JACKSON v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: ANGELO JACKSON
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 2:2018cv04176
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE A. KATZ on behalf of ANGELO JACKSON (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/13/2018 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT THE TIME FOR AMTRAK TO FILE ITS ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS EXTENDED TO DECEMBER 14, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/15/18. 11/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by YURI J. BRUNETTI on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (BRUNETTI, YURI)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXIS SHAENA TALBOT GROSE on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (GROSE, ALEXIS)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Letter from Civil Deputy re: Answer Due (amw, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael J. Olley re: served Complaint and Summons upon Deft, Amtrak by Certified Mail Return Receipt Requested (NO SIGNATURE) on October 16, 2018, ANSWER DUE 11/6/18. (OLLEY, MICHAEL) Modified on 10/22/2018 (afm, ).
September 27, 2018 1 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 9/28/2018 (amas)
September 27, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANGELO JACKSON. (amas)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 185330.), filed by ANGELO JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELO JACKSON
Represented By: MICHAEL J. OLLEY
Represented By: LAWRENCE A. KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: YURI J. BRUNETTI
Represented By: ALEXIS SHAENA TALBOT GROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?