DAVIS v. BURWELL et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH E. DAVIS
Defendant: SYLVIA MATTHEWS BURWELL and NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv04288
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS DEEMED TO HAVE CONSENTED TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 11/13/2018. 11/15/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE FORM WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 10/30/18. (Attachments: #1 FORM) 10/31/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(ahf, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Procedural Order 10/5/2018 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (ahf)
October 3, 2018 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, SYLVIA MATTHEWS BURWELL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 3 Forwarded To: Counsel & 1 to AUSA on 10/5/2018 (ahf)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, SYLVIA MATTHEWS BURWELL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 185795.), filed by JOSEPH E. DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. BURWELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYLVIA MATTHEWS BURWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH E. DAVIS
Represented By: PAUL H. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?