HENWOOD et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY

Plaintiff: JANE HENWOOD and JOHN HENWOOD
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv03496
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2018 Original record transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California via inter-district transfer system. (fb)
September 4, 2018 3 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO - 100) transferring this action to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of 10/3/16, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (mbh, )
August 20, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J. MCCORMICK, JR on behalf of JANE HENWOOD, JOHN HENWOOD with Certificate of Service(MCCORMICK, BRIAN)
August 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JANE HENWOOD, JOHN HENWOOD. (ahf)
August 17, 2018 Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/17/2018 (ahf)
August 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183306.), filed by JOHN HENWOOD, JANE HENWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENWOOD et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE HENWOOD
Represented By: DENA YOUNG
Represented By: BRIAN J. MCCORMICK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HENWOOD
Represented By: DENA YOUNG
Represented By: BRIAN J. MCCORMICK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?