MCFADDEN v. APPLE INC. et al
Plaintiff: TALLI J. MCFADDEN
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER BRIAN QUIRPLE, POLICE OFFICER JASON REID, POLICE OFFICER ANGEL ORTIZ, APPLE INC., BEST, JOANN (LAST NAME UNKNOWN), POLICE OFFICER TIMOTHY MURPHY, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, JOHN DOES AND JANE DOES'S 1-10, RICHARD KURTH, SUBPOENAS@APPLE.COM, POLICE OFFICER RYAN FLYNN, PARTNER K-9 BRIX and POLICE OFFICER(SGT.) MORACE
Case Number: 2:2018cv03779
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #13 Notice of Appeal filed by TALLI J. MCFADDEN. USCA Case Number 18-3377 (dmc, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF TALLI J. MCFADDEN'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL.(jpd, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by TALLI J. MCFADDEN. IFP GRANTED Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. (jpd, )
October 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL by TALLI J. MCFADDEN. IFP GRANTED Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. (jpd, )
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FOR RECONSIDERATION AND APPEAL (DOC. NO. 10) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS COURT'S MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (DOC. NOS. 6 & 7). SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/12/1810/15/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED ALONG WITH MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO PRO SE.(jpd, ) Modified on 10/16/2018 (lisad, ).
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF TALLI J. MCFADDEN'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FOR RECONSIDERATION AND APPEAL. (jpd, )
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S PREACIPE TO CORRECT THE RECORD WITH EXHIBITS (DOC. NO. 8) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/24/18. 9/25/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, ) Modified on 9/26/2018 (lisad, ).
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF TALLI J. MCFADDEN'S PRAECIPE TO CORRECT RECORD.(jpd, )
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL PAY THE $350.00 FILING FEE IN INSTALLMENTS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF FDC PHILADELPHIA. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURT'S MEMOORANDUM. PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TIME BARRED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) AND HIS STATE CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUIDCE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. PLAINTIFF IS NOT GIVEN LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS CASE. THE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IS DENIED AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/12/18. 9/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/12/18. 9/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, )
September 4, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TALLI J. MCFADDEN. (jwl, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by TALLI J. MCFADDEN.Brief.(jwl, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by TALLI J. MCFADDEN. (jwl, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JOANN (LAST NAME UNKNOWN), APPLE INC., BEST, BRIX, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RYAN FLYNN, JOHN DOES AND JANE DOES'S 1-10, RICHARD KURTH, MORACE, TIMOTHY MURPHY, ANGEL ORTIZ, BRIAN QUIRPLE, JASON REID, SUBPOENAS@APPLE.COM, filed by TALLI J. MCFADDEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by TALLI J. MCFADDEN..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCFADDEN v. APPLE INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER BRIAN QUIRPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER JASON REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER ANGEL ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANN (LAST NAME UNKNOWN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER TIMOTHY MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES AND JANE DOES'S 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD KURTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUBPOENAS@APPLE.COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER RYAN FLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARTNER K-9 BRIX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER(SGT.) MORACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALLI J. MCFADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?