H&H DISPOSAL SERVICES, INC. v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Plaintiff: H&H DISPOSAL SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS and UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Case Number: 2:2018cv04467
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F KELLY
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael F. Faherty re: served Summons and Complaint upon EPA, USACE, U.S. Attorney, and Civil-Process Clerk by Certified Mail on 10/25/18, 10/25/18, 10/29/18 and 10/25/18 respectively (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letters, Cert. Mail. Receipts, and Tracking History, #2 Exhibit Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney)(FAHERTY, MICHAEL)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, )
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOC. NO. #1 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFF'S RIGHT TO REQUEST RELIEF BEFORE THE HONORABLE JUDGE ROBERT F. KELLY, TO WHOM THIS CASE IS ASSIGNED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/18/2018. 10/18/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
October 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Three Forwarded To: Counsel, one given to AUSA on 10/18/18 (jwl, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIONS filed by H&H DISPOSAL SERVICES, INC..Brief. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Lease, #2 Order, #3 Record of Decision, #4 Memorandum, #5 Declaration, #6 Letter, #7 Default Judgment, #8 Request, #9 Brief, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Designation Form, #12 Case Management Track Form)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H&H DISPOSAL SERVICES, INC. v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&H DISPOSAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL F. FAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?