WHERRY v. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: LESTER L. WHERRY and GAIL ANN JAKUBAC-WHERRY
Defendant: AMERICAN BILTRITE INC., KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO., SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY, PEP BOYS, AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP., GOODRICH CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, CLEAVER BROOKS, 3M COMPANY, PEERLESS PUMP, A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, PECORA CORPORATION, MARKET FORGE INDUSTRIES, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, DREVER COMPANY, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC, DAP, JOHN CRANE, INC., KOHLER COMPANY, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES, AMDURA LLC, CRANE COMPANY, A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., COPES VULCAN, GOULDS PUMP INC., FLOWSERVE, GREENE, TWEED & CO., EATON CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., WARREN PUMPS LLC, TRANE US INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL, CBS CORPORATION, SPIRAX SARCO, INC., SUR-SEAL CORPORATION, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., DAP doing business as LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., AMDURA LLC doing business as AS SUCCESSOR TO AMERICAN HOIST & DERRICK COMPANY, JOHN CRANE, INC. doing business as CRANE PACKING COMPANY, TRANE US INC. doing business as AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC doing business as CT CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. doing business as AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BENDIX, EATON CORPORATION doing business as EATON ELECTRICAL INC., CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION doing business as WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. doing business as SQUARE D COMPANY, BENJAMIN FOSTER DIVISION and GOODRICH CORPORATION doing business as B.F. GOODRICH
Respondent: HONEYWELL INC.
Cross Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, CARRIER CORPORATION, BRAND INSULATION, INC., LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC., MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY and UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Cross Claimant: LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., GENUINE PARTS COMPANY and METALLO GASKET COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv03376
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Cambria
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Referring Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Filing 280 Praecipe to Withdraw Warren Pumps, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment by WARREN PUMPS LLC. (SCHEETS, JOSHUA) Modified on 10/21/2022 (fb).
October 18, 2022 Filing 279 Praecipe to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment by CLEAVER BROOKS. (VALINIS, SUSAN)
January 14, 2022 Filing 278 NOTICE by CARRIER CORPORATION Notice/Withdrawal of Appearance (Rankin, Hillary)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC. IS DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NOS 235 & 236) SHALL BE STAYED AND HELD IN ABEYANCE FOR STATISTICAL AND ALL PURPOSES UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/3/20.11/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 276 Statement in Response to the Court's July 24, 2020 Order by LESTER L. WHERRY. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT SUBMISSION WITHIN 7 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER SETTING FORTH THEIR RESPECTIVE POSITIONS ON THE EFFECT OF THE "SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY" FILINGS SUBMITTED IN THIS MATTER ON THE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING OF THIS CASE AS TO THE OTHER REMAINING DEFENDANTS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/24/20. 7/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 274 Praecipe to Withdraw filed by EATON CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY) Modified on 7/17/2020 (fb).
July 15, 2020 Filing 273 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by TRANE US INC. under Chapter Number 11 of the Bankruptcy Code in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Western District of North Carolina filed under case number 20-30608 (JCW) . (RYAN, DANIEL)
July 15, 2020 Filing 272 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY under Chapter Number 11 of the Bankruptcy Code in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Western District of North Carolina filed under case number 20-30608 (JCW) . (RYAN, DANIEL)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 4/29/2020. 5/1/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED E-MAILED.(kp, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS READY FOR REASSIGNMENT AND RESOLUTION OF ALL REMAINING ISSUES. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO REASSIGN THE CASE IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE PROCEDURES OF THE COURT FOR THE ORDINARY RANDOM REASSIGNMENT OF ASBESTOS CASES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/27/2020. 4/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 269 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report in response to the Court's April 8, 2020 Rule to Show Cause by LESTER L. WHERRY. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER THAT MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC NOS 228, 231 AND 237) ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/8/20.4/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER THAT A RULE IS ISSUED FOR THE PARTIES TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE REASSIGNED TO AN EDPA DISTRICT COURT JUDGE FOR DISPOSITION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE A JOINT WRITTEN REPORT TO THE COURT. THE WRITTEN REPORT MUST BE EMAILED TO JOEL_LANG@PAED.USCOURTS.GOV AND FILED ON THE DOCKET NO LATER THAN 5/1/20. FAILURE TO PROVIDE A STATUS UPDATE MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/8/20. 4/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 266 NOTICE by PEERLESS PUMP re #228 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Opposition of MSJ (REBER, W.)
