WOJCIECHOWSKI v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Plaintiff: STEPHEN JOSEPH WOJCIECHOWSKI
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv03843
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: LINDA K CARACAPPA
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 6 Social Security Magistrate Consent by STEPHEN JOSEPH WOJCIECHOWSKI.. (CHERMOL, DAVID)
October 4, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE CONSENT TO OR DECLINATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FAILURE TO COMPLETE AND FILE THE FORM SHALL BE DEEMED CONSENT TO THE JURISDICTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA ON 10/4/2018. 10/5/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 12, 2018 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kp, )
September 10, 2018 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent form)(kp, )
September 10, 2018 2 Standing Social Security Procedural Order 9/10/2018 Entered and copies e-mailed. (kp, )
September 10, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 2 Forwarded To: COUNSEL, 1 TO U.S ATTORNEY on 9/10/2018 (kp, )
September 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 184396.), filed by STEPHEN JOSEPH WOJCIECHOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/12/2018) (kp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOJCIECHOWSKI v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN JOSEPH WOJCIECHOWSKI
Represented By: DAVID F. CHERMOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?