BRODERICK et al v. FOSTER WHEELER LLC et al
Plaintiff: EILEEN BRODERICK and ALFRED C. BRODERICK
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER LLC, KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO., AURORA PUMP, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP, WARREN PUMPS LLC, CLEAVER BROOKS, TRANE US INC., PECORA CORPORATION, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, DREVER COMPANY, CARRIER CORPORATION, JOHN CRANE, INC., J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES, ANCHOR DARLING VALVE, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., CRANE COMPANY, CATERPILLAR, INC., MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., COPES VULCAN, GENERAL ELECTRIC CO., FLOWSERVE, GOULDS PUMPS, INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., CROSBY VALVE LLC, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION and IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Respondent: CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv03584
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Referring Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
2 Judge: THOMAS J RUETER
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO TO HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/17/20. 6/17/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) .
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS READY FOR REASSIGNMENT AND RESOLUTION OF ALL REMAINING ISSUES. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO REASSIGN THE CASE IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE PROCEDURES OF THE COURT FOR THE ORDINARY RANDOM REASSIGNMENT OF ASBESTOS CASES. A PROCEDURAL BACKGROUND MEMORANDUM IS ATTACHED TO THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/16/2020. 6/16/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY M. ALEXANDER on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER LLC with Certificate of Service(ALEXANDER, TIFFANY)
May 29, 2020 Filing 164 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report in Response to the Court's April 27, 2020 Rule to Show Cause by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER THAT THE UNOPPOSED MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CLEAVER BROOKS AND AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/27/2020.4/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER THAT A RULE IS ISSUED FOR THE PARTIES TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE REASSIGNED TO AN EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA DISTRICT COURT JUDGE FOR DISPOSITION. COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT REPORT TO THE COURT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. FAILURE TO PROVIDE A STATUS UPDATE MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/27/2020. 4/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 161 RESPONSE in Support re #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service filed by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. (JASONS, CATHERINE)
April 23, 2020 Filing 160 RESPONSE in Support re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FOSTER WHEELER LLC. (VALINIS, SUSAN)
April 23, 2020 Filing 159 RESPONSE in Support re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WARREN PUMPS LLC. (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
April 23, 2020 Filing 158 RESPONSE in Support re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC CO.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 2A, #5 Exhibit 2B, #6 Exhibit 2C, #7 Exhibit 2D, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15 (Part 1), #21 Exhibit 15 (Part 2), #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28)(MCSHEA, JOHN)
April 23, 2020 Filing 157 REPLY to Response to Motion re #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by COPES VULCAN. (TURNER, TIFFANY)
April 22, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK re #146 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiff's Notice of Withdraw of plaintiffs' opposition to the motion for summary judgment of defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation which opposition was filed on April 3, 2020 (ROWE, MICHAEL)
April 22, 2020 Filing 155 RESPONSE in Support re #144 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MCSHEA, JOHN)
April 22, 2020 Filing 154 Memorandum of Law in Support re #135 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #145 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Amended) , REPLY to Response to Motion filed by CRANE COMPANY. (BRUCH, G.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 153 RESPONSE in Opposition re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response to Foster Wheeler's Motion filed by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1 and P-2, #2 Exhibit P-3 and P-4, #3 Exhibit P-5 to P-6, #4 Exhibit P-7, #5 Exhibit P-8 and P-9, #6 Exhibit P-10 and P-11, #7 Exhibit P-12 and P-13, #8 Exhibit P-14)(ROWE, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2020 Filing 152 RESPONSE in Opposition re #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response to Union Carbide's Motion filed by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1 to P-3, #2 Exhibit P-4, #3 Exhibit P-5 to P-10, #4 Exhibit P-11, #5 Exhibit P-12 to P-13, #6 Exhibit P-14)(ROWE, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2020 Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff''s Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to CBS's Motion filed by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1 and P-2, #2 Exhibit P-3 and P-4, #3 Exhibit P-5 to P-13, #4 Exhibit P-14 and P-15, #5 Exhibit P-16 to P-17, #6 Exhibit P-18, #7 Exhibit P-19)(ROWE, MICHAEL)
April 3, 2020 Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Amended) Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Crane's Motion filed by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1 and P-2, #2 Exhibit P-3 and P-4, #3 Exhibit P-5, #4 Exhibit P-6 to P-12)(ROWE, MICHAEL)
April 3, 2020 Filing 149 RESPONSE in Opposition re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum in Opposition to GE's Motion filed by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1 and P-2, #2 Exhibit P-3 and P-4, #3 Exhibit P-5, #4 Exhibit Exhibit P-6 to P-9)(ROWE, MICHAEL)
