SMITH v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: RICHARD SCOTT SMITH
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv03852
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JACOB P HART
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 US Marshal Return Re: Atty Gen. served on 10/1/18; Commissioner of SSA served on 10/3/18. (va, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 Social Security Magistrate Consent by RICHARD SCOTT SMITH.. (SILVER, JOSEPH)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (va, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 Social Security Procedural Order 9/11/18 Entered and copies e-mailed. (jaa, )
September 11, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 2 U.S. MARSHALS AND 1 U.S. ATTORNEYS on 9/11/18 (jaa, )
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES AND THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(I). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 9/11/18.9/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(sg, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by RICHARD SCOTT SMITH. (Attachments: #1 COVER SHEETS)(sg, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by RICHARD SCOTT SMITH..(sg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD SCOTT SMITH
Represented By: JOSEPH B SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?