JACKSON v. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: TONY JACKSON
Defendant: BETTS, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICER JOHN DOES #1-4 and SPICER
Case Number: 2:2018cv03646
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Referring Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/24/18. 10/25/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) Modified on 10/25/2018 (mbh, ).
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR on behalf of BETTS, SPICER with Certificate of Service(SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK ALL ACTIONS WITH THE GLAG "12-5690-PD" CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES, EXCEPT FOR THE LEAD CASE, CIV NO. 12-5690. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS ORDER ON THE DOCKETS OF ALL ACTIONS WITH THE FLAG "12-5690-PD" THAT HAVE BEEN ASSIGNED TO ME FOR PRE-TRIAL ADMINISTRATIVE PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/18/13. 8/28/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 27, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TONY JACKSON. (ahf)
August 27, 2018 Summons Issued as to BETTS, SPICER, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. 3 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/27/2018 (ahf)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BETTS, PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICER JOHN DOES #1-4, SPICER, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183715.), filed by TONY JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY JACKSON
Represented By: MICHAEL PILEGGI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETTS
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICER JOHN DOES #1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPICER
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?