ZIMMER v. AIR CANADA, INC.
Plaintiff: EMILY ZIMMER
Defendant: AIR CANADA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03443
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/11/2018 IS VACATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/5/2018. 9/5/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 1/23/2019 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(jwl, )
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/11/2018 AT 04:15 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/4/2018. 9/4/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AIR CANADA, INC..(HAMILL, JOSEPH)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by AIR CANADA, INC..(HAMILL, JOSEPH)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 12(b) Procedural Order (CJL)
August 7, 2018 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
August 7, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EMILY ZIMMER. (rf, )
August 7, 2018 1 Original Summons Issued as to AIR CANADA, INC forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 8/7/18.(rf, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AIR CANADA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE183155.), filed by EMILY ZIMMER, JURY TRIAL DEMAND(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZIMMER v. AIR CANADA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY ZIMMER
Represented By: FRANCIS J. CURRAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR CANADA, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH J. HAMILL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?