April 3, 2020 Filing 148 RESPONSE in Opposition re #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Copes Vulcan's Motion filed by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit P-1 and P-2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit P-3 and P-4, #3 Exhibit Exhibit P-5, #4 Exhibit Exhibit P-6, #5 Exhibit Exhibit P-7)(ROWE, MICHAEL)
April 3, 2020 Filing 147 RESPONSE in Opposition re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Warren's motion filed by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit P-1 and P-2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit P-3 and P-4, #3 Exhibit Exhibit P-5, #4 Exhibit Exhibit P-6, #5 Exhibit Exhibit P-7 to P-10)(ROWE, MICHAEL)
April 3, 2020 Filing 146 RESPONSE in Opposition re #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Air & Liquid System's Motion filed by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits P-1 and P-2, #2 Exhibit Exhibits P-3 and P-4, #3 Exhibit Exhibit P-5, #4 Exhibit Exhibit P-6 to P-8)(ROWE, MICHAEL)
March 10, 2020 Filing 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Amended) filed by CRANE COMPANY(AS SUCCESSOR TO CHAPMAN VALVE MANUFACTURING COMPANY ).Certificate of Service, Memorandum.(BRUCH, G.)
March 9, 2020 Filing 144 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(MCSHEA, JOHN)
March 9, 2020 Filing 143 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP.Certificate of Service. (HOWARTH, JOHN)
March 9, 2020 Filing 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.Memorandum of Law, Order, Exhibits and Certificate of Service. (JASONS, CATHERINE)
March 9, 2020 Filing 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WARREN PUMPS LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
March 9, 2020 Filing 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC CO..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(MCSHEA, JOHN)
March 9, 2020 Filing 139 Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of it's Motion for Summary Judgment by CRANE COMPANY(AS SUCCESSOR TO CHAPMAN VALVE MANUFACTURING COMPANY ). (BRUCH, G.)
March 9, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by COPES VULCAN.Memorandum. (TURNER, TIFFANY)
March 9, 2020 Filing 137 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FOSTER WHEELER LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(VALINIS, SUSAN)
March 9, 2020 Filing 136 Statement Of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment by CLEAVER BROOKS(DIVISION OF AQUA-CHEM, INC.). (VALINIS, SUSAN)
March 9, 2020 Filing 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CRANE COMPANY(AS SUCCESSOR TO CHAPMAN VALVE MANUFACTURING COMPANY ).Certificate of Service, Memorandum.Motions referred to THOMAS J. RUETER.(BRUCH, G.) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE WITH CORRECT CASE NUMBER ON PDF* Modified on 3/10/2020 (lisad, ).
March 9, 2020 Filing 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEAVER BROOKS(DIVISION OF AQUA-CHEM, INC.).Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (VALINIS, SUSAN)
January 22, 2020 Filing 133 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims and Certificate of Service by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
January 3, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION of Service of Expert Reports (JASONS, CATHERINE)
January 3, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE by JOHN CRANE, INC. of Service of Expert Reports (TURNER, TIFFANY)
January 3, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE by COPES VULCAN SERVICE OF EXPERT REPORTS (TURNER, TIFFANY)
November 26, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. OF SERVICE OF EXPERT REPORTS (SINGER, STEWART)
November 19, 2019 Filing 128 Disclosure by JOHN CRANE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(TURNER, TIFFANY)
November 15, 2019 Filing 127 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO..(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
November 15, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance, Withdrawal of Appearance on behalf of KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO. (MCGARRITY, JENNIFER) Modified on 11/18/2019 (lisad, ).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDERED THAT THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANTS ARE VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/5/19. 11/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 124 STATUS REPORT Regarding Particular Defendants Plaintiff Agrees To Dismiss From the Action by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES IS GRANTED. FACT DISCOVERT DUE 9/20/2019. EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/5/2020., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/9/2020. ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 8/8/2019. 8/9/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 122 Letter to Honorable Thomas J. Rueter re extension of all deadlines filed by JOHN CRANE, INC. (TURNER, TIFFANY) Modified on 8/9/2019 (lisad, ).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES IS HEREBY DISMISSED FROM THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER AGREED THAT ALL CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/8/2019. 7/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 120 STIPULATION of Dismissal by J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES. (JACKSON, DAMIAN) *FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 7/9/2019 (lisad, ).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER THAT EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/6/2020., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 2/6/2020. ALL OTHER SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 6/18/19. 6/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 6/18/2019.6/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 117 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by ANCHOR DARLING VALVE.(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
June 3, 2019 Filing 116 Anchor Darling Valve Company's ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Crossclaims against All Defendants by ANCHOR DARLING VALVE.(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