March 3, 2020 Filing 265 RESPONSE in Support re #239 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service filed by LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC.. (BLOCK, MICHAEL)
March 3, 2020 Filing 264 RESPONSE in Support re #234 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WARREN PUMPS LLC. (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
March 3, 2020 Filing 263 REPLY Brief in Support re #233 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PECORA CORPORATION. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN) Modified on 3/4/2020 (fb).
March 3, 2020 Filing 262 REPLY Brief in Support re #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CARRIER CORPORATION. (STOKES, GREGORY) Modified on 3/4/2020 (fb).
March 3, 2020 Filing 261 RESPONSE in Support re #226 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY ). (TURLIK, JOHN) (Main Document 261 replaced on 3/3/2020) (mbh, ).
March 3, 2020 Filing 260 RESPONSE in Support re #229 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(FOX, STEPHANIE)
March 3, 2020 Filing 259 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEAVER BROOKS(DIVISION OF AQUA-CHEM, INC.). (VALINIS, SUSAN) Modified on 3/4/2020 (fb).
March 3, 2020 Filing 258 REPLY Brief in Support re #232 MOTION for Summary Judgment , RESPONSE in Support filed by EATON CORPORATION. (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY) Modified on 3/4/2020 (fb).
March 2, 2020 Filing 257 Reply to Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #227 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (KADISH, ERIC) Modified on 3/3/2020 (fb).
March 2, 2020 Filing 256 RESPONSE in Support re #236 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TRANE US INC.. (RYAN, DANIEL)
February 18, 2020 Filing 255 RESPONSE in Opposition re #234 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Warren Pump's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 to P-12)(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 18, 2020 Filing 254 RESPONSE in Opposition re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Cleaver Brook's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 to P-10)(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 18, 2020 Filing 253 RESPONSE in Opposition re #229 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Genuine Part's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 to P-9)(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 18, 2020 Filing 252 RESPONSE in Opposition re #239 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Lennox's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 to P-10)(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 18, 2020 Filing 251 RESPONSE in Opposition re #233 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Pecora's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 to P-9)(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 18, 2020 Filing 250 RESPONSE in Opposition re #227 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to A.O. Smith's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 to P-7)(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 18, 2020 Filing 249 RESPONSE in Opposition re #232 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Eaton's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 to P-12)(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 18, 2020 Filing 248 RESPONSE in Opposition re #226 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to BW/IP's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 to P-10)(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 18, 2020 Filing 247 RESPONSE in Opposition re #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Ingersoll Rand's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 to P-10)(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 18, 2020 Filing 246 RESPONSE in Opposition re #236 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Trane's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 to P-10)(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 18, 2020 Filing 245 RESPONSE in Opposition re #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Carrier's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 to P-8, #2 Exhibit Exhibits P-9 to P-10)(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 14, 2020 Filing 244 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES BROWN on behalf of LESTER L. WHERRY with Certificate of Service(BROWN, MICHAEL)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT AURORA PUMP COMPANY IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/4/2020. 2/5/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kp, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 242 Stipulation of Dismissal by AURORA PUMP COMPANY. (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (HADDEN, JAMES) Modified on 2/4/2020 (fb).
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/27/2020. 1/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 240 STIPULATION of Dismissal by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.. (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (SINGER, STEWART) Modified on 1/28/2020 (fb).
January 21, 2020 Filing 239 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC..with Proposed Order and Certificate of Service.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
January 20, 2020 Filing 238 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CARRIER CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B)(STOKES, GREGORY)
January 20, 2020 Filing 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Honeywell Inc. filed by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
January 20, 2020 Filing 236 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TRANE US INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(RYAN, DANIEL)
January 20, 2020 Filing 235 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(RYAN, DANIEL)
January 20, 2020 Filing 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WARREN PUMPS LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
January 17, 2020 Filing 233 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PECORA CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
January 17, 2020 Filing 232 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EATON CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
January 17, 2020 Filing 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY.Certificate of Service, Memorandum.(BRUCH, G.)
January 17, 2020 Filing 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEAVER BROOKS(DIVISION OF AQUA-CHEM, INC.).Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(VALINIS, SUSAN)
January 17, 2020 Filing 229 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(FOX, STEPHANIE)
January 17, 2020 Filing 228 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PEERLESS PUMP.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(REBER, W.)
