READY v. BERRYHILL

Plaintiff: JOHN EDWARD READY
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv04289
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: RICHARD A LLORET
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE FORM WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FAILURE TO COMPLETE AND FILE THE FORM AS ORDERED HEREIN SHALL BE DEEMED CONSENT TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL EXERCISE JURISDICTION FOR ALL PURPOSES UNDER 28 USC:636(C). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 10/29/18. 10/29/18 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 19, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by THOMAS D. SUTTON re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon COMMISSIONER OF SSA AND CLERK by CERTIFIED MAIL (sg, )
October 12, 2018 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg, )
October 4, 2018 3 Procedural Order 10/5/ Entered and copies e-mailed. (rf, ) Modified on 10/9/2018 (lisad, ).
October 4, 2018 2 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Errata PROPOSED CONSENT)(rf, )
October 4, 2018 2 Original Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 10/4/18. 1 Summons to US Attorney for service on 10/4/18. (rf, )
October 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE185794.), filed by JOHN EDWARD READY.(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: READY v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN EDWARD READY
Represented By: THOMAS D. SUTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?