DOE v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MALLINCKRODT, LLC, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., ALLERGAN PLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ACTAVIS LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., CEPHALON, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, NORAMCO, INC. and MALLINCKRODT, PLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv03637
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE MANUFACTURER DEFENDANTS, WITHOUT WAIVER OF ANY DEFENSES, SHALL HAVE THROUGH AND INCLUDING THE DATE 30 DATE AFTER THE ENTRY OF A DECISION BY THE JPML, GRANTING A MOTION TO VACATE A CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER COVERING THIS ACTION, OR OTHERWISE FINALLY DENYING TRANSFER OF THIS ACTION TO THE MDL, TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/15/18. 10/15/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID F. ABERNETHY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(ABERNETHY, DAVID)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DISTRIBUTORS DEFENDANS, WITHOUT WAIVER OF ANY DEFENSES, SHALL HAVE THROUGH AND INCLUDING 30 DAYS AFTER THE ENTRY OF A DECISION BY TEH JPML, GRANTING A MOTION TO VACATE A CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER COVERING THIS ACTION ( OR OTHERWISE FINALLY DENYING TRANSFER OF THIS ACTION TO THE MDL) TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/3/18. 10/3/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC S. RASPANTI on behalf of CARDINAL HEALTH, INC. with Certificate of Service(RASPANTI, MARC)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS KEITH ROSENBLUM on behalf of CARDINAL HEALTH, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW TODD NEWCOMER on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION with certificate of service(NEWCOMER, MATTHEW)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN KENDALL on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION with certificate of service(KENDALL, CAROLYN)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY B. HELLER on behalf of JOHN DOE (HELLER, GREGORY)
August 24, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOHN DOE. (jwl, )
August 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ALLERGAN PLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MALLINCKRODT, LLC, MALLINCKRODT, PLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. 23 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/27/18 (jwl, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ALLERGAN PLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MALLINCKRODT, LLC, MALLINCKRODT, PLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183656.), filed by JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: CAROLYN KENDALL
Represented By: MATTHEW TODD NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT, LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW H. HAVERSTICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Represented By: DANIEL T. BRIER
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL T. BRIER
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: ADAM S. TOLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: MARC S. RASPANTI
Represented By: DOUGLAS KEITH ROSENBLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL T. BRIER
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL T. BRIER
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL T. BRIER
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
Represented By: ADAM S. TOLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL T. BRIER
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Represented By: LOUIS W. SCHACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORAMCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT, PLC
Represented By: MATTHEW H. HAVERSTICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: JOHN K. WESTON
Represented By: GREGORY B. HELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?