BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC. v. HUNTER BROS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC.
Defendant: HUNTER BROS, INC. and FRANK J. WIECHEC, III
Case Number: 2:2018cv03224
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: THAT COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT A COPY OF THE SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/26/2018. 9/27/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme,)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE A JOINT STATUS REPORT BY NO LATER THAN SEVEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/19/19. 9/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/7/18.8/8/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH D. FEDERMAN on behalf of HUNTER BROS, INC., FRANK J. WIECHEC, III with Certificate of Service(FEDERMAN, KENNETH) (Main Document 13 replaced on 8/2/2018 with permission from Chambers) (rf, ). Modified on 8/3/2018 (lisad, ).
August 2, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael J. Keaton ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12960631.) filed by BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC..Motion and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(APPLEBAUM, LEE)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. 6) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH SECTION I.F OF THE COURTS GENERAL PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/31/2018.8/1/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sme, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC. re: Henry Duarte served Summons and Complaint upon FRANK J. WIECHEC, III by Service on Designee. FRANK J. WIECHEC, III served on 7/31/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (APPLEBAUM, LEE)
July 31, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC. re: Henry Duarte served Summons and Complaint upon HUNTER BROS, INC. by Service on Designee. HUNTER BROS, INC. served on 7/31/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (APPLEBAUM, LEE)
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC. re: Henry Duarte served Summons and Complaint upon BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC. by Service on Designee. (APPLEBAUM, LEE) Modified on 7/31/2018 (ti, ). (FILED IN ERROR / ATTORNEY WILL REFILE SEE PDF #10 )
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC. re: Henry Duarte served Summons and Complaint upon BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC. by Service on Designee. BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC. served on 7/31/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (APPLEBAUM, LEE) Modified on 7/31/2018 (ti, ). (FILED IN ERROR / ATTORNEY WILL REFILE SEE PDF #9 )
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael J. Keaton ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12955724.) filed by BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC..Motion and Certificate of Service.(APPLEBAUM, LEE)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE APPLEBAUM on behalf of BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC. (APPLEBAUM, LEE)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC..(PERR, RICHARD)
July 30, 2018 Summons Issued as to HUNTER BROS, INC., FRANK J. WIECHEC, III. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/30/18 (jwl, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC...(jwl, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC..Memorandum Of Law. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Memorandum of Law)(jwl, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HUNTER BROS, INC., FRANK J. WIECHEC, III ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 182231.), filed by BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC..(jwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2018: #1 Attorney Certification) (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC. v. HUNTER BROS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAR MOUNTAIN ORCHARDS, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD J. PERR
Represented By: LEE APPLEBAUM
Represented By: MICHAEL J. KEATON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTER BROS, INC.
Represented By: KENNETH D. FEDERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK J. WIECHEC, III
Represented By: KENNETH D. FEDERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?