June 3, 2019 Filing 115 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Extension of Case Management Deadlines filed by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to THOMAS J. RUETER.(ROWE, MICHAEL)
May 17, 2019 Filing 114 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
April 24, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY M. STOKES on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION with and Withdrawal of Appearance of Kimberley Woodie, Esq. and Joan Depfer, Esq. with Certificate of Service(STOKES, GREGORY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 112 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by TRANE US INC..(RYAN, DANIEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 111 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(RYAN, DANIEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 110 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 109 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims and Answer to Cross Claims to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CARRIER CORPORATION.(DEPFER, JOAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 108 Defendant Clark Equipment Company's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
February 19, 2019 Filing 107 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by COPES VULCAN.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
February 19, 2019 Filing 106 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
January 25, 2019 Filing 105 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by PECORA CORPORATION.(JOHANSON, THOMAS)
January 24, 2019 Filing 104 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by CATERPILLAR, INC..(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
January 18, 2019 Filing 103 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
January 18, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART R. SINGER on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. with Certificate of Service(SINGER, STEWART)
January 17, 2019 Filing 101 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims and Reply to, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CROSBY VALVE LLC.(KADISH, ERIC)
January 16, 2019 Filing 100 AW Chesteron's ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by A.W. CHESTERTON, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
January 16, 2019 Filing 99 BWIP's ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY).(TURLIK, JOHN)
January 16, 2019 Filing 98 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by CLEAVER BROOKS.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
January 11, 2019 Filing 97 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims and Reply to, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AURORA PUMP.(HADDEN, JAMES)
January 11, 2019 Filing 96 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES).(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
January 11, 2019 Filing 95 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 11, 2019 Filing 94 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by GENERAL ELECTRIC CO..(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 10, 2019 Filing 93 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP, ANCHOR DARLING VALVE, AURORA PUMP, CARRIER CORPORATION, CATERPILLAR, INC., CBS CORPORATION, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CLEAVER BROOKS, COPES VULCAN, CRANE COMPANY(AS SUCCESSOR TO CHAPMAN VALVE MANUFACTURING COMPANY ), CRANE COMPANY, CROSBY VALVE LLC, DREVER COMPANY, FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES), FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY), FOSTER WHEELER LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC CO., GOULDS PUMPS, INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES, JOHN CRANE, INC., KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, PECORA CORPORATION, TRANE US INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
December 31, 2018 Filing 92 Disclosure with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES).(PITT, TERENCE)
December 28, 2018 Summons Issued as to CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CRANE COMPANY, GREENE, TWEED & CO., J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES. Four Originals Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/28/18 (ti, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 91 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT together with Certificate of Service against A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP, ANCHOR DARLING VALVE, AURORA PUMP, CARRIER CORPORATION, CATERPILLAR, INC., CBS CORPORATION, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CLEAVER BROOKS, COPES VULCAN, CRANE COMPANY(AS SUCCESSOR TO CHAPMAN VALVE MANUFACTURING COMPANY ), CRANE COMPANY, CROSBY VALVE LLC, DREVER COMPANY, FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES), FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY), FOSTER WHEELER LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC CO., GOULDS PUMPS, INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES, JOHN CRANE, INC., KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, PECORA CORPORATION, TRANE US INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, WARREN PUMPS LLC, filed by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK.(ti, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 90 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
December 20, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BLOCK on behalf of MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
December 14, 2018 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER Pretrial Conference held on 12/14/18 (ti, )
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED, AND THAT PLAINTIFF IS HEREBY PERMITTED TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 12/14/18.12/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY MUST BE COMPLETED BY 6/21/2019. EXPERT DISCOVERY MUST BE COMPLETED BY 11/4/2019. SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS MUST BE COMPLETED BY 12/6/2019, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 12/14/18. 12/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Main Document 86 replaced on 12/17/2018) (lisad, ).
