SULLIVAN v. A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JACKIE L. SULLIVAN
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY, GOODYEAR CANADA, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, AURORA PUMP, GARDNER DENVER NASH, ITT BELL GOSSET, GENERAL DYNAMICS, CRANE CO., CLARK CONTROLLER CO., HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES, WARREN PUMPS LLC, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., BATH IRON WORKS, MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CARRIER CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, HERCULES, ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, JOHN CRANE, INC., NORTHERN PUMP, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, GARDNER DENVER, COONEY BROTHERS, KUNKLE VALVE, WEIL PUMP, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., VIAD CORP, ITT INC., EDWARDS VALVE, NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION, J.A. SEXAUER, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., JENKINS PUMPS, A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND & CO., FLOWSERVE, JENKINS VALVES, CBS CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. and WEIL MCLAIN
Case Number: 2:2018cv03685
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT CIVIL ACTION NUMBERS 18-3622 AND 18-3685 SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED UNDER 18-3622 FOR ALL PURPOSES. ALL PLEADINGS, MOTIONS, OR OTHER PAPERS ARE TO BE FILED UNDER CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3622. CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3685 SHALL BE STATISTICALLY CLOSED AND THE CAPTION OF CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3622 SHALL BE AMENDED TO INCLUDE ALL DEFENDANTS FROM CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3685. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED THAT 18-3622 ECF NO. 48 AND 18-3685 ECF NO. #16 , HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES MOTIONS TO DISMISS CROSS-CLAIMS ARE DENIED AS PREMATURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/12/18. 10/15/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 22 Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures with Certificate of Service by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.(HOWARTH, JOHN) Modified on 10/17/2018 (tjd).
October 11, 2018 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC..(HOWARTH, JOHN)
October 4, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants and Answer to Cross-Claims by NORTHERN PUMP. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(REBER, W.) Modified on 10/10/2018 (tjd).
October 4, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants and Answer to Cross-Claims by SQUARE D COMPANY. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(REBER, W.) Modified on 10/10/2018 (tjd).
October 4, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Cross Claims filed by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DISIPIO, BASIL)
September 24, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES Joint Letter to Court from counsels for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Viad Corporation and Plaintiff regarding merge of Civil Action No. 2:18-cv-03685-ER into Civil Action No. 2:18-cv-03622-GEKP (WASKOM, THOMAS)
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Cross Claims filed by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES. Brief, Certificate of Service and Proposed Order.(WASKOM, THOMAS) Modified on 9/21/2018 (tjd).
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. with Certificate of Service by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES.(WASKOM, THOMAS)
September 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS R. WASKOM on behalf of HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES with Certificate of Service(WASKOM, THOMAS)
September 13, 2018 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and IMO Holdings, Inc. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Replies to Crossclaims against All Defendants by AURORA PUMP.(HADDEN, JAMES)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SQUARE D COMPANY.(RIDEOUT, CHRISTINA)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA M. RIDEOUT on behalf of SQUARE D COMPANY with Certificate of Service(RIDEOUT, CHRISTINA)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of SQUARE D COMPANY with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims and Reply to Cross-Claims of Defendant , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NORTHERN PUMP.(REBER, W.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of NORTHERN PUMP with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. HOWARTH on behalf of BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. with Certificate of Service(HOWARTH, JOHN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING with Jury Demand with Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VIAD CORP from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 180702918. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183835)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SULLIVAN v. A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTINA M. RIDEOUT
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP
Represented By: JAMES P. HADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER NASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT BELL GOSSET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL DYNAMICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK CONTROLLER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES
Represented By: THOMAS R. WASKOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BATH IRON WORKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON CONTROLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERCULES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN PUMP
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF GOODRICH COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COONEY BROTHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KUNKLE VALVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORP
Represented By: KEVIN O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARDS VALVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. SEXAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: JOHN S. HOWARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENKINS PUMPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENKINS VALVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL MCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKIE L. SULLIVAN
Represented By: ROBERT E. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?