JACKSON-COBB v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: MELISSA JACKSON-COBB
Defendant: NANCY BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv04291
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Referring Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General via FEDEX on 10/22/18. FEDEX TRACKING SHEET ATTACHED. (rf, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Commissioner of Social Security via FEDEX on 10/22/18. FEDEX TRACKING SHEET ATTACHED.(rf, )
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI TO CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/19/18. 10/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO HUTCHINSON AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by MELISSA JACKSON-COBB.. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ADRIENNE F. JARVIS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 10/11/18. 10/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO HUTCHINSON AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 STANDING SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/8/18.10/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO HUTCHINSON, EMAILED. (rf, )
October 11, 2018 2 Original Summons Issued as to NANCY BERRYHILL forwarded to US Marshal Service on 10/11/18. 1 Summons sent to US Attorney for service on 10/11/18.(rf, )
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FRCP 4(I) AT THE FOLLOWING ADDRESSES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 10/11/18. 10/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 consent frm.)(fdc)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of ADRIENNE F. JARVIS, ESQ. by MELISSA JACKSON-COBB, Statement, Certificate of Service. (Filing Fee Paid) (fdc)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY BERRYHILL, filed by MELISSA JACKSON-COBB. IFP PENDING. (Attachments: # 1 LRCP 5.1.3 FRM, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(fdc)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY MELISSA JACKSON-COBB.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON-COBB v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA JACKSON-COBB
Represented By: ROBERT A. PETRUZZELLI
Represented By: ADRIENNE F. JARVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?