HUMANA INC. v. ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HUMANA INC.
Defendant: HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., SANDOZ, INC., MAYNE PHARMA (USA) INC., ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, NOVARTIS AG, MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PERRIGO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., MYLAN, N.V., APOTEX CORP., MYLAN INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, UDL LABORATORIES INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., AKORN, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, MAYNE PHARMA, INC. and TELIGENT, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03299
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by MEG TRACI SLACHETKA on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SLACHETKA, MEG)
February 12, 2020 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by EDOARDO MURILLO on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(MURILLO, EDOARDO)
February 5, 2020 Filing 181 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KATIE ROSE GLYNN on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.(GLYNN, KATIE)
January 17, 2020 Filing 180 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LEE YUN KIM on behalf of HUMANA INC.(KIM, LEE YUN)
November 13, 2019 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIA PENG on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(PENG, VICTORIA)
September 26, 2019 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by KARL E. HERRMANN on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(HERRMANN, KARL)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/15/2019. 7/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1071 IN 16-MD-2724)
August 15, 2019 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/15/2019. 8/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1070 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 175 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DENNIE BENJIMAN ZASTROW on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.(ZASTROW, DENNIE)
July 3, 2019 Filing 174 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JULIA REBEKAH MCGRATH on behalf of HUMANA INC.(MCGRATH, JULIA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 173 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Corporacion Quimico Farmaceutica Esteve, SA with Certificate of Service by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..(MAHONEY, STACEY)
June 18, 2019 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMON W. SUDEN on behalf of MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC with Certificate of Service(SUDEN, DAMON)
June 18, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM A. ESCOBAR on behalf of MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC with Certificate of Service(ESCOBAR, WILLIAM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by CLIFFORD KATZ on behalf of MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC with Certificate of Service(KATZ, CLIFFORD)
June 14, 2019 Filing 169 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF #81 /Teligent's Individual Motion to Dismiss the Kroger and Humana Complaints Against Teligent, Inc. filed by TELIGENT, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (kp, ).
June 13, 2019 Filing 168 REPLY to Response to Motion re #81 MOTION to Dismiss /Teligent's Individual Motion to Dismiss the Kroger and Humana Complaints Against Teligent, Inc. / Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Teligent's Individual Motion to Dismiss the Kroger and Humana Complaints Against Teligent, Inc. filed by TELIGENT, INC.. (MCDEVITT, HEATHER)
June 13, 2019 Filing 167 REPLY to Response to Motion re #80 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.. (EVERETT, J.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion re #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by APOTEX CORP.. (MATTHEWS, JAMES)
June 13, 2019 Filing 165 REPLY to Response to Motion re #104 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., APOTEX CORP., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, N.V., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. (CHAPMAN, JULIA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA. (REED, STEVEN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Humana Inc. and Kroger Co. complaints filed by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MAHONEY, STACEY)
June 13, 2019 Filing 162 REPLY to Response to Motion re #72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Kroger Plaintiffs' and Humana, Inc.'s Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (BLAD, LEIV)
June 13, 2019 Filing 161 REPLY to Response to Motion re #82 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs', Kroger Plaintiffs', and Humana's Amended Complaints) filed by IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. (JACOBSEN, RAYMOND)
June 13, 2019 Filing 160 Memorandum / Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support re #69 MOTION to Dismiss THE OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS FILED BY END-PAYER PLAINTIFFS, INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS, KROGER PLAINTIFFS, AND HUMANA, INC. filed by WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. (LEVINE, JAN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 159 REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. (PARISH, JASON)
June 13, 2019 Filing 158 REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED-COUNTS CVI-CX OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUMANA, INC filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC.. (ARTH, GERALD)
June 13, 2019 Filing 157 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by MAYNE PHARMA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT COUNTS LXXXI-LXXXV OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST MYLAN ARE VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND WITH EACH PARTY BEARING ITS OWN COSTS, EXPENSES, AND ATTORNEY'S FEES. THE PRAVASTATIN ALLEGATIONS IDENTIFIED SHALL BE STRICKEN AS TO MYLAN FROM HUMANA'S 4/1/2019 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. IF HUMANA FILES A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AFTER THE DATE OF THIS STIPULATION IT SHALL AMEND THE PRAVASTATIN ALLEGATIONS AS TO MYLAN CONSISTENT WITH PARAGRAPH 2 OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 5/28/2019. 5/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO 1008 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH C. SILBER on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, N.V., UDL LABORATORIES INC. with Certificate of Service(SILBER, SETH)