January 16, 2020 Filing 227 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(KADISH, ERIC)
January 14, 2020 Filing 226 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY ).Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(TURLIK, JOHN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE by CLEAVER BROOKS(DIVISION OF AQUA-CHEM, INC.) Service of Expert Reports (VALINIS, SUSAN)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF GAIL ANN JAKUBAC-WHERRY'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW HER CONSORTIUM CLAIM IS GRANTED AND COUNT V OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CORRECT THE CAPTION OF THIS CASE BY REMOVING GAIL ANN JAKUBAC-WHERRY AS A PLAINTIFF AS ALL CLAIMS BROUGHT BY GAIL ANN JAKUBAC-WHERRY HAVE BEEN WITHDRAWN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/22/19. 11/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 223 NOTICE by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY of Expert Report (FOX, STEPHANIE)
November 18, 2019 Filing 222 NOTICE by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY of Expert Reports (FOX, STEPHANIE)
November 18, 2019 Filing 221 NOTICE by JOHN CRANE, INC. of Service of John Crane Inc. Expert Reports (TURNER, TIFFANY)
November 18, 2019 Filing 220 NOTICE by JOHN CRANE, INC. of Service of Joint Defense Reports (TURNER, TIFFANY)
November 18, 2019 Filing 219 Disclosure by JOHN CRANE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(TURNER, TIFFANY)
November 18, 2019 Filing 218 NOTICE by EATON CORPORATION of Statement regarding Expert Witnesses (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
November 18, 2019 Filing 217 Statement Regarding Expert Reports by WARREN PUMPS LLC. (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
November 18, 2019 Filing 216 NOTICE by PEERLESS PUMP of Statement regarding Expert Witnesses (REBER, W.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 215 Statement Regarding Expert Reports by FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY ). (TURLIK, JOHN)
November 15, 2019 Filing 214 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO..(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
November 15, 2019 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY on behalf of KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO. (MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
November 14, 2019 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART R. SINGER on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. with Certificate of Service(SINGER, STEWART)
November 14, 2019 Filing 211 NOTICE by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. OF SERVICE OF EXPERT REPORTS (SINGER, STEWART)
November 14, 2019 Filing 210 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ANY AND ALL CLAIMS, CAUSES OF ACTION AND CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO COPES VULCAN AND INCORRECTLY IDENTIFIED AS COPES VULCAN ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY BEARING THEIR OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/5/19. 11/6/29 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ANY AND ALL CLAIMS, CAUSES OF ACTION AND CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST SPIRAX SARCO, INC. ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY BEARING THEIR OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/5/19. 11/6/29 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 207 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Her Consortium Claim (Count V of First Amended Complaint) filed by GAIL ANN JAKUBAC-WHERRY.Certificate of Service.(ROWE, MICHAEL)
November 4, 2019 Filing 206 STIPULATION of Dismissal by COPES VULCAN. (TURNER, TIFFANY) *FORWARDED TO JUDGE* Modified on 11/5/2019 (lisad, ).
November 4, 2019 Filing 205 STIPULATION of Dismissal by SPIRAX SARCO, INC.. (TURNER, TIFFANY) *FORWARDED TO JUDGE* Modified on 11/5/2019 (lisad, ).
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANTS ARE VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE: AMERICAN BILTRITE, A.W. CHESTERTON, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, DAP, INC., F/N/A LAMIRADA PRODUCTS, CO., FLOWSERVE, AS SUCCESSOR TO NORTHTROM VALVES, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS, GREENE TWEED & CO., KOHLER, CO., MARKET FORGE, METALLO GASKET COMPANY, MILWAUKEE VALVE, PEP BOYS AND SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., F/K/A SQUARE D. COMPANY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/16/19. 9/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 203 STATUS REPORT Regarding Particular Defendants Plaintiff Agrees To Dismiss From the Action by LESTER L. WHERRY. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
August 27, 2019 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY M. STOKES on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION with Jury Demand. (FILED IN ERROR; ATTORNEY ENTERING APPEARANCE MUST FILE ON OWN BEHALF). (STOKES, GREGORY) Modified on 8/28/2019 (fb).
August 27, 2019 Filing 201 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARRIER CORPORATION.(STOKES, GREGORY)
August 27, 2019 Filing 200 CARRIER CORPORATION'S ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) (168) and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CARRIER CORPORATION.(STOKES, GREGORY)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS, INCLUDING CROSS-CLAIMS, AS TO DEFENDANT BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/12/19. 8/13/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 198 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC.. (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (SEELAUS, A.) Modified on 8/9/2019 (fb).
July 31, 2019 Filing 197 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit). (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (SEELAUS, A.) Modified on 8/1/2019 (fb).
