WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. REDDING et al

Plaintiff: WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Defendant: BRUCE K. REDDING, JR., THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and GLORIA H. REDDING
Case Number: 2:2018cv04224
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment by Default against Bruce K. Redding, Jr. and Gloria H. Redding filed by WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Memorandum, #4 Certificate of Service)(HLADIK, STEPHEN) Modified on 11/8/2018 (lisad, ).
November 5, 2018 Default Entered (ti, )
November 5, 2018 DEFAULT BY BRUCE K. REDDING, JR, GLORIA H. REDDING FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (ti, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Default WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION against BRUCE K. REDDING, JR, GLORIA H. REDDING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HLADIK, STEPHEN)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ambiko Wallace re: served Summons and Complaint upon Brian Cress obo USA c/o Dept. of Justice by Personal Service on 10/15/18 (ti, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by B&R re: served Summons and Complaint upon Bruce Redding by Personal on 10/11/2018 (HLADIK, STEPHEN)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by B&R re: served Summons and Complaint upon Gloria Redding by Personal on 10/11/2018 (HLADIK, STEPHEN)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by B&R re: served Summons and Complaint upon USA c/o US Attorney's Office by Personal on 10/11/2018 (HLADIK, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (ti, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 12(b) Procedural Order(CJL)
October 1, 2018 Two (2) Summons Issued as to THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. One forwarded to counsel and one given to AUSA on 10/2/18. (lisad, )
October 1, 2018 Two (2) Summons Issued as to THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. One forwarded to counsel and one given to AUSA on 10/2/18 (mbh, ) *FILED IN ERROR USING WRONG EVENT* Modified on 10/3/2018 (lisad, ).
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(mbh, )
October 1, 2018 One (1) Summons Issued as to THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Forwarded To: U.S. Attorneys Office on 10/2/18 (mbh, ) Modified on 10/3/2018 (mbh, ). (FILED IN ERROR)
October 1, 2018 Two (2) Summons Issued as to BRUCE K. REDDING, JR and GLORIA H. REDDING Forwarded To: counsel on 10/2/18 (mbh, ) Modified on 10/3/2018 (mbh, ).
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against BRUCE K. REDDING, JR, GLORIA H. REDDING and THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE185582) filed by WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Managment Track form, #3 Designation form)(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. REDDING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: STEPHEN M. HLADIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE K. REDDING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLORIA H. REDDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?