May 21, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY C. BANK on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, N.V., UDL LABORATORIES INC. with Certificate of Service(BANK, JEFFREY)
May 21, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by CHUL PAK on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, N.V., UDL LABORATORIES INC. with Certificate of Service(PAK, CHUL)
May 20, 2019 Filing 152 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation to Strike Portions of Humana's Second Amended Complaint and Dismiss the Pravastatin Claims as to Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Inc., and UDL Laboratories by HUMANA INC.. (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
May 16, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 14, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by COURTNEY B AVERBACH on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(AVERBACH, COURTNEY)
May 14, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J SHERIDAN on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(SHERIDAN, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER M DRISCOLL on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(DRISCOLL, JENNIFER)
May 14, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW C BERNASCONI on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(BERNASCONI, ANDREW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHWARTZ, EDWARD)
May 14, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL)
May 8, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET)
May 8, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA C CROUSHORE on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(CROUSHORE, AMANDA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN on behalf of ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHMIDTLEIN, JOHN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH F. TEICH on behalf of ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(TEICH, SARAH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 134 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO IMPAX LABORATORIES INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASER, KROGER, AND HUMANA COMPLAINTS filed by PLAINTIFFS. (RELATES TO 18-2641, 18-284, 18-3299) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs', Kroger Plaintiffs', and Humana's Amended Complaints) filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
May 2, 2019 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re #80 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
May 2, 2019 Filing 131 RESPONSE in Opposition re #77 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
May 2, 2019 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #104 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER) Modified on 5/6/2019 (kp, ).
May 2, 2019 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #104 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER) Modified on 5/6/2019 (kp, ).
May 2, 2019 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Kroger Plaintiffs' and Humana, Inc.'s Overarching Conspiracy Claims, #76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Humana Inc. and Kroger Co. complaints, #81 MOTION to Dismiss /Teligent's Individual Motion to Dismiss the Kroger and Humana Complaints Against Teligent, Inc. filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
May 2, 2019 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
May 2, 2019 Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Dismiss THE OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS FILED BY END-PAYER PLAINTIFFS, INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS, KROGER PLAINTIFFS, AND HUMANA, INC. filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
May 2, 2019 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
May 2, 2019 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED-COUNTS CVI-CX OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUMANA, INC filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
May 2, 2019 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
April 30, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by ARIO FAZLI on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(FAZLI, ARIO)
April 17, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BENJAMIN P. ARGYLE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(ARGYLE, BENJAMIN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by THOMAS J. WELLING on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(WELLING, THOMAS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LISA JOSE FALES on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(FALES, LISA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DANIELLE R. FOLEY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(FOLEY, DANIELLE)
April 10, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN LEMMO on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(LEMMO, ANN)
April 9, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY S. FOUSE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(FOUSE, LINDSAY)
April 8, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI)
April 8, 2019 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HUMANA INC. re #29 Amended Complaint,,,, on Perrigo Company plc. (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
April 8, 2019 Filing 112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HUMANA INC. re #29 Amended Complaint,,,, on Endo International plc. (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
April 5, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JAMES DOUGLAS BALDRIDGE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(BALDRIDGE, JAMES)
April 1, 2019 Filing 110 SEALED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by HUMANA INC..(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2019: #1 EXHIBIT A) (kp, ).