June 26, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE by METALLO GASKET COMPANY of Service of Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (DEZII, DAWN)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FROM THE ACTION AND ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS BY PLAINTIFF, CO-DEFENDANTS, AND THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/20/19. 5/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 194 STIPULATION of Dismissal by J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES. (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (JACKSON, DAMIAN) Modified on 5/21/2019 (fb).
May 9, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY M. STOKES on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION with Withdrawal of Appearance of Joan Depfer, Esq. and Kimberley Woodie, Esq. with Certificate of Service(STOKES, GREGORY)
May 7, 2019 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by INGRID H. GRAFF on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GRAFF, INGRID)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 SCHEDULING ORDER: EXPERT DISCOVERY MUST BE COMPLETED BY 12/16/2019. SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS MUST BE FILED BY 1/20/2020. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 4/30/19. 5/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY IS DISMISSED FROM THIS MATTER WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/29/19. 4/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 189 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by JOHN CRANE, INC..Certificate of Service.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
April 23, 2019 Filing 188 STIPULATION of Dismissal by 3M COMPANY. (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (DISIPIO, BASIL) Modified on 4/24/2019 (fb).
March 29, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE A. FOX on behalf of GENUINE PARTS COMPANY (FOX, STEPHANIE)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST BRAND INSULATIONS, INC. ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, AND ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT, BRAND INSULATIONS, INC., ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/11/19. 3/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 185 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BRAND INSULATION, INC.. (HAASE, NORMAN) *FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 3/11/2019 (lisad, ).
February 25, 2019 Filing 184 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FOSTER WHEELER LLC.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 183 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by FOSTER WHEELER LLC.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 182 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSS CLAIMS against All Defendants by FOSTER WHEELER LLC.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION AND BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC. ARE DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/21/19. 2/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 180 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BAYER CROPSCIENCE, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE ROBRENO FOR APPROVAL). (JASONS, CATHERINE) Modified on 2/22/2019 (fb).
February 19, 2019 Filing 179 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by SPIRAX SARCO, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
February 19, 2019 Filing 178 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by COPES VULCAN.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
February 19, 2019 Filing 177 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
February 11, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of AMERICAN BILTRITE INC. with Certificate of Service(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
January 31, 2019 Filing 175 Disclosure with 1/31/19 by DAP.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
January 31, 2019 Filing 174 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with 1/31/19 by DAP.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
January 31, 2019 Filing 173 DAP, Inc's ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by DAP.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
January 31, 2019 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BLOCK on behalf of DAP with Certificate of Service(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
January 15, 2019 Filing 171 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by GOODRICH CORPORATION.(DEZII, DAWN)
January 15, 2019 Filing 170 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GOODRICH CORPORATION.(DEZII, DAWN)
December 27, 2018 Filing 169 Lamon Gasket Company's ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY by LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
December 27, 2018 Filing 168 DREVER COMPANY'S ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by DREVER COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
December 27, 2018 Filing 167 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
December 26, 2018 Filing 166 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES).(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMDURA LLC BE AND HEREBY IS DISMISSED FROM THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER WITH PREJUDICE, AND ANY AND ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS BY CO-DEFENDANTS AND ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/21/18. 12/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 164 CERTAINTEED CORPORATION ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Parties by CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
December 21, 2018 Filing 163 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by PEERLESS PUMP.(REBER, W.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 162 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC..(REBER, W.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 161 STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMDURA LLC. (HADDEN, JAMES)
December 20, 2018 Filing 160 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
December 20, 2018 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BLOCK on behalf of MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
December 19, 2018 Filing 158 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GOODRICH CORPORATION.(DEZII, DAWN)
December 19, 2018 Filing 157 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by METALLO GASKET COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
December 19, 2018 Filing 156 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GOODRICH CORPORATION.(DEZII, DAWN)
December 18, 2018 Filing 155 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(KADISH, ERIC) Modified on 12/19/2018 (md).
December 18, 2018 Filing 154 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP., Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(HOWARTH, JOHN) Modified on 12/19/2018 (md).
December 18, 2018 Filing 153 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(SUCCESSOR TO HONEYWELL, INC.), Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(NEESON, PETER) Modified on 12/19/2018 (md).
