UNITED STATES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF JRW SERVICE GROUP, LLC v. NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF JRW SERVICE GROUP, LLC
Defendant: AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY and NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv04063
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Contract: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG on behalf of AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC (ZIMOLONG, WALTER)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons and Waiver October 8, 2018 upon Aegis Security Insurance Co. by First Class Mail on 09-24-2018 (DUNN, LINDSAY)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF JRW SERVICE GROUP, LLC. NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC waiver sent on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (DUNN, LINDSAY) Modified on 10/12/2018 (tjd).
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by UNITED STATES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF JRW SERVICE GROUP, LLC. (DUNN, LINDSAY)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF JRW SERVICE GROUP, LLC. NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC waiver sent on 9/20/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (DUNN, LINDSAY)
September 20, 2018 Two (2) Summons Issued as to AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC. Forwarded To: Lindsey A. Dunn, Esq. on 9/20/18. (fdc)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 185018.), filed by UNITED STATES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF JRW SERVICE GROUP, LLC.(fdc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF JRW SERVICE GROUP, LLC v. NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF JRW SERVICE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: LINDSAY A. DUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC
Represented By: WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?