ABADI v. CROWN INDUSTRIALS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ALEX ABADI
Defendant: NORTHERN PRODUCTS INCORPORATED, GE SUPPLY, INC. and CROWN INDUSTRIALS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv03493
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALEX ABADI re: Brian Johnson served Summons and Complaint upon All Defendants by Hand Delivery. All Defendants. (TROY, PATRICK)
September 5, 2018 3 Alias Summons Issued as to CROWN INDUSTRIALS, LLC, GE SUPPLY, INC., NORTHERN PRODUCTS INCORPORATED. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 9/5/2018(kp, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Praecipe to Reissue Original Summons or Alias Summons by ALEX ABADI. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(TROY, PATRICK) Modified on 9/6/2018 (tjd).
August 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALEX ABADI. (rf, )
August 17, 2018 3 Original Summons Issued as to CROWN INDUSTRIALS, LLC, GE SUPPLY, INC., NORTHERN PRODUCTS INCORPORATED forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 8/17/18. (rf, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CROWN INDUSTRIALS, LLC, GE SUPPLY, INC., NORTHERN PRODUCTS INCORPORATED ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE183301.), filed by ALEX ABADI., JURY TRIAL DEMAND, EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Forms, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit)(rf, ) Modified on 8/20/2018 (fb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABADI v. CROWN INDUSTRIALS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN PRODUCTS INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE SUPPLY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN INDUSTRIALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX ABADI
Represented By: PATRICK JOSEPH TROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?