MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC et al v. MCKEESON CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC and MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., SANDOZ, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC., UNNAMED DISTRIBUTOR CO-CONSPIRATORS, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., APOTEX CORP., MYLAN INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, MCKEESON CORPORATION, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., MCKEESON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., MAYNE PHARMA INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION and MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC.
Respondent: DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS PSC
Case Number: 2:2018cv04137
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' State-Law Claims filed by ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Declaration in Support, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(DOBIE, WILLIAM)
May 16, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 14, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by COURTNEY B AVERBACH on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(AVERBACH, COURTNEY)
May 14, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J SHERIDAN on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHERIDAN, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER M DRISCOLL on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRISCOLL, JENNIFER)
May 14, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW C BERNASCONI on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(BERNASCONI, ANDREW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHWARTZ, EDWARD)
May 14, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL)
May 8, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET)
May 8, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA C CROUSHORE on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(CROUSHORE, AMANDA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by EDITH M. KALLAS on behalf of MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC (KALLAS, EDITH)
May 8, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHMIDTLEIN, JOHN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH F. TEICH on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(TEICH, SARAH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints), #40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints, #46 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims), #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED- COUNTS I-XXVIII OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY THE MARION PLAINTIFFS, #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims, #62 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC. (QUILLEN, HENRY)
May 2, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Opposition to McKesson Motion to Dismiss filed by MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BERRY, ROBERT)
May 1, 2019 Filing 80 DEFENDANT ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLCS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS #46 PLAINTIFFS SHERMAN ACT CLAIMS AGAINST ASCEND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (kp, ).
April 29, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCCONNELL, SEAN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BENJAMIN P. ARGYLE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.(ARGYLE, BENJAMIN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by THOMAS J. WELLING on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.(WELLING, THOMAS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LISA JOSE FALES on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.(FALES, LISA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DANIELLE R. FOLEY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.(FOLEY, DANIELLE)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED AND THAT MCKESSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL APPLY TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/10/2019. 4/11/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 939 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
April 10, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN LEMMO on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(LEMMO, ANN)
April 9, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY S. FOUSE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(FOUSE, LINDSAY)
April 8, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI)
April 5, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JAMES DOUGLAS BALDRIDGE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.(BALDRIDGE, JAMES)
April 3, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE by MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC re #21 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Subpoena Issued to Owens & Minor (QUILLEN, HENRY)
April 1, 2019 Filing 68 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC, MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC.(kp, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(WILSON, CHIRSTOPHER)
April 1, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by S TURNER on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(TURNER, S)
April 1, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK THOMAS KOONS on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(KOONS, ERIK)
April 1, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MARTIN TALADAY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(TALADAY, JOHN)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER THAT MARION SHALL FILE ITS OPPOSITION TO MCKESSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS NO LATER THAN 5/2/2019 AND MCKESSON MAY FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW NO LATER THAN 6/13/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/13/2019. 3/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO.911 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 62 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., MAYNE PHARMA INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC., UNNAMED DISTRIBUTOR CO-CONSPIRATORS, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..Certificate of Service.(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by J. GORDON COONEY, JR on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(COONEY, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. PEASE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(PEASE, JOHN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA B. ROBINSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROBINSON, AMANDA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T MCENROE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCENROE, WILLIAM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAELA DRAGALIN on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRAGALIN, MICHAELA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON TANCHYK on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TANCHYK, ALISON)
February 26, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MCCLAM on behalf of CITRON PHARMA, LLC with Certificate of Service(MCCLAM, JOHN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL on behalf of CITRON PHARMA, LLC with Certificate of Service(ENGSELL, TIFFANY)
February 26, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN E. BIZAR on behalf of CITRON PHARMA, LLC with Certificate of Service(BIZAR, STEVEN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY C QUILLEN on behalf of MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC (QUILLEN, HENRY)
February 22, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by MELINA R. DIMATTIO on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA with Certificate of Service(DIMATTIO, MELINA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S WELLIN on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA with Certificate of Service(WELLIN, ANDREW)
February 21, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON R. PARISH on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(KITLOWSKI, BRADLEY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC.Memorandum, Declaration, Cert of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum (Redacted) in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Declaration in Support of Motion, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(DOBIE, WILLIAM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., MAYNE PHARMA INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC., UNNAMED DISTRIBUTOR CO-CONSPIRATORS, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAPMAN, JULIA) (Main Document 45 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION, MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ELLIS, ABRAM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by APOTEX CORP..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 21, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED- COUNTS I-XXVIII OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY THE MARION PLAINTIFFS filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARTH, GERALD)
February 21, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by MAYNE PHARMA INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by R. BRENDAN FEE on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA with Certificate of Service(FEE, R.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. REED on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA with Certificate of Service(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA CHAPMAN on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 21, 2019 Filing 36 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by MCKESSON CORPORATION, MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Defendants'), #2 Text of Proposed Order (Plaintiffs'))(ELLIS, ABRAM)
February 20, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
February 20, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN M KOWAL on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(KOWAL, STEVEN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(DONAHUE, LAUREN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by KENN BROTMAN on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(BROTMAN, KENN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J SMITH on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA INC. with Certificate of Service(SMITH, BRIAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN F. NAGLE on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(NAGLE, JOHN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(HAAS, ELIZABETH)
February 20, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES T. MCKEOWN on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MCKEOWN, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES W. MATTHEWS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION REGARDING TIMING OF DISCOVERY AND MOTION TO DISMISS IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/9/2019. 1/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 829 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 23 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems) (UNSEALED PER ORDER 932 ) Modified on 4/9/2019 (kp, ).
