OLUWO v. MURTAUGH
Plaintiff: DAVID ADEWALE OLAYINK OLUWO and DAVID ADEWALE OLAYINKA OLUWO
Defendant: ELIZABETH MURTAUGH
Case Number: 2:2018cv02683
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b) AND AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL WITHOUT COSTS.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/8/2018. 8/9/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 11/7/2018 AT 02:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 8/9/2018. 8/9/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Interim Pretrial Conference held on 8/8/2018. (kp, )
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/9/2019 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. A TELEPHONE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/13/2018 AT 03:00 PM BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/11/2018. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 11/15/2018. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 12/21/2018. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/4/2019. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/4/2019. TRIAL POOL IS SET FOR 1/14/2019. FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/8/2018. 8/8/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HEFFLEY FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/8/2018. 8/8/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (kp, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER ON 8/8/2018 AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/17/18. 7/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 2, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by ELIZABETH MURTAUGH.(PALMER, RYAN)
June 27, 2018 Filing 2 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs (BILY, RAYMOND)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ELIZABETH MURTAUGH from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 18-235, Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 180499)(fdc)
June 26, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ELIZABETH MURTAUGH. (fdc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLUWO v. MURTAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH MURTAUGH
Represented By: RYAN A. PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID ADEWALE OLAYINK OLUWO
Represented By: RAYMOND M. BILY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID ADEWALE OLAYINKA OLUWO
Represented By: RAYMOND M. BILY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?