December 14, 2018 Filing 152 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by A.W. CHESTERTON, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
December 14, 2018 Filing 151 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY ).(TURLIK, JOHN)
December 13, 2018 Filing 150 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by CLEAVER BROOKS.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
December 13, 2018 Filing 149 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES.(JACKSON, DAMIAN)
December 12, 2018 Filing 148 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Replies to Crossclaims against All Defendants by AURORA PUMP COMPANY.(HADDEN, JAMES)
December 11, 2018 Filing 147 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against AMERICAN BILTRITE INC., AURORA PUMP COMPANY, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC, BRAND INSULATION, INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CLEAVER BROOKS, COPES VULCAN, CRANE COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY, DAP, DREVER COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY ), FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES), FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMP INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(SUCCESSOR TO HONEYWELL, INC.), HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES, JOHN CRANE, INC., KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO., KOHLER COMPANY, LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY, LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC., MARKET FORGE INDUSTRIES, METALLO GASKET COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., 3M COMPANY, A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP., AMDURA LLC, MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, PECORA CORPORATION, PEERLESS PUMP, PEP BOYS, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY, SPIRAX SARCO, INC., SUR-SEAL CORPORATION, TRANE US INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, YORK INTERNATIONAL by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
December 7, 2018 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. JOHANSON on behalf of PECORA CORPORATION (JOHANSON, THOMAS)
December 7, 2018 Filing 145 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, & Reply to Cross-Claims of All Defendants & Additional Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by 3M COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
December 6, 2018 Filing 144 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY.(JENKINS, WALTER)
December 5, 2018 Filing 143 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by PECORA CORPORATION.(JOHANSON, THOMAS)
December 5, 2018 Filing 142 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PECORA CORPORATION.(JOHANSON, THOMAS)
December 5, 2018 Filing 141 ANSWER to Complaint together with TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by PECORA CORPORATION.(JOHANSON, THOMAS)
December 5, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. JOHANSON on behalf of PECORA CORPORATION (JOHANSON, THOMAS) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE* Modified on 12/7/2018 (lisad, ).
December 5, 2018 Filing 139 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, with Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CARRIER CORPORATION.(DEPFER, JOAN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 138 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EATON CORPORATION.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
December 4, 2018 Filing 137 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BRAND INSULATION, INC..(BUSCH, CHRISTINE)
December 4, 2018 Filing 136 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(RYAN, DANIEL)
December 4, 2018 Filing 135 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by TRANE US INC..(RYAN, DANIEL)
December 4, 2018 Filing 134 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by PEP BOYS.(SANTORO, CHRISTOPHER)
December 4, 2018 Filing 133 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
December 4, 2018 Filing 132 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INC..(HEXSTALL, KEVIN)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 SCHEDULING ORDER: EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 10/16/2019. SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS MUST BE FILED BY 11/18/19. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 11/29/18. 11/30/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 130 Minute Entry for Pretrial Conference held on 11/29/18 before Judge Rueter. (mbh, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES P. HADDEN on behalf of AMDURA LLC with Certificate of Service(HADDEN, JAMES)
November 28, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIO NAVARRO on behalf of KOHLER COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(NAVARRO, JULIO)
November 28, 2018 Filing 127 Disclosure with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES).(PITT, TERENCE)
November 28, 2018 Filing 126 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP., AMDURA LLC, AMERICAN BILTRITE INC., AURORA PUMP COMPANY, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC, BRAND INSULATION, INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CLEAVER BROOKS, COPES VULCAN, CRANE COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY, DAP, DREVER COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY ), FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES), FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMP INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(SUCCESSOR TO HONEYWELL, INC.), HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES, JOHN CRANE, INC., KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO., KOHLER COMPANY, LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY, LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC., MARKET FORGE INDUSTRIES, METALLO GASKET COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, PECORA CORPORATION, PEERLESS PUMP, PEP BOYS, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY, SPIRAX SARCO, INC., SUR-SEAL CORPORATION, TRANE US INC., WARREN PUMPS LLC and YORK INTERNATIONAL filed by LESTER L. WHERRY and GAIL ANN JAKUBAC-WHERRY, Certificate of Service.(mbh, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 125 STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Case Status Report by LESTER L. WHERRY. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
November 27, 2018 Filing 124 Statement Plaintiff's Submission in Accordance with MDL 875 Admin. Order 12 by LESTER L. WHERRY. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
November 26, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. CANCELLIERE, JR on behalf of LESTER L. WHERRY with Certificate of Service(CANCELLIERE, MICHAEL)
November 21, 2018 Filing 122 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by CLEAVER BROOKS.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
November 20, 2018 Filing 121 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by 3M COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
November 14, 2018 Filing 120 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES).(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS HEREBY PERMITTED TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 20 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/8/18. 11/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 118 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY ).(TURLIK, JOHN)
November 8, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY ) (TURLIK, JOHN)
November 8, 2018 Filing 116 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by A.W. CHESTERTON, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
November 8, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. (TURLIK, JOHN)
November 8, 2018 Filing 114 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PEP BOYS.(SANTORO, CHRISTOPHER)
November 8, 2018 Filing 113 Pep Boys ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by PEP BOYS.(SANTORO, CHRISTOPHER)
November 8, 2018 Filing 112 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
November 8, 2018 Filing 111 Warren Pumps, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
November 8, 2018 Filing 110 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INC..(HEXSTALL, KEVIN) Modified on 11/8/2018 (nd, ).
