SCHILLER GROUNDS CARE, INC. v. SOURCEONE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SCHILLER GROUNDS CARE, INC.
Defendant: SOURCEONE, INC. and BILLY GOAT INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv04524
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Copy of Order dated 10/24/18 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to BILLY GOAT INDUSTRIES for the following reason: RTS: No Such Number/Unable to Forward. (ti, )
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CATHY S. TRENT-VILIM, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/24/18.10/24/18 ENTERED AND ECF APPLICATION & COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) Modified on 10/25/2018 (ti, ). Modified on 10/25/2018 (lisad, ).
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF BRIAN J. BRISLEN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/24/18.10/24/18 ENTERED AND ECF APPLICATION & COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) Modified on 10/25/2018 (ti, ). Modified on 10/25/2018 (lisad, ).
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 PRAECIPE for Entry of Appearance by KEITH A. JONES on behalf of SCHILLER GROUNDS CARE, INC. with Certificate of Service(JONES, KEITH) Modified on 10/24/2018 (lisad, ).
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Cathy S. Trent-Vilim ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13127965.) filed by SCHILLER GROUNDS CARE, INC...(SIMMONS, JOHN)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brian J. Brislen ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13127924.) filed by SCHILLER GROUNDS CARE, INC...(SIMMONS, JOHN)
October 22, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SCHILLER GROUNDS CARE, INC.. (ahf)
October 22, 2018 Summons Issued as to BILLY GOAT INDUSTRIES, INC., SOURCEONE, INC.. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/23/2018 (ahf)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SCHILLER GROUNDS CARE, INC..(SIMMONS, JOHN)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13125039.), filed by SCHILLER GROUNDS CARE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(SIMMONS, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHILLER GROUNDS CARE, INC. v. SOURCEONE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOURCEONE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILLY GOAT INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCHILLER GROUNDS CARE, INC.
Represented By: JOHN D. SIMMONS
Represented By: CATHY S. TRENT-VILIM
Represented By: KEITH A. JONES
Represented By: BRIAN J. BRISLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?