December 14, 2018 Filing 85 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
December 14, 2018 Filing 84 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
December 14, 2018 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint together with and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Cross Claims and Third Party Defendants with Jury Demand by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
December 14, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART R. SINGER on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. with Certificate of Service(SINGER, STEWART)
December 12, 2018 Filing 81 Plaintiff's Case Status Report by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. Certificate of Service. (ROWE, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/13/2018 (lisad, ).
December 12, 2018 Filing 80 Statement Plaintiff's Submission in Accordance with MDL 875 Admin. Order 12 by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
December 11, 2018 Filing 79 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by CATERPILLAR, INC..(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
December 11, 2018 Filing 78 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CATERPILLAR, INC..(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
December 11, 2018 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by CATERPILLAR, INC..(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
December 10, 2018 Filing 76 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK.Memorandum of Law Certificate of Service.Motions referred to THOMAS J. RUETER.(ROWE, MICHAEL)
December 7, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. JOHANSON on behalf of PECORA CORPORATION (JOHANSON, THOMAS)
December 6, 2018 Filing 74 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by PECORA CORPORATION.(JOHANSON, THOMAS)
December 6, 2018 Filing 73 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PECORA CORPORATION.(JOHANSON, THOMAS)
December 6, 2018 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint together with TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by PECORA CORPORATION.(JOHANSON, THOMAS)
December 6, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. JOHANSON on behalf of PECORA CORPORATION (JOHANSON, THOMAS) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE* Modified on 12/7/2018 (lisad, ).
December 4, 2018 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, and Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY).(TURLIK, JOHN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, and Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by A.W. CHESTERTON, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
November 26, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. CANCELLIERE, JR on behalf of ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK with Certificate of Service(CANCELLIERE, MICHAEL)
November 21, 2018 Filing 67 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by CLEAVER BROOKS.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
November 14, 2018 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES).(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
November 8, 2018 Filing 65 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
November 8, 2018 Filing 64 Defendant Clark Equipment Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
November 8, 2018 Filing 63 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
November 8, 2018 Filing 62 Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
November 8, 2018 Filing 61 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by TRANE US INC..(RYAN, DANIEL)
November 8, 2018 Filing 60 Defendant, Trane US Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by TRANE US INC..(RYAN, DANIEL)
November 8, 2018 Filing 59 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(RYAN, DANIEL)
November 8, 2018 Filing 58 Defendant Ingersoll Rand Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(RYAN, DANIEL)
November 6, 2018 Filing 57 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by A.W. CHESTERTON, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
November 6, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. (TURLIK, JOHN)
November 6, 2018 Filing 55 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY).(TURLIK, JOHN) Modified on 11/6/2018 (fb).
November 6, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY) (TURLIK, JOHN) Modified on 11/6/2018 (fb).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/14/2018 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3-C, THIRD FLOOR, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 11/5/18. 11/5/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER THAT THE COURT REFERS THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION PENDING IN MDL 875 TO THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER FOR PROCEEDINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/2/18. 11/2/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 51 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
November 2, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE)
November 1, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of ANCHOR DARLING VALVE with Certificate of Service of Anchor Darling Valve Company, improperly named as Anchor Darling Valve(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
October 31, 2018 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint together with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIMS, AND ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP.(HOWARTH, JOHN)
October 26, 2018 Filing 47 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO..(CARRERAS, LINA)
October 26, 2018 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO..(CARRERAS, LINA)
October 19, 2018 Filing 45 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AURORA PUMP.(HADDEN, JAMES)
October 15, 2018 Filing 44 Disclosure by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 15, 2018 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Smiths Group plc by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 15, 2018 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 11, 2018 Filing 41 Disclosure by COPES VULCAN.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 11, 2018 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Electrolux North America, Inc. by COPES VULCAN.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 11, 2018 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by COPES VULCAN.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 3, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of ANCHOR DARLING VALVE with Certificate of Service(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
October 1, 2018 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross claims and , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CARRIER CORPORATION.(DEPFER, JOAN)
September 28, 2018 Filing 36 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP.(HOWARTH, JOHN)
September 28, 2018 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP.(HOWARTH, JOHN)
