IN RE: JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE
Defendant: JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE and WILLIAM C. MILLER
Case Number: 2:2018cv03630
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE APPEAL IS DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THE MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/24/2018. 9/24/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kp, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 Original Bankruptcy record received together with notice from Bankruptcy Court that the designation of the record on appeal has not been filed. (Attachments: #1 Docket, Order, Notice of Appeal)(ahf)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE from the order of Bankruptcy Judge Timothy B. McGrath filed on 7/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Entire Docket File, #2 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: WILLIAM C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?