VERNON v. INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO. et al
Plaintiff: HARRY VERNON
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO. and OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03902
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed. R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) filed by HARRY VERNON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(RUBINSTEIN, JONATHAN)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO., Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(PAUL, EDWARD) Modified on 10/23/2018 (md).
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS TO ADMIT ALISON O'NEAL MCMINN, ESQUIRE AND DANIEL S. ROBERTS, ESQUIRE AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL PAPER ARE ADMITTED IN THIS CASE AS COUNSEL AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/18/18. 10/19/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN O'CONNOR WATSON on behalf of OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. (WATSON, BRIAN)
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel S. Roberts, Esquire by INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13118059.). (PAUL, EDWARD)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alison O'Neal McMinn, Esquire by INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13117985.). (PAUL, EDWARD)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jaa, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO..(PAUL, EDWARD)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed. R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) filed by OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MOUNTAIN, CHAD)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD R. PAUL on behalf of INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO. with Certficiate of Service(PAUL, EDWARD)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #3 MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/21/18. 9/25/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
September 21, 2018 1 Summons Issued as to INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO.. 1 Forwarded To: JONATHAN D. RUBINSTEIN on 09/21/2018. (va, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO., OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., filed by HARRY VERNON. JURY DEMAND. (va, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(MOUNTAIN, CHAD)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC..(jl, )
September 12, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.. (jl, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. from PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 1808000088, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE184564) (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VERNON v. INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO.
Represented By: ALISON O'NEAL MCMINN
Represented By: EDWARD R. PAUL
Represented By: DANIEL S. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Represented By: CHAD D. MOUNTAIN
Represented By: BRIAN O'CONNOR WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRY VERNON
Represented By: JONATHAN D. RUBINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?