ELANSARI v. GOLF CLUB APARTMENTS et al
Plaintiff: AMRO ELANSARI
Defendant: EDWARD GRIFFITH, THOMAS KISTLER, JOHNATHAN GRINE, THE BOROUGH OF WEST CHESTER, COLUMBIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, WEST GOSHEN DISTRICT COURT, WILLIAM KRAUT, GARY NORTON, THOMAS JAMES, ROBERT J. SHENKIN, NICHOLAS LIPPINCOTT, MARK L. TUNNELL, PAMELA RUEST, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, COLUMBIA COUNTY DISTRICT COURT, THE CHESTER COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, THE HARBOR GROUP INTERNATIONAL, THE SUPREME COURT OF PENNSYLVANIA, BRADLEY LUNDSFORD, JONATHAN GRINE, RUSSEL LAWTON, THE SUPERIOR COURT OF PENNSYLVANIA, JESSICA LATHROPE, DIANE HARRIS, THE CENTER COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STACY PARKS MILLER, CHESTER COUNTY, GOLF CLUB APARTMENTS and BRANDON MORGAN
Case Number: 2:2018cv04171
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT EMERGENCY MOTON FOR RELIEF (DOC. 11) IS DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/19/18. 11/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREPS.(rf, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RELIEF, EXHIBITS filed by AMRO ELANSARI.(rf, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #9 Notice of Appeal filed by AMRO ELANSARI. USCA Case Number 18-3184 (rf, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL by AMRO ELANSARI. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. FILING FEE NOT PAID. IFP NOT GRANTED. (rf, )
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND ELANSARI AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICAITON TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. IF ELANSARI SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS HE SHALL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER COMPLETE AND FILE THE FORM IN A MANNER PROVIDING THE DETAILS NECESSARY TO CLARIFY THE ISSUES NOTED. ALTERNATIVELY, ELANSARI MAY PROCEED BY PAYING $400 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ELANSARI IS REMINDED THAT HE MUST SIGN THE AFFIDAVIT OF POVERTY UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY. IF ELANSARI FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/1/18. 10/2/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREPS. *APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS SENT TO ELANSARI ON 10/1/18*(rf, )
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR ECF ACCESS (DOC. 4) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/1/18. 10/1/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF AND UNREPS.(rf, )
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT EMERGENCY PETITION FOR RELIEF (DOC. 3) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/1/18. 10/1/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF AND UNREPS.(rf, )
September 27, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AMRO ELANSARI. (ahf)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION FOR ECF ACCESS FILED BY AMRO ELANSARI.(ahf)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 EMERGENCY PETITION FOR RELIEF & EX PARTE HEARING by AMRO ELANSARI. (ahf) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/28/2018) (afm, ).
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CHESTER COUNTY, COLUMBIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, COLUMBIA COUNTY DISTRICT COURT, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, GOLF CLUB APARTMENTS, EDWARD GRIFFITH, JOHNATHAN GRINE, JONATHAN GRINE, DIANE HARRIS, THOMAS JAMES, THOMAS KISTLER, WILLIAM KRAUT, JESSICA LATHROPE, RUSSEL LAWTON, NICHOLAS LIPPINCOTT, BRADLEY LUNDSFORD, STACY PARKS MILLER, BRANDON MORGAN, GARY NORTON, PAMELA RUEST, ROBERT J. SHENKIN, THE BOROUGH OF WEST CHESTER, THE CENTER COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, THE CHESTER COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, THE HARBOR GROUP INTERNATIONAL, THE SUPERIOR COURT OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE SUPREME COURT OF PENNSYLVANIA, MARK L. TUNNELL, WEST GOSHEN DISTRICT COURT, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, filed by AMRO ELANSARI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2018: #2 Designation Form) (afm, ). (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/28/2018) (nd, ).
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY AMRO ELANSARI.(ahf) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/28/2018) (nd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELANSARI v. GOLF CLUB APARTMENTS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD GRIFFITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS KISTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNATHAN GRINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOROUGH OF WEST CHESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST GOSHEN DISTRICT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM KRAUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY NORTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT J. SHENKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS LIPPINCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK L. TUNNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAMELA RUEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA COUNTY DISTRICT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHESTER COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HARBOR GROUP INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SUPREME COURT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY LUNDSFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN GRINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSEL LAWTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA LATHROPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CENTER COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACY PARKS MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESTER COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLF CLUB APARTMENTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMRO ELANSARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?