MYRICK v. ADIRAJU et al
Plaintiff: CAROLYN MYRICK
Defendant: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES, RAMESH ADIRAJU, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-10, NATIONAL CORPORATE RESEARCH, LTD. and PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - LOWER BUCKS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv03629
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - LOWER BUCKS, LLC. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 10/16/2018 (sg, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 Praecipe to Issue Alias Summons by CAROLYN MYRICK. (IGWE, EMEKA) Modified on 10/17/2018 (lisad, ).
September 6, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - LOWER BUCKS, LLC forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel. (rf, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - LOWER BUCKS, LLC, filed by CAROLYN MYRICK., JURY TRIAL DEMAND, VERIFICATION.(rf, )
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT MS MYRICK SHALL NO LATER THAN 9/4/18 EITHER: AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO PLEAD DIVERSITY OF CITIZENSHIP CONSISTENT WITH FRCP 11 OR SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING 10 PAGES AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT DISMISS THIS CASE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/27/18. 8/28/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, EMAILED.(rf, )
August 24, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CAROLYN MYRICK. (jwl, )
August 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to RAMESH ADIRAJU, NATIONAL CORPORATE RESEARCH, LTD., PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - LOWER BUCKS, LLC. Four Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/27/18 (jwl, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RAMESH ADIRAJU, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-10, NATIONAL CORPORATE RESEARCH, LTD., PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - LOWER BUCKS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183645.), filed by CAROLYN MYRICK.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MYRICK v. ADIRAJU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN MYRICK
Represented By: EMEKA IGWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMESH ADIRAJU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CORPORATE RESEARCH, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - LOWER BUCKS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?