PALM et al v. BELL et al
Plaintiff: COMPUTER NERDS INC. and JOHN EDWARD PALM
Defendant: DAVID REED, BYRON HAYES, BUNDY TYPE WRITER & COMPUTER/GEEK SQUAD, DARIEN THOMAS, SANDRA THOMAS-GEORGE, DAVID HILL, RASHEED BELL, VERNON MORRISON, DAVID ROWLAND, SHIRLENE MORRIS and ROCHELLE MORRISON
Case Number: 2:2018cv04173
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Forwarded To: PRO SE on 10/26/2018 (kp, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE #5 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND MR. PALM AN APPROPRIATE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. MR. PALM MAY FILE A THIRD MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, OR ALTERNATIVELY PAY THE FEES UNDER THE 10/1/2018 ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/15/2018.10/15/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. IFP FORM MAILED 10/15/2018.(kp, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JOHN EDWARD PALM..(kp, )
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT WE DENY MR. PALM'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON HIS OWN BEHALF IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS WE REQUIRE MORE INFORMATION TO UNDERSTAND MR. PALM'S FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND MR. PALM AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE AS OUTLINED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/1/18.10/2/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S WITH FORMS.(jaa, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES.(fdc)
September 26, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by COMPUTER NERDS INC., JOHN EDWARD PALM. (fdc)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against RASHEED BELL, BUNDY TYPE WRITER & COMPUTER/GEEK SQUAD, BYRON HAYES, DAVID HILL, SHIRLENE MORRIS, ROCHELLE MORRISON, VERNON MORRISON, DAVID REED, DAVID ROWLAND, DARIEN THOMAS, SANDRA THOMAS-GEORGE, filed by COMPUTER NERDS INC., JOHN EDWARD PALM. IFP PENDING. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form/Track Form)(fdc)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by COMPUTER NERDS INC., JOHN EDWARD PALM.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PALM et al v. BELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYRON HAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUNDY TYPE WRITER & COMPUTER/GEEK SQUAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARIEN THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA THOMAS-GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASHEED BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERNON MORRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID ROWLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRLENE MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCHELLE MORRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMPUTER NERDS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN EDWARD PALM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?