represented By: ROBERT J. CLEARY
Represented By: EDWARD J. CANTER
Represented By: DAVID A. MUNKITTRICK
Represented By: DIETRICH L. SNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.
Represented By: HARVEY BARTLE, IV
Represented By: J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR.
Represented By: FRANK DESIMONE
Represented By: SCOTT A. STEMPEL
Represented By: TRACEY F MILICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA LLC
Represented By: TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL
Represented By: STEVEN E. BIZAR
Represented By: JOHN MCCLAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: DAVID L. HANSELMAN
Represented By: RAYMOND A. JACOBSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC.
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHOLD USA, INC.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CESAR CASTILLO, INC.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPH HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KINNEY DRUGS
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?