INGRAM v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: STEFAN INGRAM
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC, COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC and EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03776
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of the Complaint filed by COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MCTIGUE, MICHAEL)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DIANA L. CALLA, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/23/18. 10/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Diana L. Calla, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13124069.) filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..motion, affidavit, certificate of service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY WILL IN CASE NUMBER 18CV02870) Modified on 10/22/2018 (nd, ).
October 22, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Diana L. Calla, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13124064.) filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..certificate of counsel, certificate of service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT EXPERIAN TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 11/5/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/5/18. 10/5/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. with Certificate of Service by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint together with Defenses by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC MAY HAVE UNTIL 11/5/18 TO RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/3/18. 10/4/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CECIL J. JONES on behalf of WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JONES, CECIL)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH E. BRENNER on behalf of WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BRENNER, JOSEPH)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT COMCAST'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT WILL BE EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING 11/2/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/1/18. 10/2/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH MARIE BUSSEY-GARZA on behalf of COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC with Certificate of Service(BUSSEY-GARZA, ELIZABETH)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC.. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (MCTIGUE, MICHAEL) Modified on 10/1/2018 (fb).
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC.(MCTIGUE, MICHAEL)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL W. MCTIGUE, JR on behalf of COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC with Certificate of Service(MCTIGUE, MICHAEL)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEFAN INGRAM re: Travis Wyatt served Summons and Complaint upon WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC by personal service. WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEFAN INGRAM re: Tim Porvaznik served Summons and Complaint upon COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC by personal service. COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEFAN INGRAM re: Christopher Horton served Summons and Complaint upon EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC by personal service. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by STEFAN INGRAM re: Richard Krolikowski served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT) Modified on 9/19/2018 (fb).
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 12(b) Procedural Order(CJL)
September 5, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STEFAN INGRAM. (ahf)
September 5, 2018 Summons Issued as to COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC. 4 Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/6/2018 (ahf)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13025507.), filed by STEFAN INGRAM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INGRAM v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN D. KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH E. BRENNER
Represented By: CECIL J. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL W. MCTIGUE, JR.
Represented By: ELIZABETH MARIE BUSSEY-GARZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: DIANA L. CALLA
Represented By: MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEFAN INGRAM
Represented By: BRENT F. VULLINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?