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., MAYNE PHARMA INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC., UNNAMED DISTRIBUTOR CO-CONSPIRATORS, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., filed by MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC, MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC. (ems)
December 17, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE by MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Owens & Minor Distribution, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A to Subpoena)(BERRY, ROBERT)
December 17, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum To Cardinal Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A to Subpoena)(BERRY, ROBERT)
December 17, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum To AmerisourceBergen Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Attachment A to Subpoena)(BERRY, ROBERT)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR THIRD ELECTRONIC CASE MANAGEMENT PROTOCOL TO CREATE NEW TRACK FOR ALL DIRECT PURCHASER FROM DISTRIBUTOR ACTIONS (DOC. NO. 729) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/20/2018. 11/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 772 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
November 6, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by MCKESSON CORPORATION, MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC. RESPONSE TO THE MARION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR THIRD ELECTRONIC CASE MANAGEMENT PROTOCOL (ELLIS, ABRAM)
October 31, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING PURSUANT TO PTO 51 by MCKESSON CORPORATION, MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ELLIS, ABRAM) Modified on 11/1/2018 (kp, ).
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. GOLDBERG on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(GOLDBERG, SETH)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by WAYNE A. MACK on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MACK, WAYNE)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KULIK, SARAH)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC.(BERRY, ROBERT)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC.(BERRY, ROBERT)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE STIPULATING DEFENDANTS TO MOVE AGAINST, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TOT HE MARION PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS ADJOURNED PURSUANT TO THE PROCEDURE SET FORTH IN PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 51.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/16/2018. 10/16/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 720 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Holdings Inc. with Certificate of Service by MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC..(ELLIS, ABRAM)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MCKESSON CORPORATION.(ELLIS, ABRAM)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by SARA YOUNG RAZI on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION, MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(RAZI, SARA)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER C. THOMAS on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION, MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(THOMAS, PETER)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ABRAM J. ELLIS on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION, MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(ELLIS, ABRAM)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC, MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC re: Kenneth V. Condrey served Summons and Complaint upon MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC. by Private Processor Server. MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC. served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (BERRY, ROBERT)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC, MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC re: Adam Golden served Summons and Complaint upon MCKESSON CORPORATION by Private Processor Server. MCKESSON CORPORATION served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (BERRY, ROBERT)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Unredacted Complaint Filed Under Seal by MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd) (tjd, ).
September 25, 2018 Nineteen (19) Summons Issued as to APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., MAYNE PHARMA INC., MCKEESON CORPORATION, MCKEESON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. Forwarded To: R. Stephen Berry on 9/25/18. (fdc)
September 25, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC, MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC. (fdc, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., MAYNE PHARMA INC., MCKEESON CORPORATION, MCKEESON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC., UNNAMED DISTRIBUTOR CO-CONSPIRATORS, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 185218.), filed by MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC, MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC., Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form)(fdc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/26/2018 per Chambers) (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC et al v. MCKEESON CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J SHERIDAN
Represented By: ANDREW C BERNASCONI
Represented By: COURTNEY B AVERBACH
Represented By: JENNIFER M DRISCOLL
Represented By: EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ
Represented By: KARL E. HERRMANN
Represented By: NICHOLAS V. ALBU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM GORDON DOBIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Represented By: BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI
Represented By: JASON R. PARISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC.
Represented By: J. GORDON COONEY, JR.
Represented By: MICHAELA DRAGALIN
Represented By: WILLIAM T MCENROE
Represented By: JOHN J. PEASE
Represented By: ALISON TANCHYK
Represented By: AMANDA B. ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED DISTRIBUTOR CO-CONSPIRATORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN T. FEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Represented By: SARAH F. KIRKPATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: JOHN F. NAGLE
Represented By: JAMES T. MCKEOWN
Represented By: JAMES W. MATTHEWS
Represented By: ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS
Represented By: APRIL WILLIAMS
Represented By: STEVEN F. CHERRY
Represented By: CLAIRE BERGERON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN E. BIZAR
Represented By: TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL
Represented By: JOHN MCCLAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKEESON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKEESON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Represented By: NATHAN M. BUCHTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Represented By: MELINA R. DIMATTIO
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Represented By: ANDREW S WELLIN
Represented By: WENDY WEST FEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: WAYNE A. MACK
Represented By: SETH A. GOLDBERG
Represented By: SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA INC.
Represented By: STEVEN M KOWAL
Represented By: KENN BROTMAN
Represented By: BRIAN J SMITH
Represented By: MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ
Represented By: LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: ABRAM J. ELLIS
Represented By: PETER C. THOMAS
Represented By: SARA YOUNG RAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL, INC.
Represented By: ABRAM J. ELLIS
Represented By: PETER C. THOMAS
Represented By: SARA YOUNG RAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARION DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT STEPHEN BERRY
Represented By: HENRY C QUILLEN
Represented By: EDITH M. KALLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARION HEALTHCARE, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT STEPHEN BERRY
Represented By: HENRY C QUILLEN
Represented By: EDITH M. KALLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS PSC
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?