April 1, 2019 Filing 109 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, N.V., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A)(kp, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(WILSON, CHIRSTOPHER)
April 1, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by S TURNER on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TURNER, S)
April 1, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK THOMAS KOONS on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KOONS, ERIK)
April 1, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MARTIN TALADAY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TALADAY, JOHN)
March 1, 2019 Filing 104 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, N.V., NOVARTIS AG, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PERRIGO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC.Certificate of Service.(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 28, 2019 Filing 103 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mr. Eitan Newman re: served Amended Complaint upon Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. by Hague Convention on 1/21/2019 (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
February 28, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID)
February 28, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON)
February 28, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KASOWITZ, MARC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by J. GORDON COONEY, JR on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(COONEY, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. PEASE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(PEASE, JOHN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA B. ROBINSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROBINSON, AMANDA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T MCENROE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCENROE, WILLIAM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAELA DRAGALIN on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRAGALIN, MICHAELA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON TANCHYK on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TANCHYK, ALISON)
February 26, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN OGBURN on behalf of UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC with Certificate of Service(OGBURN, ERIN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXIA R BRANCATO on behalf of UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC with Certificate of Service(BRANCATO, ALEXIA)
February 26, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by DEVORA W. ALLON on behalf of UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC with Certificate of Service(ALLON, DEVORA)
February 26, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY P. LEFKOWITZ on behalf of UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC with Certificate of Service(LEFKOWITZ, JAY)
February 22, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by MELINA R. DIMATTIO on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA with Certificate of Service(DIMATTIO, MELINA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S WELLIN on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA with Certificate of Service(WELLIN, ANDREW)
February 22, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by ZAREMA A. JARAMILLO on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(JARAMILLO, ZAREMA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by KATIE ROSE GLYNN on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(GLYNN, KATIE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs', Kroger Plaintiffs', and Humana's Amended Complaints) filed by IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(JACOBSEN, RAYMOND)
February 21, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss /Teligent's Individual Motion to Dismiss the Kroger and Humana Complaints Against Teligent, Inc. filed by TELIGENT, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Teligent's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCDEVITT, HEATHER)
February 21, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(EVERETT, J.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN DANIEL GANT on behalf of TELIGENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(GANT, BRYAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER K. MCDEVITT on behalf of TELIGENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCDEVITT, HEATHER)
February 21, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Humana Inc. and Kroger Co. complaints filed by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order)(MAHONEY, STACEY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON R. PARISH on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(KITLOWSKI, BRADLEY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., AKORN, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., APOTEX CORP., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, EPIC PHARMA, LLC, EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, N.V., MYLAN, N.V., NOVARTIS AG, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PERRIGO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, SANDOZ, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES INC., UDL LABORATORIES INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAPMAN, JULIA) (Main Document 73 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Kroger Plaintiffs' and Humana, Inc.'s Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BLAD, LEIV)
February 21, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by LEIV H. BLAD on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(BLAD, LEIV)
February 21, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss THE OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS FILED BY END-PAYER PLAINTIFFS, INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS, KROGER PLAINTIFFS, AND HUMANA, INC. filed by WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. Memorandum of Law in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(LEVINE, JAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by APOTEX CORP..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 21, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED-COUNTS CVI-CX OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUMANA, INC filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARTH, GERALD)
February 21, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by MAYNE PHARMA, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIE BENJIMAN ZASTROW on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(ZASTROW, DENNIE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by CONNIE LEE on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(LEE, CONNIE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
February 21, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by R. BRENDAN FEE on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA with Certificate of Service(FEE, R.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(HARTMAN, MICHAEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY A. CARR on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(CARR, JEFFREY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN P. SUMNER on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(SUMNER, ROBIN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by JAN P. LEVINE on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(LEVINE, JAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. REED on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA with Certificate of Service(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HUMANA INC. As To Counts LXXXI - LXXXV of the Amended Complaint against Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Inc., UDL Laboratories Inc., and Mylan N.V.(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
February 21, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA CHAPMAN on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK DESIMONE on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(DESIMONE, FRANK)
