INDUSTRIAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC. et al v. COPYLITE PRODUCTS CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: INDUSTRIAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC. and MARK HANKIN
Defendant: COPYLITE PRODUCTS, LLC and COPYLITE PRODUCTS CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv04607
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 12/28/18 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO OPEN AND/OR STRIKE CONFESSED JUDGMENT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/11/18. 12/11/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MAY HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 12/14/18 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS RULE 60 (b) MOTION TO OPEN AND/OR STRIKE CONFESSED JUDGMENT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/3/18. 12/3/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN DEAN BOREMAN on behalf of MARK HANKIN, INDUSTRIAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BOREMAN, BRIAN)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for New Trial , MOTION for Order Motion to Open and/or Strike Confessed Judgment filed by COPYLITE PRODUCTS CORPORATION, COPYLITE PRODUCTS, LLC.Motion to Open and/or Strike Confessed Judgment, Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit)(BUCCO, PAUL)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent COPYLITE PRODUCTS CORPORATION for COPYLITE PRODUCTS, LLC. by COPYLITE PRODUCTS, LLC.(jwl, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COPYLITE PRODUCTS CORPORATION.(jwl, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COPYLITE PRODUCTS CORPORATION, COPYLITE PRODUCTS, LLC from Common Pleas Montgomery County, case number 2018-22863. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 186866)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INDUSTRIAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC. et al v. COPYLITE PRODUCTS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDUSTRIAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: JOHN K. FIORILLO
Represented By: BRIAN DEAN BOREMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK HANKIN
Represented By: JOHN K. FIORILLO
Represented By: BRIAN DEAN BOREMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPYLITE PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: PAUL BUCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPYLITE PRODUCTS CORPORATION
Represented By: PAUL BUCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?