7-ELEVEN, INC. v. JAGIR INC. et al
Plaintiff: 7-ELEVEN, INC.
Defendant: AMRIT DHALIWAL and JAGIR INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03521
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Referring Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 17 Exhibit List - Prehearing Memoranda Setting for Witness List and Exhibit List by 7-ELEVEN, INC... Certificate of Service (KERNEN, JOSEPH)
October 18, 2018 Filing 16 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by AMRIT DHALIWAL. (DURHAM, STEPHEN)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by JAGIR INC., New Matter, Certificate of Service.(DURHAM, STEPHEN) Modified on 10/19/2018 (md).
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AMRIT DHALIWAL, JAGIR INC. (DURHAM, STEPHEN) Modified on 10/15/2018 (md).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT JAGIR INC AND DEFENDANT AMRIT DHALIWAL SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY 10/5/2018; EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SET FOR 10/23/2018 10:00 AM. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE THEIR ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (DOC. 1) NO LATER THAN 10/19/18. NO LATER THAN 10/18/18 THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT PRE-HEARING MEMORANDA SETTINGS FORTH THE WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS EACH PARTY EXPECTS TO INTRODUCE AT THE HEARING, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 9/28/18. 10/1/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Telephone Conference held on 9/28/18 (rf, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF STEPHEN DURHAM. filed by AMRIT DHALIWAL. (DURHAM, STEPHEN) Modified on 9/28/2018 (nd, ). Modified on 10/3/2018 (md).
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JOHN HUGHES, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/25/18.9/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 9/26/18)(kw, )
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF NORMAN LEON, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/25/18.9/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 9/26/18)(kw, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Norman Leon ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13067503.) filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(KERNEN, JOSEPH)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of John Hughes ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13067332.) filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(KERNEN, JOSEPH)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of this Court's September 20, 2018 Order (KERNEN, JOSEPH)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/28/2018 11:00 AM. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PROMPTLY SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER ON DEFENDANTS AND ON ANY KNOWN COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS FURTHER ORDERED TO FILE AN AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF THIS ORDER BY CLOSE OF BUSINESS 9/25/18, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 9/20/18. 9/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. 3) IS REFERRED TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/28/18. 8/30/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC..Memorandum of Law; Declarations; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(KERNEN, JOSEPH)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent SEJ ASSET MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT CO., INC., Corporate Parent SEVEN-ELEVEN JAPAN CO., LTD., Corporate Parent SEVEN & I HOLDINGS CO., LTD. for 7-ELEVEN, INC.. by 7-ELEVEN, INC..(jl, )
August 20, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to AMRIT DHALIWAL, JAGIR INC.. Forwarded To: JOSEPH KERNEN on 8/21/18 (jl, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMRIT DHALIWAL, JAGIR INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE183365.), filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 CASE MANAGEMENT FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 7-ELEVEN, INC. v. JAGIR INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 7-ELEVEN, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH KERNEN
Represented By: JOHN HUGHES
Represented By: NORMAN M. LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMRIT DHALIWAL
Represented By: STEPHEN DURHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAGIR INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN DURHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?