November 8, 2018 Filing 109 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with certificate of service by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(RYAN, DANIEL)
November 8, 2018 Filing 108 Ingersoll Rand Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(RYAN, DANIEL)
November 8, 2018 Filing 107 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by TRANE US INC..(RYAN, DANIEL)
November 8, 2018 Filing 106 Trane US Inc., f/k/a American Standard, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by TRANE US INC..(RYAN, DANIEL)
November 8, 2018 Filing 105 Brand Insulations, Inc's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BRAND INSULATION, INC..(BUSCH, CHRISTINE)
November 8, 2018 Filing 104 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EATON CORPORATION.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
November 8, 2018 Filing 103 Eaton Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EATON CORPORATION.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
October 30, 2018 Filing 102 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sarco International Corporation by SPIRAX SARCO, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 30, 2018 Filing 101 Disclosure by SPIRAX SARCO, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 30, 2018 Filing 100 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SPIRAX SARCO, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 30, 2018 Filing 99 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Electrolux North America, Inc. by COPES VULCAN.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 30, 2018 Filing 98 Disclosure by COPES VULCAN.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 30, 2018 Filing 97 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by COPES VULCAN.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 26, 2018 Filing 96 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO..(CARRERAS, LINA)
October 26, 2018 Filing 95 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO..(CARRERAS, LINA)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 11/29/18 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3-C. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 10/22/18. 10/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 93 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY under Chapter Number 11 of the Bankruptcy Code in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Southern District of New York filed under case number 18-23538 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(EISLER, MARK)
October 19, 2018 Filing 92 RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL Disclosure with Certificate of Service by AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP..(HOWARTH, JOHN) Modified on 10/22/2018 (afm, ).
October 19, 2018 Filing 91 Praecipe to attach corrected Exhibit A to #90 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file an Amended Complaint by LESTER L. WHERRY, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (ROWE, MICHAEL) Modified on 10/22/2018 (afm, ).
October 19, 2018 Filing 90 First MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(ROWE, MICHAEL) Modified on 10/22/2018 (afm, ).
October 15, 2018 Filing 89 Disclosure by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 15, 2018 Filing 88 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Smiths Group plc by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 15, 2018 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER THAT THE COURT REFERS THIS ACTION PENDING IN MDL 875 TO THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER FOR PROCEEDINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/12/18. 10/15/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 85 ANSWER to Complaint together with to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by GREENE, TWEED & CO..(WEINBERG, DAVID)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT FORD MOTOR COMPANY IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FROM THIS ACTION AND ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS BY PLAINTIFF, CO-DEFENDANTS AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/3/18. 10/5/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by PEERLESS PUMP.(REBER, W.)
October 3, 2018 Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC..(REBER, W.)
