JACKSON v. PHILADELPHIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY et al
Plaintiff: LAVON A. JACKSON
Defendant: MR. EDGAR CAMPBELLE, PHILADELPHIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY, MR. ROBERT BRADY, THE 69 WORLD LEADERS THAT REPRESENT THE RESIDENTS FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA, SECRETARY, WARD LEADERS FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA, THE 69 WARD LEADERS THAT REPRESENT THE RESIDENTS FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF PHILA CHAIR AND WARD LEADERS, SECRETARIES AND SERGEANTS-AT-ARMS and SINCERE HARRIS
Case Number: 2:2018cv03492
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING #19 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/9/18. 10/9/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (va, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED BY LAVON A. JACKSON.(fdc)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING #16 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/2/18. 10/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (va, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 17 Statement by LAVON A. JACKSON. (va, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, filed by LAVON A. JACKSON..(va, )
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO AMEND THE CAPTION TO REFLECT THAT THE FOLLOWING ARE THE NAMED DEFENDANTS: (1) PHILADELPHIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY; (2) MR. ROBERT BRADY; (3) MR. EDGAR CAMPBELLE; (4) MS. SINCERE HARRIS; (5) SECRETARIES AND SERGEANTS-AT-ARMS; AND (6) WARD LEADERS FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA. THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/11/18. 9/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (va, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/11/18. 9/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (va, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROBERT BRADY, EDGAR CAMPBELLE, DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF PHILA CHAIR AND WARD LEADERS, PHILADELPHIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY, SECRETARY, THE 69 WARD LEADERS THAT REPRESENT THE RESIDENTS FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA, filed by LAVON A. JACKSON.(amas)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 Statement, re: "Amended Reason for Complaint" by LAVON A. JACKSON. (va, )
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. JACKSON IS GIVEN LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER IN THE EVENT HE CAN SET FORTH A PLAUSIBLE CLAIM FOR RELIEF REGARDING HIS ALLEGATION THAT HE WAS PREVENTED FROM RUNNING FOR OFFICE. IF JACKSON FILES A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, HE SHALL IDENTIFY ALL OF THE DEFENDANTS IN THE CAPTION OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DESCRIBE IN DETAIL HOW EACH DEFENDANT PREVENTED HIM FROM RUNNING FOR OFFICE. JACKSON'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL NOT RELY ON OR REFER TO OTHER PLEADINGS OR EXHIBITS FILED IN THIS CASE. THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL NOT RAISE ANY CLAIMS FOR WHICH JACKSON DOES NOT HAVE STANDING, INCLUDING HIS GENERALIZED GRIEVANCES ABOUT THE DEMOCRATIC PARTY. UPON THE FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND JACKSON A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM TO BE USED BY A PRO SE LITIGANT FILING A CIVIL ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. JACKSON MAY USE THIS FORM TO PREPARE HIS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. IF JACKSON FAILS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/30/18. 8/31/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH NEW COMPLAINT FORM. (va, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/30/18. 8/31/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (va, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 Statement of Facts, by LAVON A. JACKSON. (va, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROBERT BRADY, EDGAR CAMPBELLE, DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF PHILA CHAIR AND WARD LEADERS, SECRETARY, et al, together with Amended Statement, filed by LAVON A. JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Statement) (va, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 Statement, by LAVON A. JACKSON. (va, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 Statement, by LAVON A. JACKSON. (va, )
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, FOR LACK OF STANDING AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 8(A) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. JACKSON IS GIVEN LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER IN THE EVENT HE CAN DEMONSTRATE THAT HE HAS STANDING TO PURSUE HIS CLAIMS AND SET FORTH A PLAUSIBLE CLAIM FOR RELIEF. IF JACKSON FILES AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, HE SHALL IDENTIFY ALL OF THE DEFENDANTS IN THE CAPTION OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DESCRIBE IN DETAIL THE BASIS FOR HIS CLAIMS AGAINST EACH DEFENDANT. ANY AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL INCLUDE ALL OF THE CLAIMS THAT JACKSON SEEKS TO PURSUE IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT RELYING ON OR REFERRING TO OTHER PLEADINGS OR EXHIBITS FILED IN THIS MATTER. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND JACKSON A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM TO BE USED BY A PRO SE LITIGANT FILING A CIVIL ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. JACKSON MAY USE THIS FORM TO PREPARE HIS AMENDED COMPLAINT. IF JACKSON FAILS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/21/18. 8/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH NEW COMPLAINT FORM. (va, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/21/18. 8/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (va, )
August 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LAVON A. JACKSON. (ahf)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ROBERT BRADY, EDGAR CAMPBELLE, PHILADELPHIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY, SECRETARY, THE 69 WARD LEADERS THAT REPRESENT THE RESIDENTS FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA, filed by LAVON A. JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY LAVON A. JACKSON.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. PHILADELPHIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. EDGAR CAMPBELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. ROBERT BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE 69 WORLD LEADERS THAT REPRESENT THE RESIDENTS FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARD LEADERS FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE 69 WARD LEADERS THAT REPRESENT THE RESIDENTS FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF PHILA CHAIR AND WARD LEADERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARIES AND SERGEANTS-AT-ARMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SINCERE HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAVON A. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?