SMITH v. KERSHENTSEF et al

Plaintiff: REINARD SMITH
Defendant: KEY & V AUTO SALES, VLAD (JOHN DOE), JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, ALEX KERSHENTSEF and MIKE (JOHN DOE)
Case Number: 2:2018cv03840
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, ALEX KERSHENTSEF, KEY & V AUTO SALES, MIKE (JOHN DOE), VLAD (JOHN DOE).Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(VOGIN, MARC)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC VOGIN on behalf of JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, ALEX KERSHENTSEF, KEY & V AUTO SALES, MIKE (JOHN DOE), VLAD (JOHN DOE) (VOGIN, MARC)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLFF REINARD SMITH, re: U.S. Marshal served Summons and Complaint upon DEFTS ALEX KERSHENTSEF, KEY & V AUTO SALES by personal service on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (kw, )
September 11, 2018 Two (2) Summons Issued as to ALEX KERSHENTSEF, KEY & V AUTO SALES. Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal Service on 9/11/18. (fdc)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/11/18.9/11/18 ENTERED AND COPY MAILED TO SMITH. COPY FORWARDED TO U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (fdc)
September 7, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by REINARD SMITH. (ahf)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, ALEX KERSHENTSEF, KEY & V AUTO SALES, MIKE (JOHN DOE), VLAD (JOHN DOE), filed by REINARD SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY REINARD SMITH.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. KERSHENTSEF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEY & V AUTO SALES
Represented By: MARC VOGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VLAD (JOHN DOE)
Represented By: MARC VOGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 1
Represented By: MARC VOGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 2
Represented By: MARC VOGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX KERSHENTSEF
Represented By: MARC VOGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE (JOHN DOE)
Represented By: MARC VOGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REINARD SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?