October 1, 2018 Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint together with to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims and , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CARRIER CORPORATION.(DEPFER, JOAN)
September 28, 2018 CROSSCLAIM against 3M COMPANY, A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP., AMDURA LLC, AMERICAN BILTRITE INC., AURORA PUMP COMPANY, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC, BRAND INSULATION, INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CLEAVER BROOKS, COPES VULCAN, CRANE COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY, DAP, DREVER COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY ), FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES), FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMP INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(SUCCESSOR TO HONEYWELL, INC.), HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES, JOHN CRANE, INC., KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO., KOHLER COMPANY, LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY, LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC., MARKET FORGE INDUSTRIES, METALLO GASKET COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, PECORA CORPORATION, PEERLESS PUMP, PEP BOYS, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY, SPIRAX SARCO, INC., SUR-SEAL CORPORATION, TRANE US INC., WARREN PUMPS LLC, YORK INTERNATIONAL, filed by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. (SEE PAPER #79 FOR ATTACHMENT).(fb)
September 28, 2018 CROSSCLAIM against 3M COMPANY, A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP., AMDURA LLC, AMERICAN BILTRITE INC., AURORA PUMP COMPANY, BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC, BRAND INSULATION, INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CLEAVER BROOKS, COPES VULCAN, CRANE COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY, DAP, DREVER COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY ), FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES), FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMP INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(SUCCESSOR TO HONEYWELL, INC.), HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES, JOHN CRANE, INC., KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO., KOHLER COMPANY, LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY, LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC., MARKET FORGE INDUSTRIES, METALLO GASKET COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, PECORA CORPORATION, PEERLESS PUMP, PEP BOYS, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY, SPIRAX SARCO, INC., SUR-SEAL CORPORATION, TRANE US INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, WARREN PUMPS LLC, YORK INTERNATIONAL, filed by BAYER CROPSCIENCE. (SEE PAPER #80 FOR ATTACHMENT).(fb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims and Jury Demand by BAYER CROPSCIENCE.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
September 28, 2018 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims and Jury Demand by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
September 28, 2018 Filing 78 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
September 28, 2018 Filing 77 Lamon Gasket Company ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
September 28, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
September 24, 2018 Filing 75 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY.(EISLER, MARK)
September 24, 2018 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defense, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY.(EISLER, MARK)
September 24, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK DOUGLAS EISLER on behalf of SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY with Certificate of Service(EISLER, MARK)
September 20, 2018 Filing 72 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GREENE, TWEED & CO..(WEINBERG, DAVID)
September 20, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID C. WEINBERG on behalf of GREENE, TWEED & CO. with Certificate of Service(WEINBERG, DAVID)
September 19, 2018 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LESTER L. WHERRY. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
September 18, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by CASEY R COBURN on behalf of LESTER L. WHERRY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(COBURN, CASEY)
September 18, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. ROWE on behalf of LESTER L. WHERRY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ROWE, MICHAEL)
September 18, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE M. PITT on behalf of FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES) (PITT, TERENCE)
September 18, 2018 Filing 66 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including FLOWSERVE CORPORATION with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES).(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
September 18, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL on behalf of FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES) (LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
September 18, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE M. PITT on behalf of FLOWSERVE(SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY ) (PITT, TERENCE)
September 17, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. SCHEETS on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(SUCCESSOR TO HONEYWELL, INC.) (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
September 17, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (WEIMANN, CHRISTIAN)
September 17, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
September 17, 2018 Filing 60 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. with Certificate of Service by CLEAVER BROOKS.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
September 17, 2018 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by CLEAVER BROOKS.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
September 14, 2018 Filing 58 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (mbh, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GOODRICH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DEZII, DAWN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by METALLO GASKET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form)(DEZII, DAWN)
September 6, 2018 Filing 55 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMERICAN BILTRITE INC..(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
September 6, 2018 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand and Reply to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AMERICAN BILTRITE INC..(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
September 6, 2018 Filing 53 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER)
September 6, 2018 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defense, Reply to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER)
September 6, 2018 Filing 51 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC..(RIDEOUT, CHRISTINA)
September 6, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA M. RIDEOUT on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(RIDEOUT, CHRISTINA)
September 6, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 48 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including United Technologies Corp. by CARRIER CORPORATION.(DEPFER, JOAN)
September 4, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by JOAN P. DEPFER on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION (DEPFER, JOAN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 46 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and IMO Holdings, Inc. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
August 30, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
August 30, 2018 Filing 44 Disclosure with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
August 30, 2018 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
August 30, 2018 Filing 42 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT Inc. with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMP INC..(LUXTON, STEVEN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. LUXTON on behalf of GOULDS PUMP INC. with Certificate of Service(LUXTON, STEVEN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by DREVER COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 39 DREVER COMPANY'S ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by DREVER COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of DREVER COMPANY (BRUCH, G.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 36 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint ; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE COMPANY (BRUCH, G.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by METALLO GASKET COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
August 24, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by SHARON L. CAFFREY on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(CAFFREY, SHARON)
August 24, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSON WALKER LOTMAN on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY with Certificate of Service and Jury Demand(LOTMAN, ALYSON)
August 24, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J. NEESON on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(NEESON, PETER)
August 23, 2018 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Bayer AG with Certificate of Service by BAYER CROPSCIENCE.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 23, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of BAYER CROPSCIENCE with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 23, 2018 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 23, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 22, 2018 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION.(KADISH, ERIC)
August 22, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
August 20, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER LLC (VALINIS, SUSAN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH A. LEWIS on behalf of CLEAVER BROOKS (LEWIS, LEAH)
August 17, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of CLEAVER BROOKS (VALINIS, SUSAN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by 3M COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
August 17, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of 3M COMPANY with Jury Demand with Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
August 16, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY.(JENKINS, WALTER)
August 16, 2018 Filing 18 Disclosure by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY.(JENKINS, WALTER)
August 16, 2018 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY.(JENKINS, WALTER)
August 16, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER S. JENKINS on behalf of GENUINE PARTS COMPANY (JENKINS, WALTER)
August 16, 2018 Filing 15 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(CURRIER, LAWRENCE)
August 16, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN DEZII on behalf of METALLO GASKET COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DEZII, DAWN)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN DEZII on behalf of GOODRICH CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(DEZII, DAWN)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Johnson Controls, Inc. with Certificate of Service by YORK INTERNATIONAL. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY). (SEELAUS, A.) Modified on 8/15/2018 (fb).