September 27, 2018 Filing 34 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ti, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. with Certificate of Service by CLEAVER BROOKS.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
September 20, 2018 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by CLEAVER BROOKS.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
September 19, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of TRANE US INC. (RYAN, DANIEL)
September 18, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (RYAN, DANIEL)
September 18, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by CASEY R COBURN on behalf of ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(COBURN, CASEY)
September 18, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. ROWE on behalf of ALFRED C. BRODERICK, EILEEN BRODERICK with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ROWE, MICHAEL)
September 18, 2018 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including FLOWSERVE CORPORATION with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES).(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
September 17, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. SCHEETS on behalf of WARREN PUMPS LLC (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
September 17, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN on behalf of WARREN PUMPS LLC (WEIMANN, CHRISTIAN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH A. LEWIS on behalf of CLEAVER BROOKS (LEWIS, LEAH)
September 11, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of CLEAVER BROOKS (VALINIS, SUSAN)
September 5, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE M. PITT on behalf of FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES) (PITT, TERENCE)
September 5, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL on behalf of FLOWSERVE(AS SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM VALVES) (LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
September 4, 2018 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
September 4, 2018 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL ELECTRIC CO..(MCSHEA, JOHN)
August 31, 2018 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DREVER COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 17 DREVER COMPANY'S ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by DREVER COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of DREVER COMPANY (BRUCH, G.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 14 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE COMPANY (BRUCH, G.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including United Technologies Corp. by CARRIER CORPORATION.(DEPFER, JOAN)
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JOAN P. DEPFER on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION (DEPFER, JOAN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including wholly-owned subsidiary of The J.R. Clarkson Company, LLC and an indirect wholly-owned subsidiary of Emerson Electric Co. with Certificate of Service by CROSBY VALVE LLC.(KADISH, ERIC)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of CROSBY VALVE LLC with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT Inc. with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMPS, INC..(LUXTON, STEVEN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. LUXTON on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS, INC. with Certificate of Service(LUXTON, STEVEN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Joinder IN REMOVAL AND NOTICE OF INDEPENDENT GROUNDS FOR REMOVAL filed by CRANE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Pantaleoni, #3 Exhibit C-1a Sargent, #4 Exhibit C-1b Sargent, #5 Exhibit C-1c Sargent, #6 Exhibit C-1d Sargent, #7 Exhibit C-2a Sargent, #8 Exhibit C-2b Sargent, #9 Exhibit C-2c Sargent, #10 Exhibit D-1a Forman, #11 Exhibit D-1b Forman, #12 Exhibit D-1c Forman, #13 Exhibit D-2a Forman, #14 Exhibit D-2b Forman)(BRUCH, G.) Modified on 8/30/2018 (lisad, ).
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of WARREN PUMPS LLC (RAU, TIMOTHY)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and IMO Holdings, Inc. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent FOSTER WHEELER AG (SWITZERLAND), Corporate Parent FOSTER WHEELER LTD. (BERMUDA), Corporate Parent FOSTER WHEELER HOLDINGS LTD. (BERMUDA), Corporate Parent FOSTER WHEELER L.L.C. (DELAWARE) for FOSTER WHEELER LLC. by FOSTER WHEELER LLC.(amas)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE OF FILING by FOSTER WHEELER LLC from PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 180702225. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183545) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(amas) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/23/2018) (amas, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRODERICK et al v. FOSTER WHEELER LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Represented By: TIFFANY M. ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO.
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY
Represented By: LINA M. CARRERAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP
Represented By: JAMES P. HADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP
Represented By: JOHN S. HOWARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SCHEETS
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Represented By: LEAH A. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANE US INC.
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PECORA CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOHANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREVER COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: JOAN P. DEPFER
Represented By: GREGORY M. STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES
Represented By: DAMIAN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR DARLING VALVE
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: STEWART R. SINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON, INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPES VULCAN
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC CO.
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE
Represented By: BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL
Represented By: TERENCE M. PITT
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN A. LUXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE, TWEED & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROSBY VALVE LLC
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EILEEN BRODERICK
Represented By: EDWARD M. NASS
Represented By: CASEY R COBURN
Represented By: MICHAEL A. ROWE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. CANCELLIERE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFRED C. BRODERICK
Represented By: EDWARD M. NASS
Represented By: CASEY R COBURN
Represented By: MICHAEL A. ROWE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. CANCELLIERE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?