February 20, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by HARVEY BARTLE, IV on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(BARTLE, HARVEY)
February 20, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by TRACEY F MILICH on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(MILICH, TRACEY)
February 20, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. STEMPEL on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEMPEL, SCOTT)
February 20, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(EVERETT, J.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
February 20, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN M KOWAL on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KOWAL, STEVEN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DONAHUE, LAUREN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by KENN BROTMAN on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(BROTMAN, KENN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J SMITH on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(SMITH, BRIAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN F. NAGLE on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(NAGLE, JOHN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(HAAS, ELIZABETH)
February 20, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES T. MCKEOWN on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MCKEOWN, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES W. MATTHEWS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES J. REITMEYER on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(REITMEYER, CHARLES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
February 20, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HUMANA INC. As To Counts LXXXI - LXXXV of the Amended Complaint against Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
January 14, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY C. PORCELLI on behalf of AKORN, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC. with Certificate of Service(PORCELLI, ANTHONY)
January 14, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY D FITTS on behalf of AKORN, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC. with Certificate of Service(FITTS, AMY)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HUMANA INC.'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERNATIONAL PROCESS SERVER (DOC. NO. 800 IN 16-MD-2724 AND DOC. NO. 27 IN 18-CV-3299) IS GRANTED; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/3/2019. 1/3/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 820 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
January 2, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by GARRETT W. WOTKYNS on behalf of HUMANA INC. with Certificate of Service(WOTKYNS, GARRETT)
January 2, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON H. KIM on behalf of HUMANA INC. with Certificate of Service(KIM, JASON)
January 2, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE G. BATES on behalf of HUMANA INC. with Certificate of Service(BATES, KYLE)
December 21, 2018 Filing 30 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT by HUMANA INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2018: #1 Sealed Document) (ems).
December 21, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TELIGENT, INC.. Forwarded To: Peter D. St. Phillip on 12/26/2018 (ems)
December 21, 2018 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., APOTEX CORP., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, N.V., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ems)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SUBSTITUTION OF DEFENDANT AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. AND ORDER TO WAIVE SERVICE OF HUMANA'S COMPLAINT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/21/2018. 12/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 814 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
December 13, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Service - Appointment of International Process Server filed by HUMANA INC..Brief, Declaration, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Laura K. Mummert, #3 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(MUMMERT, LAURA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE YUN KIM on behalf of HUMANA INC. with Certificate of Service(KIM, LEE YUN)
November 27, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER RISENER on behalf of HUMANA INC. with Certificate of Service(RISENER, JENNIFER)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT HUMANA INC.'S MOTION TO INCORPORATE THE ACTION INTO THE MDL (DOC. NO. 751) IS GRANTED. CIVIL ACTION NO. 18-3299 IS INCORPORATED INTO THE MDL; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/20/2018. 11/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 773 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
November 5, 2018 Filing 23 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/5/2018. 11/6/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO 752 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp,)
November 2, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Incorporate Humana Inc.'s Action Into the MDL filed by HUMANA INC... (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Jason H. Kim, #3 Certificate of Uncontested Motion, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE (DOC. NOS. 14, 15, 16, 17 AND 18 IN 18-CV-3299) ARE DISMISSED AS UNNECESSARY; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/9/2018. 10/9/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 719 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
October 9, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. OLSON on behalf of HUMANA INC. with Certificate of Service(OLSON, WILLIAM)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING ON BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.'S MOTION TO LIMIT DISCOVERY IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/1/2018. 10/2/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 716 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13071080.) filed by HUMANA INC..Sponsor's Statement, Certificate of Service.(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
September 26, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13071058.) filed by HUMANA INC..Sponsor's Statement, Certificate of Service.(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13071045.) filed by HUMANA INC..Sponsor's Statement, Certificate of Service.(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13071033.) filed by HUMANA INC..Sponsor's Statement, Certificate of Service.(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13071015.) filed by HUMANA INC..Sponsor's Statement, Certificate of Service.(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by LAURA KILLIAN MUMMERT(MUMMERT, LAURA)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery filed by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Limit Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(MAHONEY, STACEY)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY VAN VUREN on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. (VAN VUREN, ANTHONY)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY ANNE MAHONEY on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. (MAHONEY, STACEY)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY M. CHRISTINA on behalf of HUMANA INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CHRISTINA, ANTHONY)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES Z. KOPEL on behalf of HUMANA INC. with Certificate of Service(KOPEL, CHARLES)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA REBEKAH MCGRATH on behalf of HUMANA INC. with Certificate of Service(MCGRATH, JULIA)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA KILLIAN MUMMERT on behalf of HUMANA INC. with Certificate of Service(MUMMERT, LAURA)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL (DOC. #4 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/6/2018.8/7/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) Modified on 8/7/2018 (sg, ).