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by A. KAI SEELAUS on behalf of YORK INTERNATIONAL with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY). (SEELAUS, A.) Modified on 8/15/2018 (fb).
August 15, 2018 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC.(SEELAUS, A.)
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by A. KAI SEELAUS on behalf of BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(SEELAUS, A.)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PEERLESS PUMP.(REBER, W.)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of PEERLESS PUMP with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP..(HOWARTH, JOHN)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint together with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIMS, AND ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP..(HOWARTH, JOHN)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN JACKSON on behalf of J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES (JACKSON, DAMIAN)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BLOCK on behalf of CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION with Certificate of Sevice(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CRANE COMPANY.(ahf)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRANE COMPANY from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 180300796. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 182901) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D PART 1, #5 Exhibit D PART 2, #6 Exhibit D PART 3, #7 Exhibit D PART 4, #8 Exhibit D PART 5, #9 Exhibit D PART 6, #10 Exhibit D PART 7, #11 Exhibit E PART 1, #12 Exhibit E PART 2, #13 Exhibit E PART 3, #14 Exhibit E PART 4, #15 Exhibit E PART 5, #16 Exhibit F, #17 PCCP Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Defendant and Counsel List, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHERRY v. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: JOAN P. DEPFER
Represented By: GREGORY M. STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BRAND INSULATION, INC.
Represented By: NORMAN L. HAASE
Represented By: CHRISTINE P. BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN BILTRITE INC.
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO.
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY
Represented By: LINA M. CARRERAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY
Represented By: MARK DOUGLAS EISLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEP BOYS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER N. SANTORO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP.
Represented By: JOHN S. HOWARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODRICH CORPORATION
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: ALYSON WALKER LOTMAN
Represented By: LAWRENCE E. CURRIER
Represented By: SHARON L. CAFFREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Represented By: LEAH A. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS PUMP
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORPORATION
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PECORA CORPORATION
Represented By: KEVIN O'BRIEN
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOHANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKET FORGE INDUSTRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES P. HADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREVER COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CROPSCIENCE
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC
Represented By: A. KAI SEELAUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHLER COMPANY
Represented By: JULIO NAVARRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES
Represented By: DAMIAN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMDURA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON, INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPES VULCAN
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMP INC.
Represented By: STEVEN A. LUXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE
Represented By: BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL
Represented By: TERENCE M. PITT
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE, TWEED & CO.
Represented By: DAVID C. WEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: STEWART R. SINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SCHEETS
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANE US INC.
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO, INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUR-SEAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTINA M. RIDEOUT
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP doing business as LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMDURA LLC doing business as AS SUCCESSOR TO AMERICAN HOIST & DERRICK COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES P. HADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC. doing business as CRANE PACKING COMPANY
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANE US INC. doing business as AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC doing business as CT CORPORATION
Represented By: A. KAI SEELAUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. doing business as AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BENDIX
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SCHEETS
Represented By: PETER J. NEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION doing business as EATON ELECTRICAL INC.
Represented By: INGRID H. GRAFF
Represented By: CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION doing business as WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. doing business as SQUARE D COMPANY
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Represented By: CHRISTINA M. RIDEOUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN FOSTER DIVISION
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODRICH CORPORATION doing business as B.F. GOODRICH
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: PETER J. NEESON
Represented By: KEVIN ERROL HEXSTALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Represented By: WALTER S. JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: METALLO GASKET COMPANY
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESTER L. WHERRY
Represented By: EDWARD M. NASS
Represented By: CASEY R COBURN
Represented By: MICHAEL A. ROWE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. CANCELLIERE, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL ANN JAKUBAC-WHERRY
Represented By: MICHAEL A. ROWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HONEYWELL INC.
Represented By: KEVIN ERROL HEXSTALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?