HENDRICKSON v. DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION OF VERMONT et al
Plaintiff: DARRYL HENDRICKSON
Defendant: RICK BURNS, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION OF VERMONT, "PRISONERS" RIGHTS OFFICE, EMILY TREDEAN, BURLINGTON COURTHOUSE and GIOVANNA ZACCARIA
Case Number: 2:2018cv04151
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Copy of Order dated 10/3/18 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to DARRYL HENDRICKSON for the following reason: RETURN TO SENDER. (er, )
October 29, 2018 Copy of Order dated 9/28/18 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to DARRYL HENDRICKSON for the following reason: MAIL DOES NOT FOLLOW PA DOC MAIL POLICY-GO - RETURNED TO SENDER. (er, )
October 3, 2018 Letter mailed to pro se party regarding transfer of case. (er, )
October 1, 2018 Original record transferred to the District of Vermont via interdistrict transfer system. (md)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF VERMONT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS MATTER AS CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/28/18. 9/28/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PROSE PLAINTIFF.(er, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against "PRISONERS" RIGHTS OFFICE, BURLINGTON COURTHOUSE, RICK BURNS, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION OF VERMONT, EMILY TREDEAN, GIOVANNA ZACCARIA (NO FEE, NO IFP), filed by DARRYL HENDRICKSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets, #2 Envelope)(ahf) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/28/2018) (afm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENDRICKSON v. DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION OF VERMONT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION OF VERMONT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "PRISONERS" RIGHTS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY TREDEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURLINGTON COURTHOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIOVANNA ZACCARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRYL HENDRICKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?