August 3, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HUMANA INC.. (jwl, )
August 3, 2018 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA (USA) INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, N.V., NOVARTIS AG, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PERRIGO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. 37 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/6/18 (jwl, ) Modified on 8/7/2018 (lisad, ).
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL filed by HUMANA INC..Memorandum Of Law. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Order)(jwl, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HUMANA INC..(jwl, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA (USA) INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, N.V., NOVARTIS AG, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PERRIGO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 182572.), filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement)(jwl, ) Modified on 8/7/2018 (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUMANA INC. v. ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC.
Represented By: ANTHONY C. PORCELLI
Represented By: AMY D FITTS
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA (USA) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Represented By: JASON R. PARISH
Represented By: BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: J. GORDON COONEY, JR.
Represented By: JOHN J. PEASE
Represented By: MICHAELA DRAGALIN
Represented By: WILLIAM T MCENROE
Represented By: AMANDA B. ROBINSON
Represented By: ALISON TANCHYK
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA
Represented By: MELINA R. DIMATTIO
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Represented By: ANDREW S WELLIN
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVARTIS AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: CLIFFORD KATZ
Represented By: DAMON W. SUDEN
Represented By: WILLIAM A. ESCOBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: CLIFFORD KATZ
Represented By: DAMON W. SUDEN
Represented By: WILLIAM A. ESCOBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: STACEY ANNE MAHONEY
Represented By: ANTHONY VAN VUREN
Represented By: CHARLES J. REITMEYER
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: VICTORIA PENG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.
Represented By: TRACEY F MILICH
Represented By: J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR.
Represented By: FRANK DESIMONE
Represented By: HARVEY BARTLE, IV
Represented By: SCOTT A. STEMPEL
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC.
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN, N.V.
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: JAMES T. MCKEOWN
Represented By: JOHN F. NAGLE
Represented By: JAMES W. MATTHEWS
Represented By: ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: DEVORA W. ALLON
Represented By: JAY P. LEFKOWITZ
Represented By: ERIN OGBURN
Represented By: ALEXIA R BRANCATO
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO COMPANY PLC
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDL LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Represented By: DENNIE BENJIMAN ZASTROW
Represented By: ROBIN P. SUMNER
Represented By: JAN P. LEVINE
Represented By: MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN
Represented By: JEFFREY A. CARR
Represented By: CONNIE LEE
Represented By: MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC PHARMA, LLC
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: ANDREW C BERNASCONI
Represented By: COURTNEY B AVERBACH
Represented By: EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM J SHERIDAN
Represented By: JENNIFER M DRISCOLL
Represented By: KARL E. HERRMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKORN, INC.
Represented By: ANTHONY C. PORCELLI
Represented By: AMY D FITTS
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: ARIO FAZLI
Represented By: KATIE ROSE GLYNN
Represented By: LEIV H. BLAD
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: MEG TRACI SLACHETKA
Represented By: EDOARDO MURILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: RAYMOND A. JACOBSEN
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ
Represented By: LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE
Represented By: KENN BROTMAN
Represented By: STEVEN M KOWAL
Represented By: BRIAN J SMITH
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT, INC.
Represented By: HEATHER K. MCDEVITT
Represented By: BRYAN DANIEL GANT
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUMANA INC.
Represented By: CHARLES Z. KOPEL
Represented By: PETER D. ST. PHILLIP
Represented By: TODD SCHNEIDER
Represented By: JULIA REBEKAH MCGRATH
Represented By: LAURA KILLIAN MUMMERT
Represented By: ANTHONY M. CHRISTINA
Represented By: TODD M. SCHNEIDER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BLECHMAN
Represented By: JENNIFER RISENER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. OLSON
Represented By: GARRETT W. WOTKYNS
Represented By: KYLE G. BATES
Represented By: LEE YUN KIM
Represented By: JASON H. KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?