EYNON v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JOHN EYNON
Defendant: BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY, ANGUS FIRE, NATIONAL FOAM, INC., CHEMGUARD, INC., ANSUL and 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv03387
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay all Proceedings Until After a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Pending Motions for Transfer filed by ANSUL, CHEMGUARD, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Remand Not to Exceed 7 Pages filed by ANSUL, CHEMGUARD, INC.. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Remand Not to Exceed 7 Pages filed by JOHN EYNON.Memorandum, Brief, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to, #2 Declaration Declaration of W. Steven Berman, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BERMAN, W.)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Michael L. Carpenter ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13074034.) filed by BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY.Order, Application, Sponsor Statement and Certificate of Service.(COLICCHIO, PHILIP)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Ellen Nunno Corbo ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13070766.) filed by BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY..(COLICCHIO, PHILIP)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by ANSUL, CHEMGUARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit D-1, #4 Exhibit D-2, #5 Exhibit D-3, #6 Exhibit D-4, #7 Exhibit D-5, #8 Exhibit D-6, #9 Exhibit D-7, #10 Exhibit D-8, #11 Exhibit D-9, #12 Exhibit D-10, #13 Exhibit D-11, #14 Exhibit D-12, #15 Exhibit D-13, #16 Exhibit D-14, #17 Exhibit D-15, #18 Exhibit D-16, #19 Exhibit D-17, #20 Exhibit D-18, #21 Exhibit D-19, #22 Exhibit D-20)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP M. COLICCHIO on behalf of BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY (COLICCHIO, PHILIP)
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 Supplemental Brief in Support re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by JOHN EYNON. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of W. Steven Berman, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE 18-CV-2036 FOR CORRECT FILING). (BERMAN, W.) Modified on 9/21/2018 (fb). Modified on 10/1/2018 (fb).
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP AND NATIONAL FOAM, INC. THAT THE TIME FOR EACH DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE SHALL BE 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND IS DECIDED BY THE COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 9/18/18. 9/18/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS CHEMGUARD, INC. AND BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE, SHALL BE 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND IS DECIDED BY THE COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 9/18/18. 9/18/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN P. LOUCKS on behalf of ANSUL with Certificate of Service(LOUCKS, ERIN)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. BLUM on behalf of ANSUL with Certificate of Service(BLUM, JOSEPH)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN P. LOUCKS on behalf of CHEMGUARD, INC. with Certificate of Service(LOUCKS, ERIN)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. BLUM on behalf of CHEMGUARD, INC. with Certificate of Service(BLUM, JOSEPH)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand filed by JOHN EYNON.Memorandum, Brief, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of W. Steven Berman, #3 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. A to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #4 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. B to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #5 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. C to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #6 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. D to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #7 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. E to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #8 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. F to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #9 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. G to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #10 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. H to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #11 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. I to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #12 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. J to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #13 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. K to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #14 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. L to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #15 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. M to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #16 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. N to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. O to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. P to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #19 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. P1 to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #20 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. P2 to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #21 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. P3 to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #22 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. Q to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #23 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. R to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #24 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. S to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #25 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. T to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #26 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. U to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #27 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. V to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #28 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. W to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #29 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. X to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #30 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. Y to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #31 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. Z to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #32 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. AA to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #33 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. BB to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #34 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. CC to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #35 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. DD to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #36 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. EE to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #37 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. FF to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #38 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. GG to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #39 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. HH to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #40 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. II to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #41 Exhibit Exhibit Ex. JJ to Decl. of W. Steven Berman, #42 Text of Proposed Order)(BERMAN, W.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY Consent to Removal (ROBINSON, MICHAEL)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. ROBINSON, IV on behalf of BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY (ROBINSON, MICHAEL)
August 9, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOHN EYNON, NATIONAL FOAM, INC.. (jwl, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONAL FOAM, INC. from Common Pleas Montgomery County, case number 2018-16809. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183003) (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EYNON v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ROBINSON, IV
Represented By: PHILIP M. COLICCHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGUS FIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FOAM, INC.
Represented By: KEITH E. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEMGUARD, INC.
Represented By: ERIN P. LOUCKS
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANSUL
Represented By: ERIN P. LOUCKS
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN EYNON
Represented By: W. STEVEN BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?